Silvia C. Farelas et al v. Nouri D. Hijazi et al
Plaintiff: Silvia C. Farelas, Silvia Farelas and David Farelas
Defendant: Estate of Nouri D. Hijazi, Nouri D. Hijazi, RAS Jetport, Richard Pierce, Textron Inc., Lori Scheck, Nour D. Hijazi, Mark Scheck, Serco Inc., Serco Group, PLC, Does 1-81, inclusive, Estate of Nour D. Hijazi and Doe
Case Number: 5:2019cv00176
Filed: January 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Shashi H Kewalramani
Referring Judge: R Gary Klausner
Nature of Suit: Airplane
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 18, 2019 Filing 26 REPLY in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Riverside Superior Court #18 filed by Plaintiffs David Farelas, Silvia Farelas, Silvia C. Farelas. (Haffner, Joshua)
March 11, 2019 Filing 25 Opposition Opposition re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Riverside Superior Court #18 filed by Defendant Serco Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Christian T. Johnson In Support of Defendant Serco's Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand, #2 Exhibit A to Decl of CTJ ISO of Serco's Opp to Motion to Remand - Summons & Complaint, #3 Exhibit B to Decl of CTJ ISO of Serco's Opp to Motion to Remand - Summons & First Amended Complaint, #4 Exhibit C to Decl of CTJ ISO of Serco's Opp to Motion to Remand - Proof of Service of Summons & Complaint on Serco, #5 Declaration Declaration of David J. McCann In Support of Defendant Serco's Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand, #6 Exhibit A to Decl of DJM ISO of Serco's Opp to Motion to Remand - FAA Contract, #7 Exhibit B to Decl of DJM ISO of Serco's Opp to Motion to Remand - Facilities Operations Order, #8 Exhibit C to Decl of DJM ISO of Serco's Opp to Motion to Remand - Quality Control Order, #9 Exhibit D to Decl of DJM ISO of Serco's Opp to Motion to Remand - Internal Compliance Verification Checklist, #10 Exhibit E to Decl of DJM ISO of Serco's Opp to Motion to Remand - Audit and Assessment Order, #11 Exhibit F to Decl of DJM ISO of Serco's Opp to Motion to Remand - ATC Manual, #12 Exhibit G to Decl of DJM ISO of Serco's Opp to Motion to Remand - NTSB Factual Report)(Sutherland, Kevin)
March 1, 2019 Filing 24 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant RAS Jetport, (Ryan, Timothy)
March 1, 2019 Filing 23 RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS RE: Answer to Complaint (Discovery) #19 by Judge R. Gary Klausner. The document is accepted as filed. Counsel shall file a Notice of Interested Parties by 12 noon on March 4, 2019.. (bp)
March 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 NOTICE TO ALL PARTIES AND ORDER by Judge R. Gary Klausner. The Court has reviewed the Notice of Settlement #21 , filed on February 28, 2019. The parties are hereby notified that they are not relieved of any deadlines or court appearances until a dismissal of the action is filed. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (sw) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
February 28, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE of Settlement filed by defendant Estate of Nouri D. Hijazi. (Montanari, Garry)
February 26, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Answer to Complaint (Discovery) #19 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 7.1-1 No Notice of Interested Parties.. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (bp)
February 25, 2019 Filing 19 ANSWER to Amended Complaint, with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendant RAS Jetport.(Attorney Timothy John Ryan added to party RAS Jetport(pty:dft))(Ryan, Timothy)
February 19, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Riverside Superior Court filed by Plaintiff David Farelas, Silvia Farelas, Silvia C. Farelas. Motion set for hearing on 4/1/2019 at 09:00 AM before Judge R. Gary Klausner. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points & Authorities in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand, #2 Declaration of Joshua H. Haffner ISO Motionto Remand, #3 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Remand) (Haffner, Joshua)
February 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge R. Gary Klausner. A Scheduling Conference has been placed on calendar for May 13, 2019 at 9:00 a.m. The Conference will be held pursuant to F.R.Civ. P. 16(b). Trial counsel must be present and there are no telephonic appearances. Counsel are ordered to file a joint statement providing a brief factual summary of the case, including the claims being asserted. The parties are reminded of their obligations to disclose information and confer on a discovery plan not later than 21 days prior to the scheduling conference, and to file a joint statement with the Court not later than 14 days after they confer, as required by F.R. Civ.P. 26 and the Local Rules of this Court. Failure to comply may lead to the imposition of sanctions. Plaintiff's counsel is directed to give notice of the scheduling conference to each party that makes an initial appearance in the action after this date. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 05/06/2019. (sw)
