Ben Kwok v. La Looga Clothing et al

Plaintiff: Ben Kwok
Defendant: La Looga Clothing, DOES 1 through 10, inclusive, and Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Case Number: 5:2018cv02146
Filed: October 8, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
0 Judge: Jesus G Bernal
1 Judge: Sheri Pym
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 16, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Jesus G. Bernal. Scheduling Conference set for 2/4/2019 at 11:00 AM before Judge Jesus G. Bernal. (ima)
November 15, 2018 Filing 13 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by defendant La Looga Clothing, identifying Dorje Gurung dba La Looga Clothing. (Gross, Kenneth)
November 13, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #11 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 7.1-1 No Notice of Interested Parties and/or no copies. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (twdb)
November 12, 2018 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 by DORJE GURUNG, dba LA LOOGA CLOTHING filed by defendant La Looga Clothing.(Attorney Kenneth I Gross added to party La Looga Clothing(pty:dft))(Gross, Kenneth)
November 7, 2018 Filing 10 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Ben Kwok, upon Defendant La Looga Clothing served on 10/29/2018, answer due 11/19/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Nancy Chung - Associate in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Novian, Farhad)
October 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Jesus G. Bernal. (ima)
October 11, 2018 Filing 8 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant La Looga Clothing. (jp)
October 11, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jp)
October 11, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Jesus G. Bernal and Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym. (jp)
October 8, 2018 Filing 5 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Ben Kwok. (Novian, Farhad)
October 8, 2018 Filing 4 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by Ben Kwok. (Novian, Farhad)
October 8, 2018 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Ben Kwok. (Novian, Farhad)
October 8, 2018 Filing 2 CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Ben Kwok, identifying Ben Kwok; La Looga Clothing. (Novian, Farhad)
October 8, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-22541936 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Ben Kwok. (Attorney Farhad Novian added to party Ben Kwok(pty:pla))(Novian, Farhad)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ben Kwok v. La Looga Clothing et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: La Looga Clothing
Represented By: Kenneth I Gross
Represented By: Thomas D Shambaugh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 through 10, inclusive,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ben Kwok
Represented By: Farhad Novian
Represented By: Jorge Nicolas Anwandter
Represented By: Sharon Raminfard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?