Curtis W. Philbert v. David I. Shulkin
Plaintiff: Curtis W Philbert
Defendant: David I. Shulkin
Case Number: 5:2017cv00929
Filed: November 6, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Office: Eastern Division - Riverside Office
Presiding Judge: Kenly Kiya Kato
Presiding Judge: Christina A. Snyder
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights (Employment Discrimination)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 83 MINUTES OF DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (Dkt. 72, filed September 20, 2019) Hearing held before Judge Christina A. Snyder granting 72 for Summary Judgment: In accordance with the foregoing, the Court GRANTS the VA's motion for summary judgment. (see document for further details) MD JS-6. Case Terminated. Court Reporter: Laura Elias. (bm)
April 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 52 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge Christina A. Snyder: RE PLAINTIFFS MOTION FORRECONSIDERATION 43 . Court Orders plaintiffs motion to transfer his Equal Pay Act claim to the Court of Federal Claims is GRANTED. Because the amount in controversy with re spect to plaintiffs EPA claim exceeds $10,000 and plaintiff declines to waive excess damages, the Court lacks jurisdiction andaccordingly TRANSFERS THE EPA CLAIMS to the Court of Federal Claims pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1631. (transferring plaintiffs EPA claims to Court of Federal Claims, the only court in which the claim could have been properly brought). (lc)
March 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 44 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kenly Kiya Kato re Stipulation for Protective Order 42 . (SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS) (iva)
November 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 25 MINUTES OF Motion Hearing held before Judge Christina A. Snyder RE: Defendant's Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint 20 . Defendant's motion to dismiss is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. Specifically, the motion is GRANTED as to p laintiffs ADEA claim, which is dismissed with prejudice and without leave to amend. The motion is also GRANTED as to plaintiffs Title VII hostile work environment and retaliation claims, which are dismissed without prejudice and with leave to amend. The motion is DENIED as to plaintiffs Title VII disparate treatment claim based on national original. Plaintiff shall have until 12/4/2017, to file a Second Amended Complaint complying with the requirements of Rule 8. See document for further details. Court Reporter: Laura Elias. (gk)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Curtis W. Philbert v. David I. Shulkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Curtis W Philbert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David I. Shulkin
Represented By: Karen Patricia Ruckert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?