Richard Donastorg v. City of Ontario et al
Plaintiff: Richard Donastorg
Defendant: DOES 1-10, Brennan Falconieri, William Mlodzinski, Flesher, City of Ontario, Joshua Hovey, Brad Kaylor, Gary Crosby, Corey Hettinga, Gabriel Gutierrez, W. Russel, Christian Nelsen, Bryce Wilson, Joe Estrada, Edward Flores, Matthew Ross and Joseph Giallo
Alternative Dispute Resolution (Adr) Provider: Arthur K Cunningham and Richard T. Copeland
Case Number: 5:2018cv00992
Filed: May 7, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Jesus G Bernal
Referring Judge: Sheri Pym
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 11, 2020 Filing 61 NOTICE of Association of Counsel associating attorney Dale K. Galipo on behalf of Plaintiff Richard Donastorg. Filed by Plaintiff Richard Donastorg (Attorney Dale K Galipo added to party Richard Donastorg(pty:pla))(Galipo, Dale)
February 28, 2020 Filing 60 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge Jesus G. Bernal: Order (1) DENYING Defendants Motion for Partial Summary Judgment (Dkt. No. #48 ); and (2) VACATING the March 2, 2020 Hearing. SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. (twdb)
February 17, 2020 Filing 59 Evidentiary Objections in support of re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Plaintiffs Claims 1,2,6,9 and 10 #48 EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS TO PLAINTIFF'S EVIDENCE OFFERED IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT filed by Defendants City of Ontario, Joe Estrada, Brennan Falconieri, Flesher, Edward Flores, Joseph Giallo, Gabriel Gutierrez, Corey Hettinga, Joshua Hovey, William Mlodzinski, Christian Nelsen, Matthew Ross, Bryce Wilson. (Roberts, Daniel)
February 17, 2020 Filing 58 REPLY in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Plaintiffs Claims 1,2,6,9 and 10 #48 filed by Defendants City of Ontario, Joe Estrada, Brennan Falconieri, Flesher, Edward Flores, Joseph Giallo, Gabriel Gutierrez, Corey Hettinga, Joshua Hovey, William Mlodzinski, Christian Nelsen, Matthew Ross, Bryce Wilson. (Roberts, Daniel)
February 15, 2020 Filing 57 STIPULATION to Dismiss Defendants Joshua Hovey, Edward Flores, City of Ontario, Bryce Wilson, Christian Nelsen, Flesher, Joseph Giallo, William Mlodzinski, Matthew Ross, Gabriel Gutierrez, Joe Estrada, Corey Hettinga, Brennan Falconieri filed by Defendants Joshua Hovey, Edward Flores, City of Ontario, Bryce Wilson, Christian Nelsen, Flesher, Joseph Giallo, William Mlodzinski, Matthew Ross, Gabriel Gutierrez, Joe Estrada, Corey Hettinga, Brennan Falconieri.(Roberts, Daniel)
February 12, 2020 Filing 56 STATEMENT of OF CONTROVERTED FACTS AND ADDITIONAL UNCONTROVERTED MATERIAL FACTS IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Plaintiffs Claims 1,2,6,9 and 10 #48 Revised filed by Plaintiff Richard Donastorg. (Terrell, James)
February 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 55 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Jesus G. Bernal: (1) ORDERING Plaintiff to Resubmit Statement of Genuine Disputes (Dkt. No. #54 ). The Court therefore ORDERS Plaintiff to submit a revised PSGD, if any, correcting the deficiencies noted in this Order by February 12, 2020. (twdb)
February 10, 2020 Filing 54 STATEMENT of CONTROVERTED FACTS NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Plaintiffs Claims 1,2,6,9 and 10 #48 filed by Plaintiff Richard Donastorg. (Terrell, James)
February 10, 2020 Filing 53 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Plaintiffs Claims 1,2,6,9 and 10 #48 filed by Plaintiff Richard Donastorg. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of James Terrell, #2 Exhibit Volume of Exhibits, #3 Supplement Notice of Lodging, #4 Proposed Order)(Terrell, James)
February 3, 2020 Filing 52 STATEMENT of REVISED Uncontroverted Facts and Conclusions of Law NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Plaintiffs Claims 1,2,6,9 and 10 #48 filed by Defendants City of Ontario, Joe Estrada, Brennan Falconieri, Flesher, Edward Flores, Joseph Giallo, Gabriel Gutierrez, Corey Hettinga, Joshua Hovey, William Mlodzinski, Christian Nelsen, Matthew Ross, Bryce Wilson. (Roberts, Daniel)
