Annmarie Ball v. JP Morgan Chase N.A. et al
Plaintiff: Annmarie Ball
Defendant: US Vessel, Roes, JP Morgan Chase N.A., Nicole Giles, Does and Moes
Case Number: 5:2019cv00121
Filed: January 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: John A Kronstadt
Referring Judge: Sheri Pym
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1333
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 26, 2019 Filing 11 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Annmarie Ball, upon Parker Ibrahim & Berg LLP on 1/25/19. Signed, returned receipt of certified mail attached. (bp)
February 26, 2019 Filing 10 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Annmarie Ball, upon Quality Loan Services on 1/25/19. Signed, returned receipt of certified mail attached. (bp)
February 26, 2019 Filing 9 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Annmarie Ball, upon Defendant JP Morgan Chase N.A. served on 1/25/2019, answer due 2/15/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Nicole Giles. Signed, returned receipt of certified mail attached. (bp)
February 26, 2019 Filing 8 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Annmarie Ball, upon McCarthy & Holthus, LLP Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Rebecca. Signed, copy of returned receipt of certified mail attached. (bp)
February 26, 2019 Filing 7 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Annmarie Ball, upon Superior Court of California, Riverside County Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Ricki Duarte. Signed, returned receipt of certified mail attached. (bp)
February 26, 2019 Filing 6 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Annmarie Ball, Roes served on U.S. District Court 1/25/2019, answer due 3/26/2019. Executed upon the officer agency or corporation by delivering a copy to Angelique Dominguez. Registered or certified mail return receipt attached. Original Summons NOT returned. (bp)
January 24, 2019 Filing 5 STANDING ORDER FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOHN A. KRONSTADT (SEE ORDER FOR SPECIFICS) (bp)
January 22, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car)
January 22, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John A. Kronstadt and Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym. (car)
January 22, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Annmarie Ball (car)
January 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Does, Nicole Giles, JP Morgan Chase N.A., Moes 1-100, Roes, US Vessel. Case assigned to Judge John A. Kronstadt for all further proceedings. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym.(Filing fee $ 400 PAID), filed by plaintiff Annmarie Ball. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (car)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Annmarie Ball v. JP Morgan Chase N.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Vessel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JP Morgan Chase N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nicole Giles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Moes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Annmarie Ball
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?