Dan Rey Stake v. Nancy A. Berryhill

Plaintiff: Dan Rey Stake
Defendant: Acting Commissioner Nancy A. Berryhill and Nancy A. Berryhill
Case Number: 5:2019cv00069
Filed: January 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Maria A Audero
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 7, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE TO COUNSEL: ALL PARTIES having consented to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge, this case has been reassigned to Magistrate Judge Maria A. Audero for all further proceedings. Please use the case number EDCV19-69 MAA on all documents subsequently filed to ensure the proper routing of all filings. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. TEXT ONLY ENTRY. (sn)
March 6, 2019 Filing 13 CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill. (Attorney Stacy Wiesbrock added to party Nancy A. Berryhill(pty:dft))(Wiesbrock, Stacy)
February 25, 2019 Filing 12 CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by Plaintiff Dan Rey Stake. (Krank, Laura)
February 25, 2019 Filing 11 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Dan Rey Stake, upon Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill served on 2/20/2019, answer due 4/22/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were Service was executed in compliance with statute not specified. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt NOT attached. Original Summons NOT returned. (Krank, Laura)
January 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Dean D. Pregerson. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 16-05. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Dean D. Pregerson to Judge Dolly M. Gee for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 5:19-cv-00069 DMG(MAAx). (rn)
January 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER REGARDING PROCEDURES IN SOCIAL SECURITY APPEALS upon filing of the complaint by Magistrate Judge Maria A. Audero. Plaintiff shall serve the summons and complaint on the government promptly in accordance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 4(i) and 20 C.F.R. 423.1. Plaintiff shall file an appropriate proof of service within thirty (30) days from the date of this Order. (See document for details.) (sbou)
January 16, 2019 Filing 8 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill. (sbou)
January 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Maria A. Audero: granting #5 REQUEST to Proceed in Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60). (sbou)
January 11, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dean D. Pregerson and referred to Magistrate Judge Maria A. Audero. (lh)
January 10, 2019 Filing 5 APPLICATION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, Declaration in Support filed by Plaintiff Dan Rey Stake. (Krank, Laura)
January 10, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Dan Rey Stake, (Krank, Laura)
January 10, 2019 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Dan Rey Stake. (Krank, Laura)
January 10, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Dan Rey Stake. (Krank, Laura)
January 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with In Forma Pauperis request, filed by Plaintiff Dan Rey Stake. (Attorney Laura E Krank added to party Dan Rey Stake (pty:pla))(Krank, Laura)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dan Rey Stake v. Nancy A. Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acting Commissioner Nancy A. Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Represented By: Stacy Wiesbrock
Represented By: Assistant US Attorney LA-CV
Represented By: Assistant US Attorney LA-SSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dan Rey Stake
Represented By: Laura E Krank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?