Carmen Rodriguez v. Nancy A. Berryhill

Plaintiff: Carmen Rodriguez
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Case Number: 5:2019cv00667
Filed: April 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: David O Carter
Referring Judge: John E McDermott
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 3, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE TO COUNSEL: ALL PARTIES having consented to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge, this case has been reassigned to Magistrate Judge John E. McDermott for all further proceedings. Please use the case number EDCV19-667 JEM on all documents subsequently filed to ensure the proper routing of all filings. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. TEXT ONLY ENTRY. (sn)
May 31, 2019 Filing 14 CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill. (Attorney Marla K Letellier added to party Nancy A. Berryhill(pty:dft))(Letellier, Marla)
May 14, 2019 Filing 13 CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by Plaintiff Carmen Rodriguez. (Krank, Laura)
May 14, 2019 Filing 12 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Carmen Rodriguez, upon Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill served on 5/14/2019, answer due 7/15/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were Service was executed in compliance with statute not specified. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt NOT attached. Original Summons NOT returned. (Krank, Laura)
April 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Magistrate Judge John E. McDermott. [See Order for details.] (san)
April 17, 2019 Filing 10 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill. (sbou)
April 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER by Magistrate Judge John E. McDermott: granting #5 REQUEST to Proceed in Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60). (sbou)
April 12, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR: Due to clerical error Re: Notice of Reference to US Magistrate Judge (CV-25) - optional html form #6 . Document number 6 due to clerical error. Notice of Assignment CV-25 was issued in error without plaintiff by the docket clerk. (ghap)
April 12, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge David O. Carter and referred to Magistrate Judge John E. McDermott. (ghap)
April 12, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge David O. Carter and referred to Magistrate Judge John E. McDermott. (ghap)
April 12, 2019 Filing 5 REQUESTED TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS WITH DECLARATION IN SUPPORT-FILED as APPLICATION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, Declaration in Support filed by Plaintiff Carmen Rodriguez. (Krank, Laura) Modified on 4/12/2019 (ghap).
April 12, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Carmen Rodriguez, (Krank, Laura)
April 12, 2019 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Carmen Rodriguez. (Krank, Laura)
April 12, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Carmen Rodriguez. (Krank, Laura)
April 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with In Forma Pauperis request, filed by Plaintiff Carmen Rodriguez. (Attorney Laura E Krank added to party Carmen Rodriguez(pty:dft))(Krank, Laura)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carmen Rodriguez v. Nancy A. Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carmen Rodriguez
Represented By: Laura E Krank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Represented By: Assistant US Attorney LA-CV
Represented By: Assistant US Attorney LA-SSA
Represented By: Marla K Letellier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?