United States of America, v. 5 Acres of Land, More or Less, Situate in San Bernardino County, California et al
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, and United States of America
Defendant: San Bernardino County Auditor-Controller Treasurer Tax Collector, Esther Benitez, Arturo Raphael Benitez and 5 Acres of Land, More or Less, Situate in San Bernardino County, California
Case Number: 5:2019cv00645
Filed: April 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Jesus G Bernal
Referring Judge: Sheri Pym
Nature of Suit: Condemnation
Cause of Action: 28:1358
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 9, 2019 Filing 15 Second EX PARTE APPLICATION to Deposit Funds filed by Plaintiff United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Amended Order to Deposit Funds) (Plant, Miles)
April 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER by Judge Jesus G. Bernal: Granting #9 EX PARTE APPLICATION Permitting Deposit of Estimate of Just Compensation into an Interest-Bearing Account in the Court's Registry. SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. (twdb)
April 24, 2019 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff United States of America. upon Esther Benitez waiver sent by Plaintiff on 4/11/2019, answer due 6/10/2019. Waiver of Service signed by Esther Benitez. (Plant, Miles)
April 24, 2019 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff United States of America. upon Arturo Raphael Benitez waiver sent by Plaintiff on 4/11/2019, answer due 6/10/2019. Waiver of Service signed by Arturo Raphael Benitez. (Plant, Miles)
April 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Jesus G. Bernal. (ima)
April 17, 2019 Filing 10 DISCLAIMER filed by Defendant San Bernardino County Auditor-Controller Treasurer Tax Collector to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 . (Norton, Mitchell)
April 15, 2019 Filing 9 EX PARTE APPLICATION to Deposit Funds filed by Plaintiff United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order Permitting Deposit of Estimate of Just Compensation) (Plant, Miles)
April 12, 2019 Filing 8 Waiver of Service - Returned Executed by San Bernardino County Auditor-Controller/Treasurer/Tax Collector filed by Plaintiff United States of America (Plant, Miles)
April 11, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car)
April 11, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Jesus G. Bernal and Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym. (car) Modified on 4/11/2019 (car).
April 11, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Plaintiff United States of America. correcting Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , Declaration, #3 , Miscellaneous Document, #4 (Plant, Miles)
April 10, 2019 Filing 4 Notice of Condemnation filed by Plaintiff UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Schedule A - Authority, #2 Exhibit Schedule B - Public Purpose, #3 Exhibit Schedule C - Legal Description, #4 Exhibit Schedule D - Map, #5 Exhibit Schedule E - Estate Taken, #6 Exhibit Schedule F - Estimate of Just Compensation, #7 Exhibit Schedule G - Interested Parties)(Plant, Miles)
April 10, 2019 Filing 3 DECLARATION of Taking filed by Plaintiff UNITED STATES OF AMERICA,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Schedule A - Authority, #2 Exhibit Schedule B - Public Purpose, #3 Exhibit Schedule C - Legal Description, #4 Exhibit Schedule D - Map, #5 Exhibit Schedule E - Estate Taken, #6 Exhibit Schedule F - Estimate of Just Compensation, #7 Exhibit Schedule G - Interested Parties)(Plant, Miles)
April 10, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff UNITED STATES OF AMERICA,. (Plant, Miles)
April 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT No Fee Required - US Government, filed by Plaintiff UNITED STATES OF AMERICA,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Schedule A - Authority, #2 Exhibit Schedule B - Public Purpose, #3 Exhibit Schedule C - Legal Description, #4 Exhibit Schedule D - Map, #5 Exhibit Schedule E - Estate Taken, #6 Exhibit Schedule F - Estimate of Just Compensation, #7 Exhibit Schedule G - Interested Parties) (Attorney Miles H Plant added to party UNITED STATES OF AMERICA,(pty:pla))(Plant, Miles)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America, v. 5 Acres of Land, More or Less, Situate in San Bernardino County, California et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: San Bernardino County Auditor-Controller Treasurer Tax Collector
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Esther Benitez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arturo Raphael Benitez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 5 Acres of Land, More or Less, Situate in San Bernardino County, California
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA,
Represented By: Miles H Plant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Miles H Plant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?