Ernesto Torres et al v. United States Department of Homeland Security et al
Plaintiff: DESMOND TENGHE, Immigrant Defenders Law Center, Ernesto Torres, American Immigration Lawyers Association, JASON NSINANO and Jason Sinagwana Nsinano
Defendant: United States Department of Homeland Security, Secretary Kirstjen M. Nielsen, Field Office Directo David Marin, Orange County Sheriffs Department, Acting Director Ronald D. Vitiello, Geo Group, Inc., United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement, David Marin, Ronald D. Vitiello and Kirstjen M. Nielsen
Case Number: 5:2018cv02604
Filed: December 14, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Jesus G Bernal
Referring Judge: Shashi H Kewalramani
Nature of Suit: Other Immigration Actions
Cause of Action: 05:702
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER granting Stipulation to Extend Time to Answer (More than 30 days) and to Set Coordinated Briefing Schedule, by Judge Jesus G. Bernal #58 . Defendants Geo Group, Inc. answer due 5/18/2019; Orange County Sheriffs Department answer due 5/18/2019. Plaintiffs shall have until May 1, 2019 to file oppositions to any motions made by GEO and OCSD; GEO and OCSD shall have until May 15, 2019 to file replies to any oppositions filed by Plaintiffs. (twdb)
February 4, 2019 Filing 58 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to March 18, 2019 re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, 1 filed by defendant Geo Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Alex Linhardt ISO Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond, #2 Proposed Order Granting Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond)(Linhardt, Alexander)
February 1, 2019 Filing 57 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Alexander Lloyd Linhardt on behalf of Defendant Geo Group, Inc. (Attorney Alexander Lloyd Linhardt added to party Geo Group, Inc. (pty:dft))(Linhardt, Alexander)
January 22, 2019 Filing 56 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Jason Sinagwana Nsinano, Desmond Tenghe, American Immigration Lawyers Association, Ernesto Torres, Immigrant Defenders Law Center, upon Defendant David Marin served on 12/27/2018, answer due 2/25/2019; Kirstjen M. Nielsen served on 12/27/2018, answer due 2/25/2019; United States Department of Homeland Security served on 12/27/2018, answer due 2/25/2019; United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement served on 12/27/2018, answer due 2/25/2019; Ronald D. Vitiello served on 12/27/2018, answer due 2/25/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the United States Attorneys Office by delivering a copy to I. Dela Rosa, Civil Process Clerk. Executed upon the Attorney Generals Office of the United States by delivering a copy to Judy Aase, Clerk. Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt attached. Original Summons NOT returned. (Attachments: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt for US Attorney for Central District, #2 Certified Mail Return Receipt for US Attorney General)(Griffin, Christopher)
January 22, 2019 Filing 55 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Jason Sinagwana Nsinano, Desmond Tenghe, American Immigration Lawyers Association, Ernesto Torres, Immigrant Defenders Law Center, upon Defendant Geo Group, Inc. served on 12/21/2018, answer due 2/8/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon RAZUIR RAHMAN, PROCESS MANAGER/CORPORATE CREATIONS NETWORK INC., REGISTERED AGENT in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Griffin, Christopher)
January 22, 2019 Filing 54 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Jason Sinagwana Nsinano, Desmond Tenghe, American Immigration Lawyers Association, Ernesto Torres, Immigrant Defenders Law Center, upon Defendant Orange County Sheriffs Department served on 12/21/2018, answer due 2/11/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Olivia Galvan, Deputy Clerk in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Griffin, Christopher)
January 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 53 STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Jesus G. Bernal. (ima)
January 7, 2019 Filing 52 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Orange County Sheriffs Department answer now due 2/11/2019, re Summons Issued #37 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, 1 filed by Defendant Orange County Sheriffs Department.(Miller, Steven)
January 7, 2019 Filing 51 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Steven C Miller counsel for Defendant Orange County Sheriffs Department. Adding Steven C. Miller as counsel of record for Orange County Sheriff's Department for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Orange County Sheriff's Department. (Attorney Steven C Miller added to party Orange County Sheriffs Department(pty:dft))(Miller, Steven)
