Jace Nash v. Nancy A. Berryhill
Plaintiff: Jace Nash
Defendant: Nancy A Berryhill
Case Number: 5:2018cv01497
Filed: July 16, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Douglas F McCormick
Referring Judge: Fernando M Olguin
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 21, 2018 Filing 13 NOTICE TO COUNSEL: ALL PARTIES having consented to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge, this case has been reassigned to Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick for all further proceedings. Please use the case number EDCV18-1497 DFM on all documents subsequently filed to ensure the proper routing of all filings. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. TEXT ONLY ENTRY. (sn)
August 20, 2018 Filing 12 CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by Defendant Nancy A Berryhill. (Attorney Patrick W Snyder added to party Nancy A Berryhill(pty:dft))(Snyder, Patrick)
August 15, 2018 Filing 11 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Jace Nash, upon Defendant Nancy A Berryhill served on 8/6/2018, answer due 10/5/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the United States Attorneys Office by delivering a copy to FLABIA DE LA ROSA. Executed upon the Attorney Generals Office of the United States by delivering a copy to CLERK. Executed upon the officer agency or corporation by delivering a copy to CIVIL PROCESS CLERK. Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt NOT attached. Original Summons returned. (LaTour, Bill)
August 15, 2018 Filing 10 CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by PLAINTIFF Jace Nash. (LaTour, Bill)
July 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick re: Procedures in Social Security Appeal. (nbo)
July 31, 2018 Filing 8 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Nancy A Berryhill. (nbo)
July 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick: granting #5 APPLICATION to Proceed in Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60). (nbo)
July 16, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin and referred to Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick. (esa)
July 16, 2018 Filing 5 REQUEST to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, Declaration in Support filed by PLAINTIFF JACE NASH. (LaTour, Bill)
July 16, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by PLAINTIFF JACE NASH, (LaTour, Bill)
July 16, 2018 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 filed by PLAINTIFF JACE NASH. (LaTour, Bill)
July 16, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff JACE NASH. (LaTour, Bill)
July 16, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with In Forma Pauperis request, filed by PLAINTIFF JACE NASH. (Attorney Bill LaTour added to party JACE NASH(pty:pla))(LaTour, Bill)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jace Nash v. Nancy A. Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jace Nash
Represented By: Bill LaTour
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy A Berryhill
Represented By: Assistant US Attorney LA-CV
Represented By: Assistant US Attorney LA-SSA
Represented By: Patrick W Snyder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?