Gary O'Gilvie v. Alder Tank Rentals, LLC et al
Plaintiff: GARY O'GILVIE
Defendant: BLACK GOLD INDUSTRIES, ALDER TANK RENTALS, LLC, CONSOLIDATED FABRICATORS CORP. and DOES 1-20, inclusive
Case Number: 5:2019cv00112
Filed: January 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: David O Carter
Referring Judge: Kenly Kiya Kato
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 13, 2019 Filing 24 SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge David O. Carter re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to San Bernardino Superior Court #11 . The Court finds this matter appropriate for decision without oral argument. Fed. R. Civ. P. 78; Local Rule 7-15. Accordingly, the hearing set for 3/18/2019 is removed from the calendar and the motion is taken under submission. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (dgo) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
March 4, 2019 Filing 23 REPLY In Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to San Bernardino Superior Court #11 filed by Plaintiff Gary O'Gilvie. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Plaintiff's Declaration in Support of Reply)(Rubin, David)
February 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 SCHEDULING ORDER & ORDER RE: PRETRIAL AND TRIAL PROCEDURES by Judge David O. Carter: Discovery cut-off 10/18/2019, Motion cut-off 12/2/2019 @ 8:30 AM, Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/6/2020 @ 8:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter, Jury Trial set for 2/25/2020 @ 8:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. (dgo)
February 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER/REFERRAL to ADR Procedure No 3 by Judge David O. Carter. Case ordered to a private mediator based upon a stipulation of the parties or by the court order. (dgo)
February 25, 2019 Filing 20 MINUTES OF Scheduling Conference held before Judge David O. Carter: Scheduling Order to be issued. Court Reporter: Debbie Gale; Courtroom Deputy: Deborah Lewman; Plaintiff Attorney: David Jason Rubin; Defendant Attorney: Amar M. Hatti, Michael E. Jenkins, Rudy Perrion; Time in Court: :03. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. TEXT ONLY ENTRY. (dgo)
February 25, 2019 Filing 19 OBJECTION IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to San Bernardino Superior Court #11 filed by Defendant Alder Tank Rentals, LLC. (Hatti, Amar)
February 25, 2019 Filing 18 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to San Bernardino Superior Court #11 filed by Defendant Alder Tank Rentals, LLC. (Hatti, Amar)
February 21, 2019 Filing 17 INITIAL DISCLOSURE of Rule 26 filed by Defendant Black Gold Industries (Quon, Kimberly)
February 21, 2019 Filing 16 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Black Gold Industries identifying Black Gold Industries as Corporate Parent. (Quon, Kimberly)
February 21, 2019 Filing 15 CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Black Gold Industries, identifying Black Gold Industries. (Quon, Kimberly)
February 21, 2019 Filing 14 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Kimberly Anne Quon counsel for Defendant Black Gold Industries. Adding Stephanie C. Chang as counsel of record for Black Gold Industries for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Black Gold Industries. (Quon, Kimberly)
February 21, 2019 Filing 13 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Kimberly Anne Quon counsel for Defendant Black Gold Industries. Adding Rudy R. Perrino as counsel of record for Black Gold Industries for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Black Gold Industries. (Quon, Kimberly)
February 21, 2019 Filing 12 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Kimberly Anne Quon counsel for Defendant Black Gold Industries. Adding Kimberly A. Quon as counsel of record for Black Gold Industries for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Black Gold Industries. (Attorney Kimberly Anne Quon added to party Black Gold Industries(pty:dft))(Quon, Kimberly)
February 15, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to San Bernardino Superior Court filed by plaintiff Gary O'Gilvie. Motion set for hearing on 3/18/2019 at 08:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum Plaintiff's Memorandum in Support of Motion to Remand, #2 Declaration Declaration of Plaintiff's Attorney and Exhibits vol. 1 of 3, #3 Declaration Declaration of Plaintiff's Attorney and Exhibits vol. 2 of 3, #4 Declaration Declaration of Plaintiff's Attorney and Exhibits vol. 3 of 3, #5 Proposed Order Proposed Order Allowing Plaintiff's Motion, #6 Affidavit Affidavit of Service and Service List) (Rubin, David)
February 13, 2019 Filing 10 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Michael E Jenkins counsel for Defendant Consolidated Fabricators Corp.. Adding Michael E. Jenkins as counsel of record for Consolidated Fabricators Corp. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Consolidated Fabricators Corp.. (Attorney Michael E Jenkins added to party Consolidated Fabricators Corp.(pty:dft))(Jenkins, Michael)
February 11, 2019 Filing 9 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; Status Report ; estimated length of trial 5 to 7, filed by Defendant Alder Tank Rentals, LLC.. (Hatti, Amar)
January 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge David O. Carter. Scheduling Conference set for 2/25/2019 @ 8:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. (dgo)
January 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOLLOWING ASSIGNMENT OF CIVIL CASE TO JUDGE CARTER upon filing of the complaint by Judge David O. Carter. (dgo)
January 22, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
January 22, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT of Eastern Division Removal Case. This case was initially assigned to District Judge Jesus G. Bernal and referred to Magistrate Judge Kenly Kiya Kato for discovery. Pursuant to General Order 16-05, this case has been randomly reassigned to District Judge David O. Carter. The case number on all documents filed with the Court in this case should read as follows: 5:19-cv-00112 DOC (KKx). (jtil)
January 18, 2019 ANSWER to Complaint filed by Defendant Alder Tank Rentals, LLC, attached to Declaration as Exhibit 1. (jtil)
January 18, 2019 NON CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiff Gary O'Gilvie, attached to Declaration as Exhibit 1. (jtil)
January 18, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by DEFENDANT ALDER TANK RENTALS, LLC, (Hatti, Amar)
January 18, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant ALDER TANK RENTALS, LLC. (Hatti, Amar)
January 18, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from SAN BERNARDINO SUPERIOR COURT, case number CIVDS1827939 Receipt No: 0973-23067926 - Fee: $400, filed by DEFENDANT ALDER TANK RENTALS, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration) (Attorney Amar M Hatti added to party ALDER TANK RENTALS, LLC(pty:dft))(Hatti, Amar)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gary O'Gilvie v. Alder Tank Rentals, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BLACK GOLD INDUSTRIES
Represented By: Kimberly Anne Quon
Represented By: Rudy R Perrino
Represented By: Stephanie C Chang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALDER TANK RENTALS, LLC
Represented By: Amar M Hatti
Represented By: Edward J Riffle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CONSOLIDATED FABRICATORS CORP.
Represented By: Michael E Jenkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1-20, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GARY O'GILVIE
Represented By: David Jason Rubin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?