January 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 51 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Jesus G. Bernal: (1) ORDERING Defendants to Resubmit Statement of Undisputed Facts (Dkt. No. #49 ); and (2) CONTINUING the Hearing to March 2, 2020. Accordingly, the Court ORDERS Defendants to resubmit the revised DSUF, if any, on or before February 3, 2020. ( Motion hearing continued to 3/2/2020 at 09:00 AM before Judge Jesus G. Bernal #48 .) (twdb)
January 27, 2020 Filing 50 MEDIATION REPORT Filed by Defendants Gary Crosby, Joe Estrada, Brennan Falconieri, Flesher, Edward Flores, Joseph Giallo, Gabriel Gutierrez, Corey Hettinga, Joshua Hovey, William Mlodzinski, Christian Nelsen, Matthew Ross, Bryce Wilson: Mediation held on January 6, 2020. The parties are unable to reach an agreement at this time.Counsel: Please evaluate the effectiveness of the ADR Program by completing a survey on your mediation experience. To access the survey, click on the following link: #MediationParticipantSurvey(Roberts, Daniel)
January 27, 2020 Filing 49 Proposed Statement of Uncontroverted Facts and Conclusions of Law re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Plaintiffs Claims 1,2,6,9 and 10 #48 filed by Defendants City of Ontario, Joe Estrada, Brennan Falconieri, Flesher, Edward Flores, Joseph Giallo, Gabriel Gutierrez, Corey Hettinga, Joshua Hovey, William Mlodzinski, Christian Nelsen, Matthew Ross, Bryce Wilson. (Roberts, Daniel)
January 27, 2020 Filing 48 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Plaintiffs Claims 1,2,6,9 and 10 filed by Defendants City of Ontario, Joe Estrada, Brennan Falconieri, Flesher, Edward Flores, Joseph Giallo, Gabriel Gutierrez, Corey Hettinga, Joshua Hovey, William Mlodzinski, Christian Nelsen, Matthew Ross, Bryce Wilson. Motion set for hearing on 2/24/2020 at 09:00 AM before Judge Jesus G. Bernal. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit Separate Volume of Exhibits, #3 Exhibit Notice of Lodging Non-Paper Physical Exhibit, #4 Proposed Order) (Roberts, Daniel)
November 5, 2019 Filing 47 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT of Panel Mediator. Mediator (ADR Panel) Richard T. Copeland has been assigned to serve as Panel Mediator. (jcu)
November 4, 2019 Filing 46 STIPULATION REGARDING SELECTION of Panel Mediator filed. Parties stipulate that Richard Copeland may serve as Panel Mediator. Plaintiff obtained the Panel Mediators consent to serve. All parties and the Panel Mediator have agreed that the mediation will be held on 1/7/2020 and counsel will submit mediation statements seven (7) calendar days before the session. Filed by Defendant City of Ontario(Roberts, Daniel)
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER GRANTING LEAVE OF COURT TO TAKE PLAINTIFFS DEPOSITION IN HIS PLACE OFCONFINEMENT by Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym (SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS). (kca)
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER by Judge Jesus G. Bernal, Approving Parties Second Stipulation and Joint Request to Continue Discovery, Motion, and Trial Dates in Light of Plaintiff's Incarceration on New Charges #42 , The deadlines and hearings originally scheduled have been rescheduled. Discovery cut-off 12/16/2019., Dispositive Motions due by 2/24/2020., Last date to conduct settlement conference is 1/10/2020., Final Pretrial Conference continued to 5/4/2020 at 11:00 AM before Judge Jesus G. Bernal., Jury Trial continued to 5/19/2020 at 09:00 AM before Judge Jesus G. Bernal. SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. (twdb)
August 2, 2019 Filing 43 Joint STIPULATION for Leave to Take Deposition of Deponent Confined in Prison filed by Defendants City of Ontario, Joe Estrada, Brennan Falconieri, Flesher, Edward Flores, Gabriel Gutierrez, Corey Hettinga, Joshua Hovey, William Mlodzinski, Christian Nelsen, Matthew Ross, Bryce Wilson. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Roberts, Daniel)