January 7, 2019 Filing 50 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Adam Clanton counsel for Defendant Orange County Sheriffs Department. Adding Adam C. Clanton as counsel of record for Orange County Sheriff's Department for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Orange County Sheriff's Department. (Attorney Adam Clanton added to party Orange County Sheriffs Department(pty:dft))(Clanton, Adam)
January 7, 2019 Filing 49 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Carolyn Mary Khouzam counsel for Defendant Orange County Sheriffs Department. Adding Carolyn M. Khouzam as counsel of record for Orange County Sheriff's Department for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Orange County Sheriff's Department. (Attorney Carolyn Mary Khouzam added to party Orange County Sheriffs Department(pty:dft))(Khouzam, Carolyn)
January 7, 2019 Filing 48 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Kayla Nicole Watson counsel for Defendant Orange County Sheriffs Department. Adding Kayla N. Watson as counsel of record for Orange County Sheriff's Department for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Orange County Sheriff's Department. (Attorney Kayla Nicole Watson added to party Orange County Sheriffs Department(pty:dft))(Watson, Kayla)
January 7, 2019 Filing 47 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Geo Group, Inc. answer now due 2/8/2019, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, 1 filed by Defendant Geo Group, Inc..(Herrington, Robert)
January 4, 2019 Filing 46 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Robert J Herrington on behalf of Defendant Geo Group, Inc. (Attorney Robert J Herrington added to party Geo Group, Inc. (pty:dft))(Herrington, Robert)
December 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER by Judge Jesus G. Bernal: Granting #40 Non-Resident Attorney Christopher M. Assise APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defender Law Center, designating Sean A. Commons as local counsel. (twdb)
December 26, 2018 Filing 43 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), 1 as to defendant Ronald D. Vitiello c/o Office of the General Counsel. (twdb)
December 26, 2018 Filing 42 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), 1 as to defendant United States Department of Homeland Security. (twdb)
December 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER by Judge Jesus G. Bernal: granting #41 Non-Resident Attorney Theodore R. Scarborough APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Ernesto Torres, Desmond Tenghe, et at., Plaintiffs, designating Sean A. Commons as local counsel. (twdb) .
December 21, 2018 Filing 41 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Theodore R. Scarborough to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs American Immigration Lawyers Association, Immigrant Defenders Law Center, Jason Nsinano, Desmond Tenghe, Ernesto Torres (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-22943759) filed by Plaintiffs American Immigration Lawyers Association, Immigrant Defenders Law Center, Jason Nsinano, Desmond Tenghe, Ernesto Torres. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order) (Commons, Sean)
December 21, 2018 Filing 40 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Christopher M. Assise to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs American Immigration Lawyers Association, Immigrant Defenders Law Center, Jason Nsinano, Desmond Tenghe, Ernesto Torres (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-22943567) filed by Plaintiffs American Immigration Lawyers Association, Immigrant Defenders Law Center, Jason Nsinano, Desmond Tenghe, Ernesto Torres. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order) (Commons, Sean)
December 20, 2018 Filing 39 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, 1 filed by Plaintiffs American Immigration Lawyers Association, Immigrant Defenders Law Center, Jason Nsinano, Desmond Tenghe, Ernesto Torres. (Griffin, Christopher)
December 20, 2018 Filing 38 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, 1 filed by Plaintiffs American Immigration Lawyers Association, Immigrant Defenders Law Center, Jason Nsinano, Desmond Tenghe, Ernesto Torres. (Griffin, Christopher)
December 20, 2018 Filing 37 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, 1 as to defendant Orange County Sheriffs Department. (twdb) Modified on 12/20/2018 (twdb).
December 20, 2018 Filing 36 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), 1 as to defendant United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (twdb)
December 20, 2018 Filing 35 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, 1 as to defendant Geo Group, Inc. (twdb) Modified on 12/20/2018 (twdb).
