Miroslava Martinez v. Big Lots Stores, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Miroslava Martinez
Defendant: Does 1 to 50, inclusive and Big Lots Stores, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2019cv00301
Filed: February 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Dale S Fischer
Referring Judge: Shashi H Kewalramani
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Dale S. Fischer. The Joint Report must include the completed Schedule of Pretrial and Trial dates. Lead trial counsel are ordered to appear in person unless counsel have been excused by the Court. Scheduling Conference set for 7/15/2019 at 11:00 AM before Judge Dale S. Fischer. (rfi)
April 8, 2019 CONFORMED COPY OF ORIGINAL FILED ANSWER to Complaint filed by Defendant Big Lots Stores, Inc. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 2/13/2019 SUBMITTED ATTACHMENT NO. 1 OF EXHIBIT A TO NOTICE #10 ]. (jp)
April 8, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE filed by Defendant Big Lots Stores, Inc.. of Its Answer Filed in State Court on 02/13/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Davis, Yvette)
March 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER by Judge Dale S. Fischer: granting #8 Non-Resident Attorney Cory D Catignani APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Big Lots Stores, Inc., designating Yvette Davis as local counsel. (jp)
March 15, 2019 Filing 8 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Cory D. Catignani to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Big Lots Stores, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-23385862) filed by Defendant Big Lots Stores, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing frm The Supreme Court of Ohio, #2 Proposed Order on Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case Pro Hac Vice) (Davis, Yvette)
February 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE DALE S. FISCHER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Dale S. Fischer. If a party would be entitled to attorneys fees, counsel are referred to the Order Re Fees found on Court's website under Judge Fischer's Procedures and Schedules contained in the Judge's Requirements tab. Read all Orders carefully. They govern this case and differ in some respects from the Local Rules. COUNSEL ARE ORDERED TO PROVIDE A MANDATORY CHAMBERS COPY OF THE COMPLAINT, NOTICE OF REMOVAL, AND ANY OTHER INITIATING DOCUMENTS. (rfi)
February 19, 2019 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Big Lots Stores, Inc., Does 1 through 50, inclusive. Jury Demanded., filed by Plaintiff Miroslava Martinez. [FILED IN STATE COURT ON 1/17/2019 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO EXHIBIT 1 TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 . (et)
February 19, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et)
February 19, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT of Eastern Division Removal Case. This case was initially assigned to District Judge Jesus G. Bernal and referred to Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani for discovery. Pursuant to General Order 16-05, this case has been randomly reassigned to District Judge Dale S. Fischer. The case number on all documents filed with the Court in this case should read as follows: 5:19-cv-00301-DSF (SHKx). (et)
February 19, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Big Lots Stores, Inc., identifying Big Lots Stores, Inc.. (Davis, Yvette)
February 19, 2019 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Big Lots Stores, Inc.. (Davis, Yvette)
February 19, 2019 Filing 2 DECLARATION of Jennifer Unocic re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendant Big Lots Stores, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A to Declaration of Jennifer Unocic)(Davis, Yvette)
February 19, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from San Bernardino, case number CIVDS190158 Receipt No: 0973-23235533 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant Big Lots Stores, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 to Notice of Removal, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 to Notice of Removal, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3 to Notice of Removal) (Attorney Yvette Davis added to party Big Lots Stores, Inc.(pty:dft))(Davis, Yvette)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Miroslava Martinez v. Big Lots Stores, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 to 50, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Big Lots Stores, Inc.
Represented By: Yvette Davis
Represented By: Cory D Catignani
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Miroslava Martinez
Represented By: Daniel A Reisman
Represented By: Erin Kristina Reisman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?