August 2, 2019 Filing 42 Joint STIPULATION to Continue Discovery Motion, and Trial Dates from January 21, 2020 filed by Defendants City of Ontario, Joe Estrada, Brennan Falconieri, Flesher, Edward Flores, Gabriel Gutierrez, Corey Hettinga, Joshua Hovey, William Mlodzinski, Christian Nelsen, Matthew Ross, Bryce Wilson. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Roberts, Daniel)
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 41 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym(SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. (kca)
July 9, 2019 Filing 40 STIPULATION for Protective Order filed by Defendants City of Ontario, Joe Estrada, Brennan Falconieri, Flesher, Edward Flores, Joseph Giallo, Gabriel Gutierrez, Corey Hettinga, Joshua Hovey, William Mlodzinski, Christian Nelsen, Matthew Ross, Bryce Wilson. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Roberts, Daniel)
July 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER by Judge Jesus G. Bernal, Approving Stipulation and Joint Request for Extension of Expert Disclosures and Expert Deposition Cutoff #38 . All other provisions of this Courts Civil Trial Scheduling Order (Docket No. #32 ), as amended (Docket No. #37 ) are unchanged by this Order. (twdb)
July 3, 2019 Filing 38 Joint STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File EXTENSION OF EXPERT DISCLOSURES AND EXPERT DEPOSITION CUTOFF filed by Defendants City of Ontario, Joe Estrada, Brennan Falconieri, Flesher, Edward Flores, Joseph Giallo, Gabriel Gutierrez, Corey Hettinga, Joshua Hovey, William Mlodzinski, Christian Nelsen, Matthew Ross, Bryce Wilson. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Roberts, Daniel)
May 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER by Judge Jesus G. Bernal, Approving Parties Stipulation for Continuance of Discovery, Motion, and Trial Dates in Light of Plaintiff's Incarceration and Amending Civil Trial Scheduling Order #36 . Discovery cut-off 8/19/2019., Dispositive Motions due by 10/28/2019., Last date to conduct settlement conference is 9/13/2019., Final Pretrial Conference continued to 1/6/2020 at 11:00 AM before Judge Jesus G. Bernal., Jury Trial continued to 1/21/2020 at 09:00 AM before Judge Jesus G. Bernal. SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. (twdb)
May 3, 2019 Filing 36 Joint STIPULATION to Dismiss Defendant Brad Kaylor filed by Defendants Joshua Hovey, Edward Flores, Brad Kaylor, City of Ontario, Bryce Wilson, Christian Nelsen, Flesher, Gary Crosby, Joseph Giallo, William Mlodzinski, Matthew Ross, W. Russel, Gabriel Gutierrez, Joe Estrada, Corey Hettinga, Brennan Falconieri.(Roberts, Daniel)
May 3, 2019 Filing 35 Joint STIPULATION to Continue Trial, Discovery and Motion dates from October 22, 2019 to January 21,2020 filed by Defendants City of Ontario, Gary Crosby, Joe Estrada, Brennan Falconieri, Flesher, Edward Flores, Joseph Giallo, Gabriel Gutierrez, Corey Hettinga, Joshua Hovey, Brad Kaylor, William Mlodzinski, Christian Nelsen, Matthew Ross, W. Russel, Bryce Wilson. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Roberts, Daniel)
March 29, 2019 Filing 34 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT of Panel Mediator. Mediator (ADR Panel) Arthur K Cunningham has been assigned to serve as Panel Mediator. (mb)
December 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER/REFERRAL to ADR Procedure No 2 by Judge Jesus G. Bernal. Case ordered to Court Mediation Panel for mediation. ADR Proceeding to be held no later than 7/15/19. (twdb)
December 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 32 CIVIL TRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER by Judge Jesus G. Bernal. Amended Pleadings due by 11/26/2018. Discovery cut-off 6/17/2019. Motions hearing deadline 8/26/2019. Last date to conduct settlement conference is 7/15/2019 (Panel). Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/7/2019 at 11:00 AM before Judge Jesus G. Bernal. Jury Trial set for 10/22/2019 at 09:00 AM before Judge Jesus G. Bernal. (iva)
October 25, 2018 Filing 30 STIPULATION to Dismiss Defendants Gary Crosby, W. Russel filed by Defendants Joshua Hovey, Edward Flores, Brad Kaylor, City of Ontario, DOES, Bryce Wilson, Christian Nelsen, Flesher, Gary Crosby, Joseph Giallo, William Mlodzinski, Matthew Ross, W. Russel, Gabriel Gutierrez, Joe Estrada, Corey Hettinga, Brennan Falconieri.(Attorney Daniel S Roberts added to party DOES(pty:dft))(Roberts, Daniel)
