Brian Neil Hoff et al v. Walt Disney Pictures et al

Plaintiff: Furrywood Studios, LLC and Brian Neil Hoff
Defendant: Buena Vista Books, Inc., Walt Disney Pictures, Disney Consumer Products and Interactive Media, Inc., ABC, Inc., DOES 1 through 10, inclusive,, Buena Vista Home Entertainment, Inc., Disney Consumer Products, Inc., Disney Interactive Studios, Inc. and Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Case Number: 5:2019cv00665
Filed: April 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Andrew J Guilford
Referring Judge: Kenly Kiya Kato
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 18, 2019 Filing 18 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants All Defendants amending Complaint - (Discovery),, filed by Plaintiff Brian Neil Hoff (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F (Part 1 of 2), #7 Exhibit F (Part 2 of 2), #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K)(Karczag, Justin)
May 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION REGARDING AMENDED COMPLAINT AND EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO AMENDED COMPLAINT #16 by Judge Andrew J. Guilford. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT: Plaintiffs shall file their First Amended Complaint on or before June 18, 2019 and Defendants shall answer or otherwise respond to the First Amended Complaint on or before July 18, 2019. (es)
May 17, 2019 Filing 16 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Amend Complaint and Answer or Otherwise Respond to Amended Complaint filed by Plaintiffs Furrywood Studios, LLC, Brian Neil Hoff. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Karczag, Justin)
May 17, 2019 Filing 15 Supplemental NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Justin P Karczag on behalf of Plaintiffs Furrywood Studios, LLC, Brian Neil Hoff (Karczag, Justin)
May 17, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Justin P Karczag on behalf of Plaintiffs Furrywood Studios, LLC, Brian Neil Hoff (Attorney Justin P Karczag added to party Furrywood Studios, LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Justin P Karczag added to party Brian Neil Hoff(pty:pla))(Karczag, Justin)
April 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 19-03 (Related Case) filed. Transfer of case declined by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald, for the reasons set forth on this order. The cases involve different works and therefore different analyses. Related Case No. 2:17-cv-02185-MWF-JCx. (dv)
April 17, 2019 Filing 12 Joint STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Disney Consumer Products, Inc. answer now due 5/19/2019; Walt Disney Pictures answer now due 5/19/2019; Disney Consumer Products and Interactive Media, Inc. answer now due 5/19/2019; Disney Interactive Studios, Inc. answer now due 5/19/2019; Buena Vista Books, Inc. answer now due 5/19/2019; ABC, Inc. answer now due 5/19/2019; Buena Vista Home Entertainment, Inc. answer now due 5/19/2019, re Complaint - (Discovery), filed by defendants Disney Consumer Products, Inc.; Walt Disney Pictures; Disney Consumer Products and Interactive Media, Inc.; Disney Interactive Studios, Inc.; Buena Vista Books, Inc.; ABC, Inc.; Buena Vista Home Entertainment, Inc..(Petrocelli, Daniel)
April 16, 2019 Filing 11 EX PARTE APPLICATION to Extend Time to File Answer to 5/20/2019 re Complaint - (Discovery), filed by Defendants ABC, Inc., Buena Vista Books, Inc., Buena Vista Home Entertainment, Inc., Disney Consumer Products and Interactive Media, Inc., Disney Consumer Products, Inc., Disney Interactive Studios, Inc., Walt Disney Pictures. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Drew E. Breuder in Support, #2 Proposed Order) (Petrocelli, Daniel)
April 16, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car)
April 16, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT of Eastern Division Removal Case. This case was initially assigned to District Judge Jesus G. Bernal and referred to Magistrate Judge Kenly Kiya Kato for discovery. Pursuant to General Order 19-03, this case has been randomly reassigned to District Judge Andrew J. Guilford. The case number on all documents filed with the Court in this case should read as follows: 5:19-cv-00665 AG (KKx). (car)
April 15, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Extend Time to File Answer to 5/20/2019 filed by Defendants ABC, Inc., Buena Vista Books, Inc., Buena Vista Home Entertainment, Inc., Disney Consumer Products and Interactive Media, Inc., Disney Consumer Products, Inc., Disney Interactive Studios, Inc., Walt Disney Pictures. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Drew E. Breuder in Support, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Proof of Service) (Petrocelli, Daniel)
April 15, 2019 Filing 7 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Craig P Bloom counsel for Defendants ABC, Inc., Buena Vista Books, Inc., Buena Vista Home Entertainment, Inc., Disney Consumer Products and Interactive Media, Inc., Disney Consumer Products, Inc., Disney Interactive Studios, Inc., Walt Disney Pictures. Adding Craig P. Bloom as counsel of record for Walt Disney Pictures, ABC, Inc., Buena Vista Home Entertainment, Inc., Disney Consumer Products, Inc., Disney Consumer Products and Interactive Media, Inc., Buena Vista Books, Inc., Disney Interactive Studios, Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendants Walt Disney Pictures, ABC, Inc., Buena Vista Home Entertainment, Inc., Disney Consumer Products, Inc., Disney Consumer Products and Interactive Media, Inc., Buena Vista Books, Inc., Disney Interactive Studios, Inc.. (Attorney Craig P Bloom added to party ABC, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Craig P Bloom added to party Buena Vista Books, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Craig P Bloom added to party Buena Vista Home Entertainment, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Craig P Bloom added to party Disney Consumer Products and Interactive Media, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Craig P Bloom added to party Disney Consumer Products, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Craig P Bloom added to party Disney Interactive Studios, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Craig P Bloom added to party Walt Disney Pictures(pty:dft))(Bloom, Craig)