February 5, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Association of Counsel associating attorney Joshua H. Haffner on behalf of Plaintiffs David Farelas, Silvia Farelas, Silvia C. Farelas. Filed by Plaintiffs David Farelas, Silvia Farelas, Silvia C. Farelas (Attorney Joshua H Haffner added to party David Farelas(pty:pla), Attorney Joshua H Haffner added to party Silvia Farelas(pty:pla), Attorney Joshua H Haffner added to party Silvia C. Farelas(pty:pla))(Haffner, Joshua)
February 5, 2019 Filing 15 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Serco Group, PLC, Serco Inc., re Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only #8 , Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form #6 , Notice of Reassignment of Eastern Division Removal Case (CV-106) - optional html form, #5 , Intradistrict Transfer - Clerical Error (G-73) - optional html form, #4 served on February 5, 2019. (Sutherland, Kevin)
January 31, 2019 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Serco Group, PLC, identifying Serco Inc.; Serco North America (Holdings) Inc.; Serco Holdings Limited; Various Insurance Underwriters in the International Insurance Market. (Sutherland, Kevin)
January 31, 2019 Filing 13 AMENDED CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Serco Inc., identifying Serco; Serco North America; Serco holdings Limited; Serco Group plc; Various Insurance Underwriters in the International Insurance Market. (Sutherland, Kevin)
January 31, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER to Amended Complaint, filed by Defendant Serco Group, PLC.(Attorney Kevin R Sutherland added to party Serco Group, PLC(pty:dft))(Sutherland, Kevin)
January 31, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to Amended Complaint, filed by Defendant Serco Inc..(Sutherland, Kevin)
January 30, 2019 Filing 10 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Serco Inc.. (Sutherland, Kevin)
January 30, 2019 Filing 9 RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS RE: Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 by Judge R. Gary Klausner. The civil cover sheet shall be filed on or before February 1, 2019. (bp)
January 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STANDING ORDER REGARDING NEWLY ASSIGNED CASES by Judge R. Gary Klausner. (sw)
January 29, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 . The following error(s) was found: Other error(s) with document(s): Attachments 2 Civil Cover Sheet is attached to the Notice of Removal. Each of these documents should have been filed and entered separately under its correct event/relief. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ghap)
January 29, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
January 29, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT of Eastern Division Removal Case. This case was initially assigned to District Judge Jesus G. Bernal and referred to Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani for discovery. Pursuant to General Order 16-05, this case has been randomly reassigned to District Judge R. Gary Klausner. The case number on all documents filed with the Court in this case should read as follows: 5:19-cv-00176 RGK (SHKx). (ghap)
January 29, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE RE INTRA-DISTRICT TRANSFER by Clerk of Court due to incorrect intra-district venue selected by the filer. Case is transferred to the Eastern Division. Case has been assigned to Judge Jesus G. Bernal for all further proceedings. Any matters that may be referred to a Magistrate Judge are assigned to Shashi H. Kewalramani. New Case Number 5:19-cv-00176 JGB (SHKx). (ghap)
January 24, 2019 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Silvia Farelas, David Farelas, Silvia C. Farelas, upon Defendant Serco Inc. served on 12/28/2018, answer due 1/18/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Albert Damonte, Process Specialist, who accepted service, with identity confirmed by subject stating their name, a brown-haired Hispanic male approx. 25-35 years of age, 5'10"-6'0" tall and weighing 180-200 lbs. in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 1/4/2019 SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT D-Page 1) (ghap)
January 24, 2019 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants Does 1 through 85, inclusive, Estate of Nouri D. Hijazi, Nouri D. Hijazi, Richard Pierce, RAS Jetport, Lori Scheck, Mark Scheck, Serco Group, PLC, Serco Inc., Textron Inc. amending Complaint - (Discovery),, filed by plaintiffs Silvia Farelas, David Farelas, Silvia C. Farelas. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 4/5/2018 SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT B-PAGE 3)(ghap)
January 24, 2019 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Does 1 through 85, inclusive, Estate of Nouri D. Hijazi, Nouri D. Hijazi, Richard Pierce, RAS Jetport, Lori Scheck, Mark Scheck, Serco Group, PLC, Serco Inc., Textron Inc. Jury Demanded., filed by plaintiffs Silvia Farelas, David Farelas, Silvia C. Farelas. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 2/15/2018 SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT A PAGE 3) (ghap) Modified on 1/29/2019 (ghap).
