Lisa Tedesco v. CountryWide Debt Relief, LLC
Plaintiff: Lisa Tedesco
Defendant: CountryWide Debt Relief, LLC
Case Number: 5:2017cv00803
Filed: April 26, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: David T Bristow
Referring Judge: George H Wu
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 6, 2017. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER GRANTING JOINT MOTION FOR DISMISSAL OF ACTION WITH PREJUDICE by Judge George H. Wu: Based upon the Joint Motion for Dismissal, and good cause, this Court hereby orders the action to be, and is, dismissed with prejudice. Each side is to bear its own attorney's fees and costs. IT IS ORDERED #31 ( MD JS-6. Case Terminated ) (rfi)
November 1, 2017 Filing 31 Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case with Prejudice filed by Plaintiff Lisa Tedesco. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service) (Connolly, Crosby)
October 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 30 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER RE: SETTLEMENT by Judge George H. Wu: On September 29, 2017, Plaintiff Lisa Tedesco, filed a Notice of Settlement. The Court sets an Order to Show Cause re: Settlement Hearing for December 7, 2017 at 8:30 a.m. Please refer to the Court's order for additional information. (cr)
September 29, 2017 Filing 29 NOTICE of Settlement filed by Plaintiff Lisa Tedesco. (Attachments: #1 certificate of Service)(Connolly, Crosby)
August 24, 2017 Filing 28 MINUTES OF SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held before Judge George H. Wu: Discovery cut-off 12/22/2017. Motions due by 2/22/2018. Last date to conduct settlement conference is 12/6/2017. Status Conference set for 12/7/2017 at 08:30 AM. Pretrial Conference set for 3/22/2018 at 08:30 AM. Jury Trial set for 4/3/2018 at 09:00 AM. Court Reporter: Katie Thibodeaux. (cr)
August 21, 2017 Filing 27 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 3 days, filed by Plaintiff Lisa Tedesco.. (Attachments: #1 cert. of Service)(Connolly, Crosby)
August 16, 2017 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Gabriel G Hedrick on behalf of Defendant CountryWide Debt Relief, LLC (Hedrick, Gabriel)
August 16, 2017 Filing 25 NOTICE of Change of address by Lauren Gail Kane attorney for Defendant CountryWide Debt Relief, LLC. Changing attorneys address to 401 West A Street, Suite 1150 San Diego, CA 92101. Filed by Defendant CountryWide Debt Relief, LLC. (Kane, Lauren)
July 13, 2017 Filing 24 RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Beth-Ann E. Krimsky to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant CountryWide Debt Relief, LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-20160550) #21 , APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Jessica Alhalel to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant CountryWide Debt Relief, LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-20160677) #22 by Clerk of Court. The document is stricken. See the Notice of Filer Deficiency (Docket No. 23) for details and instructions. (mrgo)
July 11, 2017 Filing 23 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Beth-Ann E. Krimsky to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant CountryWide Debt Relief, LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-20160550) #21 , APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Jessica Alhalel to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant CountryWide Debt Relief, LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-20160677) #22 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 83-2.1.3.3(d) Certificate of Good Standing not attached for every state court listed to which the applicant has been admitted. Local Rule 83-2.1.3.4 Local counsel does not maintain an office within the District. (lt)
July 11, 2017 Filing 22 [DOCUMENT ORDERED STRICKEN PER DOC. NO. 24] APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Jessica Alhalel to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant CountryWide Debt Relief, LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-20160677) filed by Defendant CountryWide Debt Relief, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service) (Kane, Lauren) Modified on 7/13/2017 (mrgo).
July 11, 2017 Filing 21 [DOCUMENT ORDERED STRICKEN PER DOC. NO. 24] APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Beth-Ann E. Krimsky to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant CountryWide Debt Relief, LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-20160550) filed by Defendant CountryWide Debt Relief, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service) (Kane, Lauren) Modified on 7/13/2017 (mrgo).
