Harold Taylor v. Dean Borders et al
Plaintiff: David M. Ziemke, Bruce Koklich, Ronald E. Austin, Jon Gary Schnabel, George Jackson, Harold Taylor and Christopher Camp
Defendant: Isaac Morales, S. Almosara, California Institution For Men, T. Lee, J. Core, Dean Borders, B. Casterena, California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation, K. Torres, T. Lambert, M. Dunlap, Bill Borilla, Julie Cavender and Does 1 through 20
Case Number: 5:2018cv02488
Filed: November 27, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Andre Birotte
Referring Judge: Alicia G Rosenberg
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 31, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 31, 2018 Filing 16 Mail Returned addressed to David M. Ziemke re Report #6 . Unable to forward. (hr)
December 27, 2018 Filing 17 NOTICE of Fiduciary Duty of Bruce Koklich to Pursue Causes of Action on Behalf of Real Party in Interest, Estate of Bruce Brooks filed by Plaintiff Bruce Koklich.(hr)
December 20, 2018 Filing 15 Mail Returned addressed to David M. Ziemke re Deficiency in Subsequent Prioner Filing (CV-12A) #5 . Return to sender. Refused. (Attachments: #1 Part 2, #2 Part 3, #3 Part 4, #4 Part 5) (hr)
December 20, 2018 Filing 14 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff Harold Taylor, re Notice of Reference to US Magistrate Judge (CV-25) #3 served on December 18, 2018.(hr)
December 18, 2018 Filing 13 Subsequent NOTICE OF LODGING of Exhibits One Through Fourteen Relates to Doc. #1 Complaint and Doc. #5 Order filed by Plaintiff Harold Taylor (Attachments: #1 Part 2, #2 Part 3, #3 Part 4, #4 Part 5, #5 Part 6, #6 Part 7, #7 Part 8, #8 Part 9, #9 Part 10)(hr)
December 12, 2018 Filing 12 REQUEST to Proceed Without Prepayment of Filing Fees With Declaration in Support filed by Plaintiff George Jackson.(hr)
December 12, 2018 Filing 11 REQUEST to Proceed Without Prepayment of Filing Fees With Declaration in Support filed by Plaintiff Christopher Camp.(hr)
December 12, 2018 Filing 10 REQUEST to Proceed Without Prepayment of Filing Fees With Declaration in Support filed by Plaintiff Ronald E. Austin.(hr)
December 12, 2018 Filing 9 REQUEST to Proceed Without Prepayment of Filing Fees With Declaration in Support filed by Plaintiff Bruce Koklich.(hr)
December 12, 2018 Filing 8 REQUEST to Proceed Without Prepayment of Filing Fees With Declaration in Support filed by Plaintiff Jon Gary Schnabel.(hr)
December 12, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE OF LODGING of Five Requests to Proceed In Forma Pauperis filed by Plaintiff Harold Taylor (hr)
December 12, 2018 Filing 6 INMATE STATEMENT REPORT filed by Plaintiff Harold Taylor. (hr)
December 7, 2018 Filing 5 Notice of Deficiency. On 12/4/2018, the Court received, through the United States Mail, the attached document for filing in the above-captioned case, which alleges claims arising under 42 U.S.C. 1983. Please be advised that the Court and California Institute for Men (CIM) are participants in a pilot project that requires all such documents to be scanned and submitted to the Court by electronic mail, General Order No. 18-02. To submit a document for filing in this case, you must present it to designated staff at your facility for scanning and emailing to the Court. If you are unable to comply with these procedures, you must submit with your document(s) a motion for leave to file your documents by U.S. Mail that demonstrates good cause for your inability to submit your documents to the Court electronically. Submission of this document by U.S. Mail violates the terms of General Order 18-02, it is hereby ORDERED that the document(s) be rejected. You must now re-submit your document(s) to the Court electronically, in accordance to General Order 18-02 and your institution's policies. If you fail to do so, the document(s) will not be filed and will not be considered by the court. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Lodgement (Part 1), #2 Notice of Lodgement (Part 2)) (kl)
November 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS): ORDER RE FURTHER PROCEEDINGS ON REQUEST FOR PROCEED WITHOUT PREPAYMENT OF FILING FEES #2 by Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. IT IS ORDERED that, on or before December 21, 2018, Plaintiffs David M. Ziemke, Jon Gary Schnabel, Bruce Koklich, Ronald E. Austin, Christopher Camp and George Jackson shall either (1) file a request to proceed without prepayment of filing fees (Form CV-60P) or (2) pay one filing fee of $400. (see order for further details) (hr)
November 27, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Andre Birotte Jr and referred to Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. (car)
November 27, 2018 Filing 2 REQUEST to Proceed Without Prepayment of Filing Fees with Declaration in Support filed by plaintiff Harold Taylor. (car)
November 27, 2018 Filing 1 CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT filed against Defendants pursuant to 42 USC 1983. Case assigned to Judge Andre Birotte Jr and referred to Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg, filed by plaintiffs Harold Taylor, Ronald E. Austin, Christopher Camp, Bruce Koklich(as Attorney in Fact for the Estate of Bruce Brooks), Jon Gary Schnabel, David M. Ziemke, George Jackson, Bruce Koklich(individually and as Class Representatives) (Attachments: #1 Part 2 of Complaint, #2 Part 3 of Complaint) (car)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harold Taylor v. Dean Borders et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Isaac Morales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. Almosara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Institution For Men
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T. Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Core
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dean Borders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B. Casterena
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K. Torres
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T. Lambert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Dunlap
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bill Borilla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Julie Cavender
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 20
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David M. Ziemke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bruce Koklich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald E. Austin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jon Gary Schnabel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harold Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Camp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?