Marcus Hurst v. Neovia Logistics Distribution LP et al

Plaintiff: Marcus Hurst
Defendant: Neovia Logistics Distribution, LP, Neovia Logistics Services, LLC and Does 1 through 25, inclusive
Case Number: 5:2018cv02556
Filed: December 5, 2018
Court: California Central District Court
0 Judge: Jesus G Bernal
1 Judge: Shashi H Kewalramani
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 18, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 18, 2018 Opinion or Order 13 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Jesus G. Bernal. Scheduling Conference set for 3/11/2019 at 11:00 AM before Judge Jesus G. Bernal. (jlo)
December 13, 2018 Opinion or Order 12 STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Jesus G. Bernal. (ima)
December 12, 2018 11 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Young W Ryu counsel for Plaintiff Marcus Hurst. Adding Catherine Wagner Calderaro as counsel of record for Marcus Hurst for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Marcus Hurst. (Ryu, Young)
December 12, 2018 10 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Young W Ryu counsel for Plaintiff Marcus Hurst. Jesse Yanco is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff's Counsel Marcus Hurst. (Ryu, Young)
December 12, 2018 9 Notice of Electronic Filing re Notice of Assignment to United States Judges(CV-18) - optional html form #7 , Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form #8 , Answer to Complaint (Discovery), Complaint - (Discovery), e-mailed to Jesse Yanco at jesse.yanco@loywr.com bounced due to 5.1.0 - Unknown address error 550-"5.1.1 The email account that you tried to reach does not exist.. The primary e-mail address associated with the attorney record has been deleted. Pursuant to Local Rules it is the attorneys obligation to maintain all personal contact information including e-mail address in the CM/ECF system. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (ir) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
December 7, 2018 8 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car)
December 7, 2018 7 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Jesus G. Bernal and Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani. (car)
December 5, 2018 CONFORMED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery), filed by Defendants Neovia Logistics Distribution, LP, Neovia Logistics Services, LLC. Filed in State Court on 12/4/18 Submitted with attachment 6 to notice of removal #1 (car)
December 5, 2018 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Does 1 through 25, inclusive, Neovia Logistics Distribution, LP, Neovia Logistics Services, LLC. Jury Demanded, filed by plaintiff Marcus Hurst. Filed in State Court on 9/25/18 Submitted with attachment 3 to notice of removal #1 (car)
December 5, 2018 6 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendants Neovia Logistics Distribution, LP, Neovia Logistics Services, LLC, re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 Removal and all Corresponding Documents served on 12/05/2018. (Hintze, Cristen)
December 5, 2018 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Movants Neovia Logistics Distribution, LP, Neovia Logistics Services, LLC (Hintze, Cristen)
December 5, 2018 4 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Neovia Logistics Distribution, LP, Neovia Logistics Services, LLC, (Hintze, Cristen)
December 5, 2018 3 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Defendants Neovia Logistics Distribution, LP, Neovia Logistics Services, LLC. (Hintze, Cristen)
December 5, 2018 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Movants Neovia Logistics Distribution, LP, Neovia Logistics Services, LLC. (Hintze, Cristen)
December 5, 2018 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from San Bernardino Superior Court, case number CIVDS1825248 Receipt No: 0973-22847252 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendants Neovia Logistics Services, LLC, Neovia Logistics Distribution, LP. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Eric Almaraz, #2 Declaration of Rebecca Aragon, #3 Exhibit A to Aragon Decl., #4 Exhibit B to Aragon Decl., #5 Exhibit C to Aragon Decl., #6 Exhibit D to Aragon Decl.) (Attorney Cristen Rebekah Hintze added to party Neovia Logistics Distribution, LP(pty:bkmov), Attorney Cristen Rebekah Hintze added to party Neovia Logistics Services, LLC(pty:bkmov))(Hintze, Cristen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Marcus Hurst v. Neovia Logistics Distribution LP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Neovia Logistics Distribution, LP
Represented By: Cristen Rebekah Hintze
Represented By: Rebecca M Aragon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Neovia Logistics Services, LLC
Represented By: Cristen Rebekah Hintze
Represented By: Rebecca M Aragon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 25, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marcus Hurst
Represented By: Young W Ryu
Represented By: Jesse Yanco
Represented By: Catherine Wagner Calderaro
Represented By: Sarah Kristina Sterling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?