Harold Boyd White, Sr. v. Nancy A. Berryhill

Plaintiff: Harold Boyd White, Sr.
Defendant: Acting Commissioner Nancy A. Berryhill and Nancy A. Berryhill
Case Number: 5:2019cv00295
Filed: February 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Karen L Stevenson
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 13, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE TO COUNSEL: ALL PARTIES having consented to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge, this case has been reassigned to Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson for all further proceedings. Please use the case number EDCV19-295 KS on all documents subsequently filed to ensure the proper routing of all filings. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. TEXT ONLY ENTRY. (sn)
March 12, 2019 Filing 12 CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by Plaintiff Harold Boyd White, Sr.. (Kuntz, William)
March 12, 2019 Filing 11 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Harold Boyd White, Sr., upon Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill served on 3/4/2019, answer due 7/2/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the United States Attorneys Office by delivering a copy to G. Ortega, Title Unknown,. Executed upon the Attorney Generals Office of the United States by delivering a copy to Carley Sase, Title Unknown,. Executed upon the officer agency or corporation by delivering a copy to Unknown Signer, Title Unknown, on behalf of General Counsel,. Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt attached. Original Summons NOT returned. Case Management Orders were also served along with Complaint Documents (Attachments: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipts)(Kuntz, William)
March 11, 2019 Filing 10 CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill. (Attorney Francesco P Benavides added to party Nancy A. Berryhill(pty:dft))(Benavides, Francesco)
February 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER RE: PROCEDURES IN SOCIAL SECURITY APPEAL (JOINT SUBMISSION FORMAT) by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson. Plaintiff will file an appropriate proof of service within 30 days of the date of this Order. (see document for details) (hr)
February 25, 2019 Filing 8 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill. (hr)
February 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson: granting #3 REQUEST to Proceed in Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60). (hr)
February 19, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge David O. Carter and referred to Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson. (et)
February 15, 2019 Filing 5 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Harold Boyd White, Sr.. (Kuntz, William)
February 15, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Harold Boyd White, Sr., identifying United States of America and Social Security Administration. (Kuntz, William)
February 15, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, Declaration in Support filed by Plaintiff Harold Boyd White, Sr.. (Kuntz, William)
February 15, 2019 Filing 2 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Harold Boyd White, Sr.. (Kuntz, William)
February 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with In Forma Pauperis request, filed by Plaintiff Harold Boyd White, Sr.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Attorney William M Kuntz added to party Harold Boyd White, Sr.(pty:pla))(Kuntz, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harold Boyd White, Sr. v. Nancy A. Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acting Commissioner Nancy A. Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Represented By: Assistant US Attorney LA-SSA
Represented By: Assistant US Attorney LA-CV
Represented By: Francesco P Benavides
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harold Boyd White, Sr.
Represented By: William M Kuntz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?