October 22, 2018 Filing 31 MINUTES OF Scheduling Conference held before Judge Jesus G. Bernal. A trial schedule was set. See separate trial scheduling order for more details. Amended Pleadings due by 11/26/2018. All Discovery cut-off (including hearing all discovery motions 6/17/2019. Last Date to Hear Non-discovery Motions 8/26/2019. Last date to conduct settlement conference is 7/15/2019. Final Pretrial Conference set for 11/7/2019 at 11:00 AM before Judge Jesus G. Bernal. Jury Trial set for 10/22/2019 at 09:00 AM before Judge Jesus G. Bernal. SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. Court Reporter: Adele C. Frazier. (twdb)
October 5, 2018 Filing 29 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 4-5, filed by Plaintiff Richard Donastorg.. (Brunner, Sharon)
September 5, 2018 Filing 28 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Business or Contact Information: for attorney Daniel S Roberts counsel for Defendants City of Ontario, Gary Crosby, Joe Estrada, Brennan Falconieri, Flesher, Edward Flores, Joseph Giallo, Gabriel Gutierrez, Corey Hettinga, Joshua Hovey, Brad Kaylor, William Mlodzinski, Christian Nelsen, Matthew Ross, W. Russel, Bryce Wilson. Changing Firm Name to Cole Huber LLP. Changing Email to droberts@colehuber.com. Filed by Defendants Daniel S. Roberts. (Roberts, Daniel)
August 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Jesus G. Bernal. Scheduling Conference set for 10/22/2018 at 11:00 AM before Judge Jesus G. Bernal. (ima)
August 17, 2018 Filing 26 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants City of Ontario, Gary Crosby, Joe Estrada, Brennan Falconieri, Flesher, Edward Flores, Joseph Giallo, Gabriel Gutierrez, Corey Hettinga, Joshua Hovey, Brad Kaylor, William Mlodzinski, Christian Nelsen, Matthew Ross, W. Russel, Bryce Wilson, identifying Association of California Cities Excess Liability. (Roberts, Daniel)
August 17, 2018 Filing 25 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendants City of Ontario, Gary Crosby, Joe Estrada, Brennan Falconieri, Flesher, Edward Flores, Joseph Giallo, Gabriel Gutierrez, Corey Hettinga, Joshua Hovey, Brad Kaylor, William Mlodzinski, Christian Nelsen, Matthew Ross, W. Russel, Bryce Wilson.(Roberts, Daniel)
July 12, 2018 Filing 24 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Joshua Hovey answer now due 8/17/2018; Edward Flores answer now due 8/17/2018; Brad Kaylor answer now due 8/17/2018; City of Ontario answer now due 8/17/2018; Bryce Wilson answer now due 8/17/2018; Christian Nelsen answer now due 8/17/2018; Flesher answer now due 8/17/2018; Gary Crosby answer now due 8/17/2018; Joseph Giallo answer now due 8/17/2018; William Mlodzinski answer now due 8/17/2018; Matthew Ross answer now due 8/17/2018; W. Russel answer now due 8/17/2018; Gabriel Gutierrez answer now due 8/17/2018; Joe Estrada answer now due 8/17/2018; Corey Hettinga answer now due 8/17/2018; Brennan Falconieri answer now due 8/17/2018, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendants Joshua Hovey; Edward Flores; Brad Kaylor; City of Ontario; Bryce Wilson; Christian Nelsen; Flesher; Gary Crosby; Joseph Giallo; William Mlodzinski; Matthew Ross; W. Russel; Gabriel Gutierrez; Joe Estrada; Corey Hettinga; Brennan Falconieri.(Attorney Daniel S Roberts added to party City of Ontario(pty:dft), Attorney Daniel S Roberts added to party Gary Crosby(pty:dft), Attorney Daniel S Roberts added to party Joe Estrada(pty:dft), Attorney Daniel S Roberts added to party Brennan Falconieri(pty:dft), Attorney Daniel S Roberts added to party Flesher(pty:dft), Attorney Daniel S Roberts added to party Edward Flores(pty:dft), Attorney Daniel S Roberts added to party Joseph Giallo(pty:dft), Attorney Daniel S Roberts added to party Gabriel Gutierrez(pty:dft), Attorney Daniel S Roberts added to party Corey Hettinga(pty:dft), Attorney Daniel S Roberts added to party Joshua Hovey(pty:dft), Attorney Daniel S Roberts added to party Brad Kaylor(pty:dft), Attorney Daniel S Roberts added to party William Mlodzinski(pty:dft), Attorney Daniel S Roberts added to party Christian Nelsen(pty:dft), Attorney Daniel S Roberts added to party Matthew Ross(pty:dft), Attorney Daniel S Roberts added to party W. Russel(pty:dft), Attorney Daniel S Roberts added to party Bryce Wilson(pty:dft))(Roberts, Daniel)
