Kelly Wilson v. Primary Provider Management Company, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Kelly Wilson
Defendant: Clayton, Dubilier & Rice, LLC, Primary Provider Management Company, Inc., Agilon Health, Inc., Cyber Pro Systems dba Medical Data Exchange, Inc., MDX Hawaii, Inc., Cyber Pro Systems, Clayton, Dubilier and Rice, LLC and Does 1 through 100, inclusive
Case Number: 5:2019cv00114
Filed: January 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
0 Judge: Kenly Kiya Kato
1 Judge: George H Wu
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 14, 2019 Filing 15 MINUTES OF SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held before Judge George H. Wu. Settlement is reached. A hearing on Plaintiff's motion for preliminary approval of settlement and certification of the class, is set for May 16, 2019 at 8:30 a.m. Counsel may stipulate to the briefing schedule, except the reply, which is to be filed by May 6, 2019. The Court waives the requirements of FRCP 23. Court Reporter: Katie E Thibodeaux. (lom)
February 28, 2019 Filing 14 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 5-7, filed by Defendants Agilon Health, Inc., Clayton, Dubilier and Rice, LLC, Cyber Pro Systems, MDX Hawaii, Inc., Primary Provider Management Company, Inc... (Tantula, Namal)
January 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting Stipulation Extending Time to Answer for Defendant Clayton, Dubilier & Rice, LLC (30 days or less), #10 , by Judge George H. Wu. The stipulation is approved and CD&R shall file its responsive pleading to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint on or before March 27, 2019. (shb)
January 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS - ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge George H. Wu. (Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 2/28/2019. Scheduling Conference set for 3/14/2019 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu.) (mrgo)
January 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Standing Order Re Final Pre-Trial Conferences for Civil Jury Trials Before Judge George H. Wu by Judge George H. Wu. (See document for details) (mrgo)
January 30, 2019 Filing 10 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Clayton, Dubilier and Rice, LLC answer now due 3/27/2019, re Amended Complaint, filed by Defendants Cyber Pro Systems; Agilon Health, Inc.; MDX Hawaii, Inc.; Does; Primary Provider Management Company, Inc.; Clayton, Dubilier and Rice, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Attorney Namal Munaweera Tantula added to party Does(pty:dft))(Tantula, Namal)
January 25, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to Amended Complaint, DEFENDANT AGILON HEALTH INC.'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT filed by Defendant Agilon Health, Inc..(Tantula, Namal)
January 25, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to Amended Complaint, DEFENDANT MDX HAWAII, INC.'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT filed by Defendant MDX Hawaii, Inc..(Tantula, Namal)
January 25, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to Amended Complaint, DEFENDANT PRIMARY PROVIDER MANAGEMENT COMPANY, INC.'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT filed by Defendant Primary Provider Management Company, Inc..(Tantula, Namal)
January 22, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et)
January 22, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT of Eastern Division Removal Case. This case was initially assigned to District Judge Jesus G. Bernal and referred to Magistrate Judge Kenly Kiya Kato for discovery. Pursuant to General Order 16-05, this case has been randomly reassigned to District Judge George H. Wu. The case number on all documents filed with the Court in this case should read as follows: 5:19-cv-00114-GW (KKx). (et)
January 18, 2019 NON-CONFORMED COPY OF ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S UNVERIFIED FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Defendant Cyber Pro Systems. [SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO EXHIBIT G TO NOTICE TO REMOVAL AS ATTACHMENT NO. 7 #1 . (et)
January 18, 2019 NON-CONFORMED COPY OF NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Kelly Wilson, upon Defendant Clayton, Dubilier and Rice, LLC acknowledgment sent by Plaintiff on 12/20/2018, answer due 1/10/2019; Cyber Pro Systems acknowledgment sent by Plaintiff on 12/20/2018, answer due 1/10/2019; MDX Hawaii, Inc. acknowledgment sent by Plaintiff on 12/20/2018, answer due 1/10/2019. Acknowledgment of Service signed by Brett Young, For Defendants Clayton, Dublier and Rice, LLC; Cyber Pro Systems dba Medical Data Exchange and MDX Hawaii, Inc. [SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO EXHIBIT F TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL AS ATTACHMENT NO. 6 #1 . (et)
January 18, 2019 NON-CONFORMED COPY OF NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Kelly Wilson, upon Defendant Primary Provider Management Company, Inc. acknowledgment sent by Plaintiff on 12/3/2018, answer due 12/24/2018. Acknowledgment of Service signed by Brett Young, For Defendant Primary Provider Management Company, Inc. [SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO EXHIBIT E TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL AS ATTACHMENT NO. 5 #1 . (et)