April 15, 2019 Filing 6 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Drew E Breuder counsel for Defendants ABC, Inc., Buena Vista Books, Inc., Buena Vista Home Entertainment, Inc., Disney Consumer Products and Interactive Media, Inc., Disney Consumer Products, Inc., Disney Interactive Studios, Inc., Walt Disney Pictures. Adding Drew E. Breuder as counsel of record for Walt Disney Pictures, ABC, Inc., Buena Vista Home Entertainment, Inc., Disney Consumer Products, Inc., Disney Consumer Products and Interactive Media, Inc., Buena Vista Books, Inc., Disney Interactive Studios, Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendants Walt Disney Pictures, ABC, Inc., Buena Vista Home Entertainment, Inc., Disney Consumer Products, Inc., Disney Consumer Products and Interactive Media, Inc., Buena Vista Books, Inc., Disney Interactive Studios, Inc.. (Attorney Drew E Breuder added to party ABC, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Drew E Breuder added to party Buena Vista Books, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Drew E Breuder added to party Buena Vista Home Entertainment, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Drew E Breuder added to party Disney Consumer Products and Interactive Media, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Drew E Breuder added to party Disney Consumer Products, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Drew E Breuder added to party Disney Interactive Studios, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Drew E Breuder added to party Walt Disney Pictures(pty:dft))(Breuder, Drew)
April 12, 2019 NON-CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants ABC, Inc., Buena Vista Books, Inc., Buena Vista Home Entertainment, Inc., Disney Consumer Products and Interactive Media, Inc., Disney Consumer Products, Inc., Disney Interactive Studios, Inc., Does 1-10, Walt Disney Pictures. Jury Demanded, filed by plaintiffs Furrywood Studios, LLC, Brian Neil Hoff. Submitted with Attachment 1 to Notice of Removal #1 (car)
April 12, 2019 Filing 5 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendants ABC, Inc., Buena Vista Books, Inc., Buena Vista Home Entertainment, Inc., Disney Consumer Products and Interactive Media, Inc., Disney Consumer Products, Inc., Disney Interactive Studios, Inc., Walt Disney Pictures. (Petrocelli, Daniel)
April 12, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants ABC, Inc., Buena Vista Books, Inc., Buena Vista Home Entertainment, Inc., Disney Consumer Products and Interactive Media, Inc., Disney Consumer Products, Inc., Disney Interactive Studios, Inc., Walt Disney Pictures, identifying Walt Disney Pictures; ABC, Inc.; Buena Vista Home Entertainment, Inc.; Disney Consumer Products, Inc.; Disney Consumer Products and Interactive Media, Inc.; Buena Vista Books, Inc.; and Disney Interactive Studios, Inc.. (Petrocelli, Daniel)
April 12, 2019 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendants ABC, Inc., Buena Vista Books, Inc., Buena Vista Home Entertainment, Inc., Disney Consumer Products and Interactive Media, Inc., Disney Consumer Products, Inc., Disney Interactive Studios, Inc., Walt Disney Pictures identifying The Walt Disney Company as Corporate Parent. (Petrocelli, Daniel)
April 12, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by defendants ABC, Inc., Buena Vista Books, Inc., Buena Vista Home Entertainment, Inc., Disney Consumer Products and Interactive Media, Inc., Disney Consumer Products, Inc., Disney Interactive Studios, Inc., Walt Disney Pictures. Related Case(s): 2:17-cv-02185 (Petrocelli, Daniel)
April 12, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Riverside County Superior Court, case number PSC1901504 Receipt No: 0973-23543173 - Fee: $400, filed by defendants Disney Consumer Products, Inc., Walt Disney Pictures, Disney Consumer Products and Interactive Media, Inc., Disney Interactive Studios, Inc., Buena Vista Books, Inc., ABC, Inc., Buena Vista Home Entertainment, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Complaint) (Attorney Daniel M Petrocelli added to party ABC, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Daniel M Petrocelli added to party Buena Vista Books, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Daniel M Petrocelli added to party Buena Vista Home Entertainment, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Daniel M Petrocelli added to party Disney Consumer Products and Interactive Media, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Daniel M Petrocelli added to party Disney Consumer Products, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Daniel M Petrocelli added to party Disney Interactive Studios, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Daniel M Petrocelli added to party Walt Disney Pictures(pty:dft))(Petrocelli, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brian Neil Hoff et al v. Walt Disney Pictures et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Buena Vista Books, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel M Petrocelli
Represented By: Craig P Bloom
Represented By: Drew E Breuder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walt Disney Pictures
Represented By: Daniel M Petrocelli
Represented By: Craig P Bloom
Represented By: Drew E Breuder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Disney Consumer Products and Interactive Media, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel M Petrocelli
Represented By: Craig P Bloom
Represented By: Drew E Breuder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel M Petrocelli
Represented By: Craig P Bloom
Represented By: Drew E Breuder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 through 10, inclusive,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Buena Vista Home Entertainment, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel M Petrocelli
Represented By: Craig P Bloom
Represented By: Drew E Breuder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Disney Consumer Products, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel M Petrocelli
Represented By: Craig P Bloom
Represented By: Drew E Breuder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Disney Interactive Studios, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel M Petrocelli
Represented By: Craig P Bloom
Represented By: Drew E Breuder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Furrywood Studios, LLC
Represented By: Muhammed Talal Hussain
Represented By: Justin P Karczag
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Neil Hoff
Represented By: Muhammed Talal Hussain
Represented By: Justin P Karczag
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?