June 28, 2018 Filing 23 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Richard Donastorg, upon Defendant City of Ontario served on 6/27/2018, answer due 7/18/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Karen Morrison, records coordinator in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Terrell, James)
June 28, 2018 Filing 22 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Richard Donastorg, upon Defendant Brad Kaylor served on 6/27/2018, answer due 7/18/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Karen Morrison, records coordinator in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Terrell, James)
June 28, 2018 Filing 21 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Richard Donastorg, upon Defendant Gary Crosby served on 6/27/2018, answer due 7/18/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Karen Morrison, records coordinator in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Terrell, James)
June 28, 2018 Filing 20 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Richard Donastorg, upon Defendant Joe Estrada served on 6/27/2018, answer due 7/18/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Karen Morrison, records coordinator in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Terrell, James)
June 28, 2018 Filing 19 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Richard Donastorg, upon Defendant Brennan Falconieri served on 6/27/2018, answer due 7/18/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Karen Morrison, records coordinator in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Terrell, James)
June 28, 2018 Filing 18 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Richard Donastorg, upon Defendant Flesher served on 6/27/2018, answer due 7/18/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Karen Morrison, records coordinator in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Terrell, James)
June 28, 2018 Filing 17 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Richard Donastorg, upon Defendant Edward Flores served on 6/27/2018, answer due 7/18/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Karen Morrison, records coordinator in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Terrell, James)
June 28, 2018 Filing 16 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Richard Donastorg, upon Defendant Gabriel Gutierrez served on 6/27/2018, answer due 7/18/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Karen Morrison, records coordinator in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Terrell, James)
June 28, 2018 Filing 15 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Richard Donastorg, upon Defendant Joseph Giallo served on 6/27/2018, answer due 7/18/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Karen Morrison, records coordinator by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Terrell, James)
June 28, 2018 Filing 14 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Richard Donastorg, upon Defendant Corey Hettinga served on 6/27/2018, answer due 7/18/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Karen Morrison, records coordinator in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Terrell, James)
June 28, 2018 Filing 13 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Richard Donastorg, upon Defendant Joshua Hovey served on 6/27/2018, answer due 7/18/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Karen Morrison, records coordinator in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Terrell, James)
June 28, 2018 Filing 12 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Richard Donastorg, upon Defendant William Mlodzinski served on 6/27/2018, answer due 7/18/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Karen Morrison, records coordinator in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Terrell, James)
