Ernest Peachy Thomas v. The County of San Bernardino et al
Plaintiff: Ernest Peachy Thomas
Defendant: The County of San Bernardino, D. Estrada, Michael A. Ramos, D. Newcombe, J. Foster, John McMahon and David Page
Case Number: 5:2019cv00167
Filed: January 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Dolly M Gee
Referring Judge: Steve Kim
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 28, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Change of address Filed by Plaintiff Ernest Peachy Thomas. (clee)
March 5, 2019 Filing 13 Amended Text Only Entry. Thirteen (13) USM-285s, Summonses, and Complaint forwarded to the United States Marshal for service of process. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (clee) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
March 5, 2019 Filing 11 [SEE AMENDED ENTRY - ECF 13] Text Only Entry. Seven (7) USM-285s, Summonses, and Complaint forwarded to the United States Marshal for service of process. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (clee) TEXT ONLY ENTRY Modified on 3/5/2019 (clee).
March 4, 2019 Filing 14 CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by Plaintiff Ernest Peachy Thomas. (rn)
March 4, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE OF SUBMISSION filed by Plaintiff Ernest Peachy Thomas. (clee)
February 15, 2019 Filing 10 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint #1 as to All Defendants. (clee)
February 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER DIRECTING SERVICE OF PROCESS BY THE UNITED STATES MARSHAL by Magistrate Judge Steve Kim. (clee)
February 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER RE SERVICE OF PROCESS by Magistrate Judge Steve Kim. (SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS). (clee)
February 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER IN CIVIL RIGHTS CASES by Magistrate Judge Steve Kim. (SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS). (Attachments: #1 Consent CV-11) (clee)
February 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER GRANTING REQUEST TO PROCEED WITHOUT PREPAYMENT OF FILING FEES #5 by Magistrate Judge Steve Kim. (clee)
February 12, 2019 Filing 5 REQUEST to Proceed Without Prepayment of Filing Fees with Declaration in Support filed by Plaintiff Ernest Peachy Thomas. (hr)
January 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER RE: FILING OF COMPLAINT WITHOUT PREPAYMENT OF FILING FEES OR REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Magistrate Judge Steve Kim. The Court is in receipt of Plaintiffs Complaint (ECF No. 1). The Complaint was submitted without prepayment of the filing fees or a Request to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. On or before March 1, 2019, Plaintiff is to pay the filing fees or submit a Request to Proceed Without Prepayment of Filing Fees with Declaration in Support (Form CV-60P). Failure to timely pay the filing fee or submit a Request to Proceed In Forma Pauperis will result in dismissal of this action. IT IS SO ORDERED. (Attachments: #1 CV-60P) (clee)
January 28, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dolly M. Gee and referred to Magistrate Judge Steve Kim. (esa)
January 28, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF FILING OF COMPLAINT WITHOUT PREPAYMENT OF FILING FEES OR REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS (CV-93) filed by plaintiff Ernest Peachy Thomas. (esa)
January 28, 2019 Filing 1 CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT filed against defendants D. Estrada(Sheriff Deputy, in individual capacity), D. Estrada(Sheriff Deputy, in official capacity), J. Foster(Sheriff Deputy, in official capacity), J. Foster(Sheriff Deputy, in individual capacity), John McMahon(Sheriff Deputy, in individual capacity), John McMahon(Sheriff Deputy, in official capacity), D. Newcombe(Sheriff Deputy, in individual capacity), D. Newcombe(Sheriff Deputy, in official capacity), David Page(Sheriff Deputy, in individual capacity), David Page (Sheriff Deputy, official capacity), Michael A. Ramos(Former District Attorney, in official capacity), Michael A. Ramos(Former District Attorney, in individual capacity), The County of San Bernardino pursuant to 42 USC 1983pr. Case assigned to Judge Dolly M. Gee and referred to Magistrate Judge Steve Kim, filed by plaintiff Ernest Peachy Thomas. (esa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ernest Peachy Thomas v. The County of San Bernardino et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The County of San Bernardino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. Estrada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael A. Ramos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. Newcombe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Foster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John McMahon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Page
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ernest Peachy Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?