Razer Auto, Inc. v. DNA Motor Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Razer Auto, Inc.
Defendant: Does 1-10, DNA Motor Inc. and Jia Jie Chen
Case Number: 5:2019cv00111
Filed: January 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
0 Judge: Michael W Fitzgerald
1 Judge: Sheri Pym
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 15:1126
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 15, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Jia Jie Chen, identifying JIA JIE CHEN. (Yang, Elizabeth)
March 15, 2019 Filing 22 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendant Jia Jie Chen.(Attorney Elizabeth Yang added to party Jia Jie Chen(pty:dft))(Yang, Elizabeth)
March 15, 2019 Filing 21 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Elizabeth Yang counsel for Defendant DNA Motor Inc.. Adding James N. Fiedler as counsel of record for DNA MOTOR, INC. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant DNA MOTOR, INC,. (Yang, Elizabeth)
March 15, 2019 Filing 20 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Elizabeth Yang counsel for Defendant DNA Motor Inc.. Adding James B. Fiedler as counsel of record for Defendant for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant DNA MOTOR, INC.. (Yang, Elizabeth)
March 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. This case has been assigned to Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. This matter is set for a scheduling conference on 4/15/2019 at 11:00 AM. (iv)
March 6, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant DNA Motor Inc., identifying DNA MOTOR, INC.. (Yang, Elizabeth)
March 6, 2019 Filing 17 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendant DNA Motor Inc..(Yang, Elizabeth)
March 6, 2019 Filing 16 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Elizabeth Yang counsel for Defendant DNA Motor Inc.. Adding Christopher D. Lee as counsel of record for DNA MOTOR, INC. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant DNA MOTOR, INC.. (Yang, Elizabeth)
March 6, 2019 Filing 15 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Elizabeth Yang counsel for Defendant DNA Motor Inc.. Adding Elizabeth Yang as counsel of record for DNA MOTOR, INC. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant DNA MOTOR INC.,. (Attorney Elizabeth Yang added to party DNA Motor Inc.(pty:dft))(Yang, Elizabeth)
March 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. The Court ORDERS Plaintiff to show cause why this action should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution. In response to this Order to Show Cause, the Court will accept the following no later than March 22, 2019. BY DEFENDANTS: RESPONSE TO THE COMPLAINT. BY PLAINTIFF: DEFAULT APPLICATION. Failure to respond to the Order to Show Cause will result in the dismissal of this action. (iv)
February 19, 2019 Filing 13 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Razer Auto, Inc., upon Defendant Jia Jie Chen served on 2/11/2019, answer due 3/4/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Elaine Benosa as Office Assistant, a person authorized to accept service for Jia Jie Chen, an individual, at 801 Sentous Ave., City of Industry, CA 91748 in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Kelly, Eric)
February 19, 2019 Filing 12 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Razer Auto, Inc., upon Defendant DNA Motor Inc. served on 2/11/2019, answer due 3/4/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Elaine Benosa as Office Assistant for DNA Motor, Inc. in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Kelly, Eric)
January 24, 2019 Filing 11 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by Razer Auto, Inc.. (Kelly, Eric)
January 24, 2019 Filing 10 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by Razer Auto, Inc.. (Kelly, Eric)
January 24, 2019 Filing 9 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by Razer Auto, Inc.. (Kelly, Eric)
January 22, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE TO COUNSEL RE: Copyright, Patent and Trademark Reporting Requirements. Counsel shall file the appropriate AO-120 and/or AO-121 form with the Clerk within 10 days. (jtil)
January 22, 2019 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendants Jia Jie Chen and DNA Motor Inc. (jtil)
January 22, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
January 22, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald and Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym. (jtil)
January 18, 2019 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #3 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff Razer Auto, Inc.. (Kelly, Eric)
January 18, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Razer Auto, Inc., identifying Razer Auto, Inc.. (Kelly, Eric)
January 18, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Razer Auto, Inc.. (Kelly, Eric)
January 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-23067422 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Razer Auto, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17) (Attorney Eric Allen Kelly added to party Razer Auto, Inc.(pty:pla))(Kelly, Eric)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Razer Auto, Inc. v. DNA Motor Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DNA Motor Inc.
Represented By: Elizabeth Yang
Represented By: Christopher D Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jia Jie Chen
Represented By: Elizabeth Yang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Razer Auto, Inc.
Represented By: Eric Allen Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?