Salvador Neduelan v. Werner Enterprises, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Salvador Neduelan
Defendant: Werner Enterprises, Inc., Drivers Management, LLC and Does 1-100, inclusive
Case Number: 5:2019cv00369
Filed: February 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Sheri Pym
Referring Judge: Manuel L Real
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 TEXT ONLY SCHEDULING ORDER by Judge Manuel L. Real, The Court has determined that Motion to Remand Case to San Bernadino Superior Court filed by Plaintiff Salvador Neduelan #12 set for hearing on May 6, 2019 at 10:00 A.M. is suitable for a decision on the papers as filed by all parties without the need for oral argument. Therefore, the said motion is taken UNDER SUBMISSION on the papers as filed and the hearing date of May 6, 2019 is VACATED and TAKEN OFF CALENDAR. The Court will issue its ruling on the matter in due course. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (dbu) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
April 22, 2019 Filing 15 REPLY in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to San Bernadino Superior Court #12 filed by Plaintiff Salvador Neduelan. (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(King, Tessa)
April 15, 2019 Filing 14 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Werner Enterprises, Inc., re Objection/Opposition (Motion related), #13 served on 4/15/2019. (Maretz, Peter)
April 15, 2019 Filing 13 TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR REMAND AND REQUEST FOR ATTORNEY FEES AND SANCTIONS re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to San Bernadino Superior Court #12 OPPOSITION filed by Defendant Werner Enterprises, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Declaration)(Maretz, Peter)
March 28, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to San Bernadino Superior Court filed by Plaintiff Salvador Neduelan. Motion set for hearing on 5/6/2019 at 10:00 AM before Judge Manuel L. Real. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order) (King, Tessa)
March 5, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Salvador Neduelan, (King, Tessa)
March 5, 2019 Filing 10 DEMAND for Jury Trial filed by Plaintiff Salvador Neduelan.. (King, Tessa)
March 1, 2019 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Drivers Management, LLC, Werner Enterprises, Inc., re Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #2 , Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #3 served on February 26, 2019. (Maretz, Peter)
March 1, 2019 Filing 8 RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS by Judge Manuel L. Real. The document is stricken. Counsel shall refile the Proof of Service under the correct event. (cch)
March 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER RE: NOTICE TO COUNSEL upon filing of the complaint by Judge Manuel L. Real. READ CAREFULLY - FAILURE TO COMPLY MAY LEAD TO SANCTIONS. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. (cch)
February 28, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Miscellaneous Document, #4 . The following error(s) was found: Other error(s) with document(s): An incorrect event was selected for Document No.4. The correct event is Proof of Service (subsequent documents). You are not required to take any action in response to this notice unless the Court so directs. (lh)
February 28, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT of Eastern Division Removal Case. This case was initially assigned to District Judge Jesus G. Bernal and referred to Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym for discovery. Pursuant to General Order 16-05, this case has been randomly reassigned to District Judge Manuel L. Real. The case number on all documents filed with the Court in this case should read as follows: 5:19-cv-00369 R (SPx). (lh)
February 26, 2019 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Drivers Management, LLC, Werner Enterprises, Inc., Does 1 through 100. Jury Demanded, filed by Plaintiff Salvador Neduelan. #1 [FILED IN STATE COURT ON 12/11/2018 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL] (lh)
February 26, 2019 Filing 4 Certificate of Service filed by Defendants Drivers Management, LLC, Werner Enterprises, Inc. re: Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #2 , Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #3 (Maretz, Peter)
February 26, 2019 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendants Drivers Management, LLC, Werner Enterprises, Inc.. (Maretz, Peter)
February 26, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Drivers Management, LLC, Werner Enterprises, Inc., identifying Gra-Gar, LLC. (Attorney Peter B Maretz added to party Drivers Management, LLC(pty:dft))(Maretz, Peter)
February 26, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from San Bernardino Superior Court, case number CIVDS 1832033 Receipt No: 0973-23281622 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant Werner Enterprises, Inc.. (Attorney Peter B Maretz added to party Werner Enterprises, Inc.(pty:dft))(Maretz, Peter)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Salvador Neduelan v. Werner Enterprises, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Salvador Neduelan
Represented By: Adam J Reisner
Represented By: Shani Kupferman Huang
Represented By: Gregory R Taylor
Represented By: Tessa King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Werner Enterprises, Inc.
Represented By: Peter B Maretz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Drivers Management, LLC
Represented By: Peter B Maretz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-100, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?