Lynn Hodge v. Image International Manufacturing, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Lynn Hodge
Defendant: Does, Image International Manufacturing, LLC, Image International Sales and Marketing Corporation, Janna Ronert and Marc Ronert
Case Number: 5:2018cv00925
Filed: May 1, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Jesus G. Bernal
Presiding Judge: Shashi H. Kewalramani
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 11, 2019 Filing 31 JUDGMENT by Judge Jesus G. Bernal, in favor of Lynn Hodge against Image International Manufacturing, LLC. AWARDS Class Counsel attorneys' fees $107,250; Class Counsel costs $6,887.76; $15,000 to Plaintiff Lynn Hodge; Payment of $2,750 to the Settlement Administrator; RE: #30 . MD JS-6, Case Terminated. (twdb)
October 7, 2019 Filing 30 MINUTES OF Motion Hearing held before Judge Jesus G. Bernal: Order (1) GRANTING Plaintiffs Motion for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement (Dkt. No. #25 ); and (2) GRANTING Plaintiffs Motion for Attorneys Fees (Dkt. No. #26 ). AWARDS Class Counsel attorneys' fees in the amount of $107,250; Class Counsel costs in the amount of $6,887.76; $1,000 to Plaintiff Lynn Hodge; ORDERS the payment of $2,750 to the Settlement Administrator; and DISMISSES the Complaint WITH PREJUDICE. The Court ORDERS such judgment be entered. Court Reporter: Chase Frazier. (twdb)
September 23, 2019 Filing 29 NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Settlement Approval of Final Approval of Class Action Settlement #25 filed by Defendants Image International Manufacturing, LLC, Image International Sales and Marketing Corporation, Janna Ronert, Marc Ronert. (Madoyan, Vartan)
September 23, 2019 Filing 28 NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs; Request for Class Representative Incentive Award #26 filed by Defendants Image International Manufacturing, LLC, Image International Sales and Marketing Corporation, Janna Ronert, Marc Ronert. (Madoyan, Vartan)
September 10, 2019 Filing 27 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs; Request for Class Representative Incentive Award #26 . The following error(s) was/were found: Proposed Document was not submitted as separate attachment. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (twdb)
September 9, 2019 Filing 26 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs; Request for Class Representative Incentive Award filed by Plaintiff Lynn Hodge. Motion set for hearing on 10/7/2019 at 09:00 AM before Judge Jesus G. Bernal. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of R. Kitson ISO Motion for Final Settlement Approval & Attorney Fees, #2 Exhibit 1- Billing Records, #3 Exhibit 2-Cost Summary, #4 Declaration of J. Hatcher ISO Motion for Final Settlement Approval & Attorney Fees, #5 Exhibit A- Settlement Agreement, #6 Exhibit B- LWDA Filing Submission Confirmation, #7 Exhibit C- Letter Re Independent Contractors to Employees, #8 Declaration of Knuckenberg Class Administrator ISO Motion for Final Settlement Approval & Attorney Fees, #9 Exhibit A- Notice Packet, #10 Exhibit B- Invoice, #11 Exhibit C- Preliminary Calculations for Maling, #12 Exhibit D- Zip Code List, #13 Declaration of Pl L. Hodge ISO Motion for Final Settlement Approval & Attorney Fees) (Kitson, Robert)
September 9, 2019 Filing 25 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Settlement Approval of Final Approval of Class Action Settlement filed by Plaintiff Lynn Hodge. Motion set for hearing on 10/7/2019 at 09:00 AM before Judge Jesus G. Bernal. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of R. Kitson ISO Motion for Final Settlement Approval & Attorney Fees, #2 Exhibit 1- Billing Records, #3 Exhibit 2-Cost Summary, #4 Declaration of J. Hatcher ISO Motion for Final Settlement Approval & Attorney Fees, #5 Exhibit A- Settlement Agreement, #6 Exhibit B- LWDA Filing Submission Confirmation, #7 Exhibit C- Letter Re Independent Contractors to Employees, #8 Declaration of Knuckenberg Class Administrator ISO Motion for Final Settlement Approval & Attorney Fees, #9 Exhibit A- Notice Packet, #10 Exhibit B- Invoice, #11 Exhibit C- Preliminary Calculations for Maling, #12 Exhibit D- Zip Code List, #13 Declaration of Pl L. Hodge ISO Motion for Final Settlement Approval & Attorney Fees, #14 Proposed Order) (Kitson, Robert)
June 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER GRANTING PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT by Judge Jesus G. Bernal #18 . The Court orders the following schedule of dates for further proceedings. SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. Approval Hearing set for 10/7/2019 at 09:00 AM before Judge Jesus G. Bernal. (twdb)
June 10, 2019 Filing 23 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge Jesus G. Bernal: Order GRANTING Plaintiffs Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement (Dkt. No. #18 ). The hearing date for the Final Approval Hearing is hereby set for Monday October 7, 2019 at 9:00 a.m. in Courtroom 1 of the United States District Court for the Central District of California, Eastern Division located at 3470 12th Street, Riverside, California 92501. SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. (twdb)
May 31, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice of Non-Opposition #21 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: "Motions and Related Filings" - Responses/Replies/Other Motion Related Documents - Non-Opposition to Motion. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ad)
May 30, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE Notice of Non-Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement filed by Defendant Image International Manufacturing, LLC. (Madoyan, Vartan)
May 13, 2019 Filing 20 Amendment to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Settlement Approval of Class Action Settlement Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement #18 filed by Plaintiff Lynn Hodge. (Hatcher, Jason)
May 13, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Plaintiff Lynn Hodge. correcting NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Settlement Approval of Class Action Settlement Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement #18 (Hatcher, Jason)
May 13, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Settlement Approval of Class Action Settlement Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement filed by Plaintiff Lynn Hodge. Motion set for hearing on 6/10/2019 at 09:00 AM before Judge Jesus G. Bernal. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of J. Hatcher ISO Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Declaration of R. Kitson ISO Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement, #4 Proposed Order) (Hatcher, Jason)