December 20, 2018 Filing 34 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, 1 as to defendant Kirstjen M. Nielsen. (twdb)
December 20, 2018 Filing 33 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, 1 as to defendant David Marin. (twdb)
December 19, 2018 Filing 32 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Summons Request 7 , Notice of Deficiency in Request to Issue Summons,, #25 filed by Plaintiffs American Immigration Lawyers Association, Immigrant Defenders Law Center, Jason Nsinano, Desmond Tenghe, Ernesto Torres. (Griffin, Christopher)
December 19, 2018 Filing 31 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Summons Request 6 , Notice of Deficiency in Request to Issue Summons,, #25 filed by Plaintiffs American Immigration Lawyers Association, Immigrant Defenders Law Center, Jason Nsinano, Desmond Tenghe, Ernesto Torres. (Griffin, Christopher)
December 19, 2018 Filing 30 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Summons Request 5 , Notice of Deficiency in Request to Issue Summons,, #25 filed by Plaintiffs American Immigration Lawyers Association, Immigrant Defenders Law Center, Jason Nsinano, Desmond Tenghe, Ernesto Torres. (Griffin, Christopher)
December 19, 2018 Filing 29 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Summons Request 4 , Notice of Deficiency in Request to Issue Summons,, #25 filed by Plaintiffs American Immigration Lawyers Association, Immigrant Defenders Law Center, Jason Nsinano, Desmond Tenghe, Ernesto Torres. (Griffin, Christopher)
December 19, 2018 Filing 28 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Summons Request 3 , Notice of Deficiency in Request to Issue Summons,, #25 filed by Plaintiffs American Immigration Lawyers Association, Immigrant Defenders Law Center, Jason Nsinano, Desmond Tenghe, Ernesto Torres. (Griffin, Christopher)
December 18, 2018 Filing 27 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Christopher M Assise. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (ghap)
December 18, 2018 Filing 26 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Theodore R. Scarborough. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (ghap)
December 18, 2018 Filing 25 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Summons Request 6 , Summons Request 5 , Summons Request 4 , Summons Request 3 , Summons Request 7 . The following error(s) was found: The caption of the summons must match the caption of the complaint verbatim. If the caption is too large to fit in the space provided, enter the name of the first party and then write see attached.Next, attach a face page of the complaint or a second page addendum to the Summons. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (ghap)
December 18, 2018 Filing 24 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Jesus G. Bernal and Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani. (ghap)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ernesto Torres et al v. United States Department of Homeland Security et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Homeland Security
Represented By: OIL-DCS Trial Attorney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Secretary Kirstjen M. Nielsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Field Office Directo David Marin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Orange County Sheriffs Department
Represented By: Carolyn Mary Khouzam
Represented By: Kayla Nicole Watson
Represented By: Steven C Miller
Represented By: Adam Clanton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acting Director Ronald D. Vitiello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Geo Group, Inc.
Represented By: Robert J Herrington
Represented By: Alexander L Linhardt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Represented By: OIL-DCS Trial Attorney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Marin
Represented By: OIL-DCS Trial Attorney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronald D. Vitiello
Represented By: OIL-DCS Trial Attorney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kirstjen M. Nielsen
Represented By: OIL-DCS Trial Attorney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DESMOND TENGHE
Represented By: Jennifer L Stark
Represented By: Theodore R Scarborough, Jr
Represented By: Sean A Commons
Represented By: Christopher Michael Griffin
Represented By: Eva Lucia Bitran
Represented By: Christopher M Assise
Represented By: Zoe Nicole McKinney
Represented By: Michael Bryan Kaufman
Represented By: Jayashri Srikantiah
Represented By: Nicholas S Willingham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Immigrant Defenders Law Center
Represented By: Jennifer L Stark
Represented By: Theodore R Scarborough, Jr
Represented By: Sean A Commons
Represented By: Christopher Michael Griffin
Represented By: Eva Lucia Bitran
Represented By: Christopher M Assise
Represented By: Zoe Nicole McKinney
Represented By: Michael Bryan Kaufman
Represented By: Jayashri Srikantiah
Represented By: Nicholas S Willingham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ernesto Torres
Represented By: Jennifer L Stark
Represented By: Theodore R Scarborough, Jr
Represented By: Sean A Commons
Represented By: Christopher Michael Griffin
Represented By: Eva Lucia Bitran
Represented By: Christopher M Assise
Represented By: Zoe Nicole McKinney
Represented By: Michael Bryan Kaufman
Represented By: Jayashri Srikantiah
Represented By: Nicholas S Willingham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American Immigration Lawyers Association
Represented By: Jennifer L Stark
Represented By: Theodore R Scarborough, Jr
Represented By: Sean A Commons
Represented By: Christopher Michael Griffin
Represented By: Eva Lucia Bitran
Represented By: Christopher M Assise
Represented By: Zoe Nicole McKinney
Represented By: Michael Bryan Kaufman
Represented By: Jayashri Srikantiah
Represented By: Nicholas S Willingham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JASON NSINANO
Represented By: Jennifer L Stark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Sinagwana Nsinano
Represented By: Theodore R Scarborough, Jr
Represented By: Sean A Commons
Represented By: Christopher Michael Griffin
Represented By: Jennifer L Stark
Represented By: Eva Lucia Bitran
Represented By: Christopher M Assise
Represented By: Zoe Nicole McKinney
Represented By: Michael Bryan Kaufman
Represented By: Jayashri Srikantiah
Represented By: Nicholas S Willingham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?