Temecula Valley Unified School District v. Wendy Housman et al

Plaintiff: Temecula Valley Unified School District
Defendant: Wendy Housman and Erin Larkin
Case Number: 5:2019cv00293
Filed: February 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Jesus G Bernal
Referring Judge: Kenly Kiya Kato
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Education
Cause of Action: 20:1401
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 22, 2019 Filing 14 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Kasmira Maureen Brough counsel for Plaintiff Temecula Valley Unified School District. Adding Kasmira M. Brough as counsel of record for Temecula Valley Unified School District for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Temecula Valley Unified School District. (Attorney Kasmira Maureen Brough added to party Temecula Valley Unified School District(pty:pla))(Brough, Kasmira)
March 19, 2019 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Temecula Valley Unified School District. upon Wendy Housman waiver sent by Plaintiff on 2/20/2019, answer due 4/22/2019. Waiver of Service signed by Wendy M. Housman. (Brough, Kasmira)
March 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Jesus G. Bernal. (ima)
February 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 16-05-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 5:17-cv-01381 JGB(KKx). Case transferred from Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani and Judge R. Gary Klausner to Judge Jesus G. Bernal and Magistrate Judge Kenly Kiya Kato for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 5:19-cv-00293 JGB(KKx). Signed by Judge Jesus G. Bernal (rn)
February 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STANDING ORDER REGARDING NEWLY ASSIGNED CASES by Judge R. Gary Klausner. (sw)
February 21, 2019 Filing 9 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants Wendy Housman, Erin Larkin. (ghap)
February 21, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
February 21, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge R. Gary Klausner and Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani. (ghap)
February 20, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Matthew J Tamel on behalf of Plaintiff Temecula Valley Unified School District (Attorney Matthew J Tamel added to party Temecula Valley Unified School District(pty:pla))(Tamel, Matthew)
February 20, 2019 FILING FEE PAID for new civil case. Receipt No. 0973-23239480 for $400 filing fee. (Sutherland, Sarah)
February 19, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 . The following error(s) was found: A case-initiating document was submitted without payment of the full filing fee. Within two business days of this notice, counsel must pay the filing fee or file a request to proceed in forma pauperis;otherwise, the docket for this case number will be closed and no further filings will be permitted under this case number. The filing fee may be paid online by docketing the event Pay Filing Fee. (ghap)
February 15, 2019 Filing 4 COMPLAINT Fee Exemption in accordance with statute, filed by Plaintiff Temecula Valley Unified School District.(Sutherland, Sarah)
February 15, 2019 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Temecula Valley Unified School District. (Sutherland, Sarah)
February 15, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Temecula Valley Unified School District. (Sutherland, Sarah)
February 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Fee Exemption in accordance with statute, filed by Plaintiff Temecula Valley Unified School District. (Attorney Sarah L W Sutherland added to party Temecula Valley Unified School District(pty:pla))(Sutherland, Sarah)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Temecula Valley Unified School District v. Wendy Housman et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wendy Housman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Erin Larkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Temecula Valley Unified School District
Represented By: Sarah L W Sutherland
Represented By: Kasmira Maureen Brough
Represented By: Matthew J Tamel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?