Gabriel Castillo v. Troon Enterprises, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Gabriel Castillo
Defendant: Does 1 through 20, inclusive
3Rd Party Plaintiff: Troon Enterprises, Inc.
3Rd Party Defendant: Roes and Roberts Group I LLC
Case Number: 5:2019cv00305
Filed: February 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Dale S Fischer
Referring Judge: Sheri Pym
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 20, 2019 Filing 22 21 DAY Summons Issued re Third Party Complaint #6 as to Third-Party Defendant Roberts Group I LLC. (jp)
March 20, 2019 Filing 21 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Third Party Complaint #6 filed by Defendant/Third-Party Plaintiff Troon Enterprises, Inc.. (Phillips, Brent)
March 19, 2019 Filing 20 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff Gabriel Castillo, re Answer to Counterclaim, #19 served on 03-19-19. (Felahy, Allen)
March 19, 2019 Filing 19 Plaintiff's Answer to Defendant and Counterclaimant's Counterclaim ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery), Answer to Complaint (Discovery), Counterclaim #9 , Third Party Complaint #6 filed by Plaintiff Gabriel Castillo.(Felahy, Allen)
March 15, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Summons Request #16 . The following error(s) was found: The date and signature line must be left blank. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (jp)
March 13, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Troon Enterprises, Inc., (Phillips, Brent)
March 13, 2019 Filing 16 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Third Party Complaint #6 filed by Third Party Plaintiff Troon Enterprises, Inc.. (Phillips, Brent)
March 7, 2019 Filing 15 RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS RE: Answer to Complaint (Discovery), Counterclaim #9 , Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form,, #14 by Deputy Clerk of Court. The Document is Accepted; however, the parties must filed their Notice of Interested parties no later than March 12, 2019. (rfi)
March 7, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Answer to Complaint (Discovery), Counterclaim #9 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 7.1-1 No Notice of Interested Parties. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (et)
March 7, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Summons Request #8 . The following error(s) was found: The caption of the summons must match the caption of the complaint verbatim. If the caption is too large to fit in the space provided, enter the name of the first party and then write see attached.Next, attach a face page of the complaint or a second page addendum to the Summons. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (bp)
March 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Dale S. Fischer. The Joint Report must include the completed Schedule of Pretrial and Trial dates. Lead trial counsel are ordered to appear in person unless counsel have been excused by the Court. Scheduling Conference set for 6/24/2019 at 11:00 AM before Judge Dale S. Fischer. (rfi)
March 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE DALE S. FISCHER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Dale S. Fischer. If a party would be entitled to attorneys fees, counsel are referred to the Order Re Fees found on Court's website under Judge Fischer's Procedures and Schedules contained in the Judge's Requirements tab. Read all Orders carefully. They govern this case and differ in some respects from the Local Rules. COUNSEL ARE ORDERED TO PROVIDE A MANDATORY CHAMBERS COPY OF THE COMPLAINT, NOTICE OF REMOVAL, AND ANY OTHER INITIATING DOCUMENTS. (rfi)
March 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Christina A. Snyder. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 19-03. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Christina A. Snyder to Judge Dale S. Fischer for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 5:19-cv-00305 DSF(SPx). (rn)
March 1, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery) , COUNTERCLAIM against Gabriel Castillo filed by Defendant Troon Enterprises, Inc..(Phillips, Brent)
March 1, 2019 Filing 8 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Third Party Complaint #6 filed by Cross-Complainant Troon Enterprises, Inc.. (Phillips, Brent)
February 27, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Third Party Complaint #6 . The following error(s) was/were found: Attached Exhibit Summons is to be efiled as a separate document and correct event - see: Civil Events - Service Documents - Service/Waivers of Summons and Complaints. Date: and clerk signature line are left blank on the summons. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (lom)
February 24, 2019 Filing 6 THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Third-Party Defendant Roberts Group I LLC, filed by Defendant Troon Enterprises, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Summons)(Phillips, Brent)
February 20, 2019 Filing 5 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Troon Enterprises, Inc.. (Phillips, Brent)
February 20, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 . The following error(s) was found: Other error(s) with document(s): Attachment 2 Civil Cover Sheet should have been e-filed separately and in the correct event category. The event is located under Civil Events Other Filings Miscellaneous Filings. Attachment 3 Supplement Notice of Removal should have been e-filed separately and in the correct event category. The correct event category is located under Civil Events Other Filings Notices. (car)
February 20, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car)
February 20, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT of Eastern Division Removal Case. This case was initially assigned to District Judge Jesus G. Bernal and referred to Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym for discovery. Pursuant to General Order 16-05, this case has been randomly reassigned to District Judge Christina A. Snyder. The case number on all documents filed with the Court in this case should read as follows: 5:19-cv-00305 CAS (SPx). (car)
February 19, 2019 CONFORMED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery) filed by Defendant Troon Enterprises, Inc. Filed in State Court on 2/19/19 Submitted with Exhibit A to Notice of Removal #1 .(car)
February 19, 2019 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Does 1 through 20, inclusive, Troon Enterprises, Inc. Jury Demanded, filed by plaintiff Gabriel Castillo. Filed in State Court on 1/8/2019 Submitted with Exhibit A to Notice of Removal #1 (car)
February 19, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from San Bernardino Superior Court, case number CIVDS 1900668 Receipt No: 0973-23237723 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant Troon Enterprises, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Raymond Garcia in Support of Removal, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Case Cover Sheet, #3 Supplement Notice of Interested Parties, #4 Exhibit Certificate of Service) (Attorney Brent R Phillips added to party Troon Enterprises, Inc.(pty:dft))(Phillips, Brent)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gabriel Castillo v. Troon Enterprises, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gabriel Castillo
Represented By: Farbod Nourian
Represented By: Allen B Felahy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: Troon Enterprises, Inc.
Represented By: Brent R Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Roes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Roberts Group I LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 20, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?