June 28, 2018 Filing 11 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Richard Donastorg, upon Defendant Matthew Ross served on 6/27/2018, answer due 7/18/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Karen Morrison, records coordinator in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Terrell, James)
June 28, 2018 Filing 10 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Richard Donastorg, upon Defendant W. Russel served on 6/27/2018, answer due 7/18/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Karen Morrison, records coordinator in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Terrell, James)
June 28, 2018 Filing 9 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Richard Donastorg, upon Defendant Bryce Wilson served on 6/27/2018, answer due 7/18/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Karen Morrison, records coordinator in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Terrell, James)
May 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Jesus G. Bernal. (ima)
May 9, 2018 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants City of Ontario, Gary Crosby, Joe Estrada, Brennan Falconieri, Flesher, Edward Flores, Joseph Giallo, Gabriel Gutierrez, Corey Hettinga, Joshua Hovey, Brad Kaylor, William Mlodzinski, Christian Nelsen, Matthew Ross, W. Russel, Bryce Wilson. (jtil)
May 9, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
May 9, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Jesus G. Bernal and Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym. (jtil)
May 7, 2018 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #3 filed by plaintiff RICHARD DONASTORG. (Terrell, James)
May 7, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by plaintiff RICHARD DONASTORG, identifying defendants. (Terrell, James)
May 7, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff RICHARD DONASTORG. (Terrell, James)
May 7, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-21712992 - Fee: $400, filed by plaintiff RICHARD DONASTORG. (Attorney James Stephen Terrell added to party RICHARD DONASTORG(pty:pla))(Terrell, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Richard Donastorg v. City of Ontario et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1-10
Represented By: Daniel S Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brennan Falconieri
Represented By: Daniel S Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Mlodzinski
Represented By: Daniel S Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Flesher
Represented By: Daniel S Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Ontario
Represented By: Daniel S Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joshua Hovey
Represented By: Daniel S Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brad Kaylor
Represented By: Daniel S Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary Crosby
Represented By: Daniel S Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corey Hettinga
Represented By: Daniel S Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gabriel Gutierrez
Represented By: Daniel S Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: W. Russel
Represented By: Daniel S Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christian Nelsen
Represented By: Daniel S Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bryce Wilson
Represented By: Daniel S Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joe Estrada
Represented By: Daniel S Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edward Flores
Represented By: Daniel S Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Ross
Represented By: Daniel S Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Giallo
Represented By: Daniel S Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Donastorg
Represented By: James Stephen Terrell
Represented By: Sharon J Brunner
Represented By: Dale K Galipo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Alternative dispute resolution (adr) provider: Arthur K Cunningham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Alternative dispute resolution (adr) provider: Richard T. Copeland
Represented By: Richard T Copeland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?