Marcus McDowell, Jr. et al v. United States of America
Plaintiff: Joseph McDowell, Marcus McDowell, Jr. and M.M., Jr.
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, and United States of America
Case Number: 5:2019cv00631
Filed: April 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Jesus G Bernal
Referring Judge: Sheri Pym
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1346
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2019 Filing 10 DECLARATION of Harry E. Douglas IV in Response to OSC Re: Dismissal filed by Plaintiffs M.M., Jr., Joseph McDowell. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Service Packet US Dist. Atty, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 - Transmittal Attorney General, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3 - Correspondence US Dist Atty, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4 - 2nd Service Packet US Dist Atty, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 5 - 2nd Transmittal Attorney General)(Douglas, Harry)
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Jesus G. Bernal: Order to Show Cause re Dismissal for Lack of Prosecution. SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. Show Cause Response due by 7/8/2019. (twdb)
April 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Jesus G. Bernal. (ima)
April 10, 2019 Filing 7 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant United States of America. (jtil)
April 10, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
April 10, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Jesus G. Bernal and Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym. (jtil)
April 8, 2019 Filing 4 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs Joseph McDowell, Marcus McDowell, Jr. (Douglas, Harry)
April 8, 2019 Filing 3 Notice and CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Joseph McDowell, Marcus McDowell, Jr, (Douglas, Harry)
April 8, 2019 Filing 2 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff Joseph McDowell, Marcus McDowell, Jr. (Douglas, Harry)
April 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-23516787 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Marcus McDowell, Jr, Joseph McDowell. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 Government Tort Claims) (Attorney Harry E Douglas, IV added to party Joseph McDowell(pty:pla), Attorney Harry E Douglas, IV added to party Marcus McDowell, Jr(pty:pla))(Douglas, Harry)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Marcus McDowell, Jr. et al v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph McDowell
Represented By: Harry E Douglas, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marcus McDowell, Jr.
Represented By: Harry E Douglas, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: M.M., Jr.
Represented By: Harry E Douglas, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?