January 18, 2019 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S UNVERIFIED AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Defendants Agilon Health, Inc., Primary Provider Management Company, Inc. [FILED IN STATE COURT ON 11/30/2018 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO EXHIBIT D TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL AS ATTACHMENT NO. 4 #1 . (et)
January 18, 2019 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF FIRST AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT against Defendants Agilon Health, Inc., Clayton, Dubilier and Rice, LLC, Cyber Pro Systems, Does 1 through 100, inclusive, MDX Hawaii, Inc., Primary Provider Management Company, Inc., filed by Plaintiff Kelly Wilson. [FILED IN STATE COURT ON 10/24/2018 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO EXHIBIT C TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL AS ATTACHMENT NO. 3 #1 .(et)
January 18, 2019 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT against Defendants Agilon Health, Inc., Does 1 through 100, inclusive, Primary Provider Management Company, Inc. Jury Demanded., filed by Plaintiff Kelly Wilson. [FILED IN STATE COURT ON 10/2/2018 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO EXHIBIT A TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL AS ATTACHMENT NO. 1 #1 . (et)
January 18, 2019 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendants Agilon Health, Inc., Clayton, Dubilier & Rice, LLC, Cyber Pro Systems dba Medical Data Exchange, Inc., Primary Provider Management Company, Inc. (Young, Brett)
January 18, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Agilon Health, Inc., Clayton, Dubilier & Rice, LLC, Cyber Pro Systems dba Medical Data Exchange, Inc., Primary Provider Management Company, Inc., identifying Plaintiff Kelly Wilson, Defendant Primary Provider Management Company, Inc., Defendant Agilon Health, Inc., Defendant Cyber Pro Systems, Defendant Clayton, Dubilier & Rice, LLC, Defendant MDX Hawaii, Inc.. (Young, Brett)
January 18, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendants Agilon Health, Inc., Clayton, Dubilier & Rice, LLC, Cyber Pro Systems dba Medical Data Exchange, Inc., Primary Provider Management Company, Inc.. (Young, Brett)
January 18, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Riverside Superior Court, case number RIC1820411 Receipt No: 0973-23069235 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendants Cyber Pro Systems dba Medical Data Exchange, Inc., Agilon Health, Inc., Primary Provider Management Company, Inc., Clayton, Dubilier & Rice, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Summons, #3 Exhibit C - First Amended Complaint, #4 Exhibit D - Answer to Complaint, #5 Exhibit E - Signed Notices of Acknowledgment PPMC and Agilon, #6 Exhibit F - Signed Notices of AcknowledgmentCD&R, Cyber Pro and MDX Hawaii, #7 Exhibit G - Answer to FAC) (Attorney Brett David Young added to party Agilon Health, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Brett David Young added to party Clayton, Dubilier & Rice, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Brett David Young added to party Cyber Pro Systems dba Medical Data Exchange, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Brett David Young added to party Primary Provider Management Company, Inc.(pty:dft))(Young, Brett)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kelly Wilson v. Primary Provider Management Company, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clayton, Dubilier & Rice, LLC
Represented By: Brett David Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Primary Provider Management Company, Inc.
Represented By: Brett David Young
Represented By: Tracey A Kennedy
Represented By: Namal Munaweera Tantula
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Agilon Health, Inc.
Represented By: Brett David Young
Represented By: Tracey A Kennedy
Represented By: Namal Munaweera Tantula
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cyber Pro Systems dba Medical Data Exchange, Inc.
Represented By: Brett David Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MDX Hawaii, Inc.
Represented By: Brett David Young
Represented By: Tracey A Kennedy
Represented By: Namal Munaweera Tantula
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cyber Pro Systems
Represented By: Brett David Young
Represented By: Tracey A Kennedy
Represented By: Namal Munaweera Tantula
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clayton, Dubilier and Rice, LLC
Represented By: Brett David Young
Represented By: Tracey A Kennedy
Represented By: Namal Munaweera Tantula
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 100, inclusive
Represented By: Namal Munaweera Tantula
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kelly Wilson
Represented By: Jason T Hatcher
Represented By: David P Myers
Represented By: Alvin Ferrara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?