Rodney Soward v. Moore Advanced, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Rodney Soward
Defendant: Does 1 to 100, inclusive, Moore Advanced, Inc., NFI, L.P. and National Distribution Centers LLC
Case Number: 5:2019cv00318
Filed: February 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Andre Birotte
Referring Judge: Sheri Pym
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER RE: STIPULATION POSTPONING MOTION FOR REMAND by Judge Andre Birotte Jr.: The parties have stipulated to postpone Plaintiff's contemplated Motion to Remand to State Court, including tolling any deadline under 28 U.S.C. 1447(c) or otherwise, without waiving and expressly conserving all possible bases for remand, until 30 days after the parties' 7/10/2019 mediation, or 8/12/2019, whichever occurs first #23 . Good cause having been shown, IT IS SO ORDERED. (gk)
May 6, 2019 Filing 23 STIPULATION to Reschedule Plaintiff's contemplated Motion to Remand to State Court, including tolling any deadline under 28 U.S.C. 1447(c) or otherwise filed by plaintiff Rodney Soward. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proof of Service)(Barnes, Kevin)
March 28, 2019 Filing 22 ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery) and Affirmative Defenses filed by Defendant Moore Advanced, Inc..(Frey, Richard)
March 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER RE: STIPULATION RELIEVING PLAINTIFF FROM CENTRAL DISTRICT LOCAL RULE 23-3 CLASS CERTIFICATION FILING DEADLINE, CONTINUING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE AND POSTPONING MOTION FOR REMAND by Judge Andre Birotte Jr.: The Court has reviewed the parties' Stipulation #18 and ORDERS the relief requested, as follows: Plaintiff is relieved of the 90 day deadline to file a Motion for Certification of Class Action pursuant to Central District Local Rule 23-3. The parties are ORDERED to file a Stipulation regarding the deadline for Plaintiff to file a motion for class certification and an appropriate briefing schedule when they file their Joint Rule 26 report. The Scheduling Conference (currently scheduled for 6/7/2019) is hereby CONTINUED to 8/30/2019 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. The parties further stipulate to postpone Plaintiff's contemplated Motion to Remand to State Court, including tolling any deadline under 28 U.S.C. 1447(c) or otherwise, without waiving and expressly conserving all possible bases for remand, until 30 days after the date of the parties' contemplated mediation, or 7/22/2019, whichever occurs first. (gk)
March 22, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR Re: Order Re: Stipulation Relieving Plaintiff from Central District Local Rule 23-3 Class Certification Filing Deadline, etc. filed 3/22/2019 #19 . Incorrect order filed. (gk)
March 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER RE: STIPULATION RELIEVING PLAINTIFF FROM CENTRAL DISTRICT LOCAL RULE 23-3 CLASS CERTIFICATION FILING DEADLINE, CONTINUING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE AND POSTPONING MOTION FOR REMAND by Judge Andre Birotte Jr.: It is ordered that the parties have stipulated to relieve Plaintiff of the 90 day deadline to file Plaintiff's Motion for Certification of Class Action pursuant to Central District Local Rule 23-3 #18 . The parties further stipulate to continue the Scheduling Conference (currently scheduled for 6/7/2019) and all related dates and deadlines until a date selected by the Court no earlier than 8/26/2019. The parties further stipulate to postpone Plaintiff's contemplated Motion to Remand to State Court, including tolling any deadline under 28 U.S.C. 1447(c) or otherwise, without waiving and expressly conserving all possible bases for remand, until 30 days after the date of the parties' contemplated mediation, or 7/22/2019, whichever occurs first. (gk)
March 21, 2019 Filing 18 STIPULATION to Continue CLASS CERTIFICATION FILING DEADLINE, SCHEDULING CONFERENCE AND POSTPONING MOTION FOR REMAND from 90 DAY DEADLINE to UNTIL A DATE SELECTED BY THE COURT NO EARLIER THAN AUGUST 26, 2019 filed by plaintiff Rodney Soward. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proof of Service)(Barnes, Kevin)
March 6, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Phillip Knute Antablin on behalf of Defendant Moore Advanced, Inc. (Attorney Phillip Knute Antablin added to party Moore Advanced, Inc.(pty:dft))(Antablin, Phillip)
March 6, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Robert H Pepple on behalf of Defendant Moore Advanced, Inc. (Attorney Robert H Pepple added to party Moore Advanced, Inc.(pty:dft))(Pepple, Robert)
March 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER by Judge Andre Birotte Jr: granting #9 Non-Resident Attorney Andrew B Murphy APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of National Distribution Centers LLC, designating Michael Jaeger as local counsel. (lom)
March 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. Scheduling Conference set for 6/7/2019 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (cb)
February 28, 2019 Filing 13 Corporate Disclosure Statement and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Moore Advanced, Inc., identifying Moore Advanced, Inc. d/b/a Moore Advanced. (Frey, Richard)
February 28, 2019 Filing 12 Joint STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Moore Advanced, Inc. answer now due 3/29/2019, re Complaint - (Discovery) filed by Defendant Moore Advanced, Inc..(Attorney Richard J Frey added to party Moore Advanced, Inc.(pty:dft))(Frey, Richard)
February 28, 2019 Filing 11 JOINDER filed by Defendant Moore Advanced, Inc. joining in Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 . (Frey, Richard)
February 27, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery) filed by Defendant National Distribution Centers LLC.(Jaeger, Michael)
February 26, 2019 Filing 9 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Andrew B. Murphy to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant National Distribution Centers LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-23278186) filed by Defendant National Distribution Centers LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Jaeger, Michael)
February 21, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant National Distribution Centers LLC, re Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form #5 , Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only #7 , Notice of Reassignment of Eastern Division Removal Case (CV-106) - optional html form, #4 served on 2/21/2019. (Jaeger, Michael)
February 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (cb)
February 21, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Andrew Murphy. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (esa)
February 21, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa)
February 21, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT of Eastern Division Removal Case. This case was initially assigned to District Judge Jesus G. Bernal and referred to Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym for discovery. Pursuant to General Order 16-05, this case has been randomly reassigned to District Judge Andre Birotte Jr. The case number on all documents filed with the Court in this case should read as follows: 5:19-cv-00318 AB (SPx). (esa)
February 20, 2019 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against defendants Does 1 to 100, inclusive, Moore Advanced, Inc., NFI, L.P., Jury Demand, filed by plaintiff Rodney Soward. (Filed in state court 1/2/19, submitted as document 1, attachment 1) (esa)
February 20, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant NFI, L.P., identifying National Distribution Centers, LLC. (Jaeger, Michael)
February 20, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant NFI, L.P.. (Jaeger, Michael)
February 20, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Riverside County Superior Court, case number RIC1900029 Receipt No: 0973-23245442 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant NFI, L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Declaration of Sarah E. Pontoski, #3 Declaration of Jorge Hernandez, #4 Certificate of Service) (Attorney Michael Jaeger added to party NFI, L.P.(pty:dft))(Jaeger, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rodney Soward v. Moore Advanced, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rodney Soward
Represented By: Raphael Albert Katri
Represented By: Gregg Lander
Represented By: Kevin T Barnes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 to 100, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Moore Advanced, Inc.
Represented By: Phillip Knute Antablin
Represented By: Richard J Frey
Represented By: Robert H Pepple
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NFI, L.P.
Represented By: Michael Jaeger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Distribution Centers LLC
Represented By: Michael Jaeger
Represented By: George A Stohner
Represented By: Andrew B Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?