Citrus Plus, Inc. v. Specialty Fresh, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Citrus Plus, Inc.
Defendant: John G Hein, Specialty Fresh, LLC and John G. Hein
Case Number: 5:2019cv00391
Filed: March 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Jesus G Bernal
Referring Judge: Sheri Pym
Nature of Suit: Agriculture Acts
Cause of Action: 07:499
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER by Judge Jesus G. Bernal. In light of the Dismissal filed by plaintiff on April 22, 2019 (Doc. No. 14), the Court hereby discharges the Order to Show Cause (Doc. No. 13), and ORDERS the case DISMISSED. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (mga) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
April 22, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Plaintiff Citrus Plus, Inc.. Dismissal is Without Prejudice. (Monroe, June)
April 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Jesus G. Bernal: Order to Show Cause re Dismissal for Lack of Prosecution. SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. Show Cause Response due by 4/22/2019. (twdb)
March 14, 2019 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff Citrus Plus, Inc., re Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only #9 served on 03/14/2019. (Monroe, June)
March 13, 2019 Filing 11 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Citrus Plus, Inc., upon Defendant John G. Hein served on 3/10/2019, answer due 4/1/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon John G. Hein, individual defendant in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Monroe, June)
March 13, 2019 Filing 10 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Citrus Plus, Inc., upon Defendant Specialty Fresh, LLC served on 3/10/2019, answer due 4/1/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon John Hein, Registered Agent in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Monroe, June)
March 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Jesus G. Bernal. (ima)
March 4, 2019 Filing 8 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants John G. Hein, Specialty Fresh, LLC. (et)
March 4, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et)
March 4, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Jesus G. Bernal and Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym. (et)
March 1, 2019 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Plaintiff Citrus Plus, Inc. (Monroe, June)
March 1, 2019 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Citrus Plus, Inc.. (Monroe, June)
March 1, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Citrus Plus, Inc., (Monroe, June)
March 1, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Citrus Plus, Inc.. (Monroe, June)
March 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-23299553 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Citrus Plus, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Invoices) (Attorney June T Monroe added to party Citrus Plus, Inc.(pty:pla))(Monroe, June)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Citrus Plus, Inc. v. Specialty Fresh, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Citrus Plus, Inc.
Represented By: June T Monroe
Represented By: Bartholomew M Botta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John G Hein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Specialty Fresh, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John G. Hein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?