Stephens v. FCI Victorville Medium 2 Medical Staff
Plaintiff: Richard Gene Stephens
Defendant: FCI Victorville Medium 2 Medical Staff
Case Number: 5:2018cv00938
Filed: May 2, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: John E. McDermott
Presiding Judge: John F. Walter
Nature of Suit: Other

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER DISMISSING ACTON FOR FAILURE TO PROSECUTE by Judge John F. Walter. This action is dismissed without prejudice for failure to prosecute. (see document for further details) Case Terminated. Made JS-6. (hr)
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE REGARDING FAILURE TO UPDATE ADDRESS by Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth: Plaintiff is ORDERED TO SHOW CAUSE by no later than August 21, 2019 why this action should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution and failing to comply with the Court's Local Rules. The filing of a Notice of Change of Address on or before August 21, 2019 will discharge this Order to Show Cause. (kh)
June 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY CASE SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED FOR FAILURE TO PAY FILING FEE by Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth. Response to Order to Show Cause due by 6/28/2019. (see document for further details) (hr)
June 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FOR FAILURE TO PAY SUBSEQUENT PARTIAL PAYMENTS OF FILING FEE by Magistrate Judge John E. McDermott. Response to Order to Show Cause due by 7/3/2018. (See document for further details.) (sbou)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stephens v. FCI Victorville Medium 2 Medical Staff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FCI Victorville Medium 2 Medical Staff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Gene Stephens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?