July 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER GRANTING THE PARTIES' JOINT STIPULATION TO CONTINUE THE AUGUST 7, 2017 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE HEARING DATE TO A LATER DATE AS CONVENIENT BY THIS COURT by Judge George H. Wu: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT: 1. The August 7, 2017 Scheduling Conference hearing date is rescheduled to August 24, 2017 at 8:30 a.m. 2. The filing of the Joint 26(f) report is due no later than August 21, 2017. (cr)
July 3, 2017 Filing 19 Joint STIPULATION to Continue scheduling conference from August 7, 2017 to A later date Re: Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held,,, Set/Reset Hearing,, #18 filed by Plaintiff Lisa Tedesco. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service)(Connolly, Crosby)
June 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 18 (IN CHAMBERS) COURT ORDER by Judge George H. Wu: On the Court's own motion, a Scheduling Conference is set for August 7, 2017, at 8:30 a.m. Counsel are reminded of their obligations to disclose information, confer on a discovery plan, and report to the Court, as required by F.R.C.P. 26 and the Local Rules of this Court. Trial counsel are ordered to be present. A Joint 26(f) Report shall be filed with the Court not later than July 24, 2017. See Local Rule 26-1. Please refer to the Court's order for specifics. (cr)
June 26, 2017 Filing 17 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant CountryWide Debt Relief, LLC, (Kane, Lauren)
June 26, 2017 Filing 16 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant CountryWide Debt Relief, LLC (Kane, Lauren)
June 26, 2017 Filing 15 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant CountryWide Debt Relief, LLC.(Kane, Lauren)
June 26, 2017 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Lauren Gail Kane on behalf of Defendant CountryWide Debt Relief, LLC (Kane, Lauren)
June 26, 2017 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Anton Nasri Handal on behalf of Defendant CountryWide Debt Relief, LLC (Handal, Anton)
June 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT by Judge George H. Wu re: Stipulation Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less), #11 . It is hereby ORDERED that Defendant COUNTRYWIDE DEBT RELIEF, LLC shall have until June 26, 2017 to file a response to the Complaint (ECF No.1). (mrgo)
June 7, 2017 Filing 11 Joint STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to CountryWide Debt Relief, LLC answer now due 6/26/2017, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant CountryWide Debt Relief, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Handal, Anton)
May 22, 2017 Filing 10 Joint STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to CountryWide Debt Relief, LLC answer now due 6/12/2017, filed by Defendant CountryWide Debt Relief, LLC.(Attorney Anton Nasri Handal added to party CountryWide Debt Relief, LLC(pty:dft))(Handal, Anton)
May 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Standing Order Re Final Pre-Trial Conferences for Civil Jury Trials by Judge George H. Wu. (lom)
May 3, 2017 Filing 8 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Lisa Tedesco, upon Defendant CountryWide Debt Relief, LLC served on 5/1/2017, answer due 5/22/2017. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Tamim Saighani, Agent for Service in compliance with statute not specified by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Connolly, Crosby)
April 27, 2017 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant CountryWide Debt Relief, LLC. (ghap)
April 27, 2017 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
April 27, 2017 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge George H. Wu and Magistrate Judge David T. Bristow. (ghap)
April 26, 2017 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Lisa Tedesco. (Connolly, Crosby)
April 26, 2017 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Lisa Tedesco, identifying None.. (Connolly, Crosby)
April 26, 2017 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Lisa Tedesco. (Connolly, Crosby)
April 26, 2017 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-19749759 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Lisa Tedesco. (Attorney Crosby Scott Connolly added to party Lisa Tedesco(pty:pla))(Connolly, Crosby)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lisa Tedesco v. CountryWide Debt Relief, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Tedesco
Represented By: Crosby Scott Connolly
Represented By: Robert L Hyde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CountryWide Debt Relief, LLC
Represented By: Anton Nasri Handal
Represented By: Gabriel G Hedrick
Represented By: Lauren Gail Kane
Represented By: Beth-Ann E Krimsky
Represented By: Jessica B Alhalel
Represented By: Jessica B Sander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?