Clifford Hutchinson et al v. Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc.
Plaintiff: Clifford Hutchinson and Rosalee Hutchinson
Defendant: Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2019cv00266
Filed: February 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Jesus G Bernal
Referring Judge: Sheri Pym
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 5, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc., (Dailey, Steven)
March 5, 2019 Filing 19 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE filed by Defendant Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Exhibit I)(Dailey, Steven)
March 5, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Strike filed by Defendant Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 4/22/2019 at 09:00 AM before Judge Jesus G. Bernal. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Dailey, Steven)
March 5, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendant Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 4/22/2019 at 09:00 AM before Judge Jesus G. Bernal. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Attorney Steven M Dailey added to party Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc.(pty:dft)) (Dailey, Steven)
February 13, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Supplement,, #14 , Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support,, #13 . The following error(s) was/were found: Case number is incorrect or missing. The complete case number must read: 5:19-cv-266 JGB(SPx). In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ad)
February 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Jesus G. Bernal: Order (1) DENYING Plaintiffs' Application for a Temporary Restraining Order (Dkt. No. 1) and (2) DISCHARGING the Order to Show Cause (Dkt. No. 11). SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. IT IS SO ORDERED. (mga)
February 12, 2019 Filing 14 SUPPLEMENT to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form,, #12 , Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support,, #13 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Notice of Assignment to United States Judges(CV-18) - optional html form #3 , Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only #9 , Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held,,, Set/Reset Deadlines,, #11 , Summons Request, #10 , Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days), #6 , Notice (Other) #7 filed by Plaintiffs Clifford Hutchinson, Rosalee Hutchinson. (Ilkhanipour, Payom)
February 12, 2019 Filing 13 MEMORANDUM of Points and Authorities in Support Payom Ilkhanipour Re: Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form #4 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Notice of Assignment to United States Judges(CV-18) - optional html form #3 , Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only #9 , Summons Request, #10 , Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days), #6 , Notice (Other) #7 (Ilkhanipour, Payom)
February 12, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Summons Request, #10 . The following error(s) was/were found: The clerk can not issue summons. Page 2 is attached and the summons has not been issued. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (twdb)
February 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Jesus G. Bernal: Order to Show Cause re: Subject Matter Jurisdiction and Service. Accordingly, the Court ORDERS Plaintiffs to show cause, in writing, why their request for a temporary restraining order should not be denied (1) for lack subject matter jurisdiction and (2) for failure to comply with Fed. R. Civ. P. 65(b). Plaintiffs shall file a memorandum of no longer than 5 pages addressing the Courts concerns by Tuesday, February 12 at 2:00 p.m. Defendant, if it wishes, may also submit a brief of no longer than 5 pages addressing whether jurisdiction before this court is proper. Failure to respond may result in a denial of Plaintiffs motion. Show Cause Response due by 2/12/2019. (twdb)
February 11, 2019 Filing 10 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days), #6 , Notice (Other) #7 filed by Plaintiff Clifford Hutchinson, Rosalee Hutchinson. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Proof of Service and Aknowledgment of Service)(Ilkhanipour, Payom)
February 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Jesus G. Bernal. (ima)
February 8, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) #6 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect document is attached to the docket entry. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (twdb)
February 8, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE filed by plaintiff Clifford Hutchinson, Rosalee Hutchinson. Payom Ilkhanipour (Ilkhanipour, Payom)
February 8, 2019 Filing 6 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Clifford Hutchinson, Rosalee Hutchinson, upon Defendant All Defendants. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon ASON H MILLER. Registered Agent in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entitymethod of service not specified.Original Summons NOT returned. Payom Ilkhanipour (Ilkhanipour, Payom)
February 8, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 . The following error(s) was found: No Notice of Interested Parties has been filed. A Notice of Interested Parties must be filed with every partys first appearance. See Local Rule 7.1-1. Counsel must file a Notice of Interested Parties immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. (car)
February 8, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car)
February 8, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Jesus G. Bernal and Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym. (car)
February 8, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs Clifford Hutchinson, Rosalee Hutchinson. (Ilkhanipour, Payom)
February 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-23185309 - Fee: $400, filed by plaintiff Clifford Hutchinson, Rosalee Hutchinson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Declaration Declaration of Payom Ilkhanipour) (Attorney Payom Ilkhanipour added to party Clifford Hutchinson(pty:pla), Attorney Payom Ilkhanipour added to party Rosalee Hutchinson(pty:pla))(Ilkhanipour, Payom)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Clifford Hutchinson et al v. Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clifford Hutchinson
Represented By: Payom Ilkhanipour
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosalee Hutchinson
Represented By: Payom Ilkhanipour
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc.
Represented By: Steven M Dailey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?