January 24, 2019 CONFORMED COPY OF AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT plaintiff being ignorant of the true of the defendant and having designated the defendant in the complaint by the fictitious name of DOE 1 and having discovered the true name of the defendant to be Mark Scheck, Personal Representative of Estate of Nouri Hijazi, filed by plaintiffs Silvia Farelas, David Farelas, Silvia C. Farelas. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 4/27/2018 SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT E PAGE 5)AMENDED COMPLAINT amending Amended Complaint,, filed by plaintiffs Silvia Farelas, David Farelas, Silvia C. Farelas(ghap)
January 24, 2019 CONFORMED COPY OF AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT plaintiff being ignorant of the true of the defendant and having designated the defendant in the complaint by the fictitious name of DOE 46 and having discovered the true name of the defendant to be RAS Jetport, filed by plaintiffs Silvia Farelas, David Farelas, Silvia C. Farelas. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 4/27/2018 SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT E PAGE 8)(ghap)
January 24, 2019 CONFORMED COPY OF AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT plaintiff being ignorant of the true of the defendant and having designated the defendant in the complaint by the fictitious name of DOE 2 and having discovered the true name of the defendant to be Lori Scheck, Personal Representative of Estate of Nouri Hijazi, filed by plaintiffs Silvia Farelas, David Farelas, Silvia C. Farelas. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 4/27/2018 SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT E PAGE 6)(ghap)
January 24, 2019 CONFORMED COPY OF AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT plaintiff being ignorant of the true of the defendant and having designated the defendant in the complaint by the fictitious name of DOE 3 and having discovered the true name of the defendant to be Estate of Nouri Hijazi, filed by plaintiffs Silvia Farelas, David Farelas, Silvia C. Farelas. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 4/27/2018 SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT E PAGE 7)(ghap)
January 24, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Serco Inc., identifying Serco Group Plc. (Sutherland, Kevin)
January 24, 2019 Filing 2 DECLARATION of David J. McCann re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendant Serco Inc.. (Sutherland, Kevin)
January 24, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Riverside, case number RIC1822857 Receipt No: 0973-23096518 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant Serco Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Kevin R. Sutherland In Support of Notice of Removal including all State Court filings, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Attorney Kevin R Sutherland added to party Serco Inc.(pty:dft))(Sutherland, Kevin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Silvia C. Farelas et al v. Nouri D. Hijazi et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Estate of Nouri D. Hijazi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nouri D. Hijazi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RAS Jetport
Represented By: Rebekka R Martorano
Represented By: Timothy John Ryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Pierce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Textron Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lori Scheck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nour D. Hijazi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Scheck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Serco Inc.
Represented By: Christian Troy Johnson
Represented By: Kevin R Sutherland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Serco Group, PLC
Represented By: Kevin R Sutherland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-81, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Estate of Nour D. Hijazi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe
Represented By: Rebekka R Martorano
Represented By: Timothy John Ryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Silvia C. Farelas
Represented By: Louis Jasper Cutrone
Represented By: Michael Korte Teiman
Represented By: Graham Lambert
Represented By: Joshua H Haffner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Silvia Farelas
Represented By: Louis Jasper Cutrone
Represented By: Michael Korte Teiman
Represented By: Graham Lambert
Represented By: Joshua H Haffner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Farelas
Represented By: Louis Jasper Cutrone
Represented By: Michael Korte Teiman
Represented By: Graham Lambert
Represented By: Joshua H Haffner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?