April 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER by Judge Jesus G. Bernal, Granting Joint Stipulation to Vacate Dates #16 . THE COURT HEREBY ORDERS that: 1. All remaining dates, including Plaintiffs deadline for filing a motion for class certification, in this action are hereby vacated. (twdb)
April 8, 2019 Filing 16 Joint STIPULATION to Vacate all remaining dates and deadlines and Notice of Settlement filed by Plaintiff Lynn Hodge. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hatcher, Jason)
March 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Jesus G. Bernal. Scheduling Conference set for 6/17/2019 at 11:00 AM before Judge Jesus G. Bernal. (iva)
March 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER by Judge Jesus G. Bernal, Granting Stipulation to Dismiss Party without Prejudice #13 . Marc Ronert (an individual ), Image International Sales and Marketing Corporation and Janna Ronert (an individual) terminated. (twdb)
March 12, 2019 Filing 13 STIPULATION to Dismiss Defendant Janna Ronert, Marc Ronert, Image International Sales and Marketing Corporation filed by Defendants Janna Ronert, Marc Ronert, Image International Manufacturing, LLC, Image International Sales and Marketing Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Madoyan, Vartan)
September 13, 2018 Filing 12 ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition #10 filed by Defendants Image International Manufacturing, LLC, Image International Sales and Marketing Corporation, Janna Ronert, Marc Ronert.(Madoyan, Vartan)
August 28, 2018 Filing 11 STATUS REPORT (Joint Post-Mediation) filed by Defendants Image International Manufacturing, LLC, Image International Sales and Marketing Corporation, Janna Ronert, Marc Ronert. (Madoyan, Vartan)
July 20, 2018 Filing 10 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendant Lynn Hodge amending Complaint - (Discovery),, filed by Plaintiff Lynn Hodge(Hatcher, Jason)
July 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER by Judge Jesus G. Bernal, Granting Joint Stipulation to File a First Amended Complaint and Stay Scheduling Conference Pending Mediation #8 . Pending the August 14, 2018 mediation, the Court stays the July 16, 2018 Scheduling Conference, the Joint Report filing deadline, formal discovery and Defendants' responsive pleading the the FAC; SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. (twdb)
July 3, 2018 Filing 8 Joint STIPULATION for Leave to for Plaintiff to File a First Amended Complaint and Stay Scheduling Conference Pending Mediation filed by Defendants Image International Manufacturing, LLC, Image International Sales and Marketing Corporation, Janna Ronert, Marc Ronert. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit A to Proposed Order)(Rosenthal, Margaret)
May 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Jesus G. Bernal. Scheduling Conference set for 7/16/2018 at 11:00 AM before Judge Jesus G. Bernal. (ima)
May 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Jesus G. Bernal. (ima)
May 2, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car)
May 2, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Jesus G. Bernal and Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani. (car)
May 1, 2018 CONFORMED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery), filed by Defendants Image International Manufacturing, LLC, Image International Sales and Marketing Corporation. Filed in State Court on 4/30/18 Submitted with Exhibit C Attachment 3 to Notice of Removal #1 (car)
May 1, 2018 CONFORMED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery), filed by Defendants Janna Ronert, Marc Ronert. Filed in State Court on 4/30/18 Submitted with Exhibit B Attachment 2 to Notice of Removal #1 (car)
May 1, 2018 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Does 1-100, Image International Manufacturing, LLC, Image International Sales and Marketing Corporation, Janna Ronert, Marc Ronert. Jury Demanded, filed by plaintiff Lynn Hodge. Filed in State Court on 3/22/18 Submitted with Exhibit A Attachment 1 to Notice of Removal #1 (car)
May 1, 2018 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Image International Manufacturing, LLC, Image International Sales & Marketing Corporation, Janna Ronert, Marc Ronert, identifying Image International Holding Co LLC. (Madoyan, Vartan)
May 1, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendants Image International Manufacturing, LLC, Image International Sales & Marketing Corporation, Janna Ronert, Marc Ronert. (Madoyan, Vartan)
May 1, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from San Bernardino, case number CIVDS1806854 Receipt No: 0973-21681134 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendants Janna Ronert, Marc Ronert, Image International Manufacturing, LLC, Image International Sales & Marketing Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Marc Ronert and Janna Ronert's Answer, #3 Exhibit C - Image International Manufacturing, LLC and Image International Sales & Marketing Corporation) (Attorney Vartan Serge Madoyan added to party Image International Manufacturing, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Vartan Serge Madoyan added to party Image International Sales & Marketing Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney Vartan Serge Madoyan added to party Janna Ronert(pty:dft), Attorney Vartan Serge Madoyan added to party Marc Ronert(pty:dft))(Madoyan, Vartan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lynn Hodge v. Image International Manufacturing, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Image International Manufacturing, LLC
Represented By: Vartan Serge Madoyan
Represented By: Margaret Rosenthal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Image International Sales and Marketing Corporation
Represented By: Vartan Serge Madoyan
Represented By: Margaret Rosenthal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janna Ronert
Represented By: Vartan Serge Madoyan
Represented By: Margaret Rosenthal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marc Ronert
Represented By: Vartan Serge Madoyan
Represented By: Margaret Rosenthal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lynn Hodge
Represented By: Jason T Hatcher
Represented By: Robert M Kitson
Represented By: David P Myers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?