Trustees of the Operating Engineers Pension Trust v. Rex Olson et al

Plaintiff: Trustees of the Operating Engineers Pension Trust
Defendant: Jill E. Young and Rex Olson
Case Number: 5:2019cv00669
Filed: April 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Philip S Gutierrez
Referring Judge: Kenly Kiya Kato
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 27, 2019 Filing 17 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Rex Olson answer now due 7/31/2019, filed by Plaintiff Trustees of the Operating Engineers Pension Trust.(Decker, Marija)
June 26, 2019 Filing 16 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Trustees of the Operating Engineers Pension Trust, upon Defendant Rex Olson served on 6/10/2019, answer due 7/1/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Rex Olson, an individual in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Decker, Marija)
May 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. Scheduling Conference set for 1/13/2020 at 02:00 PM. (wm)
May 21, 2019 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Jill E. Young, identifying Defendant Jill E. Young, Defendant Rex Olson, Plaintiff Trustees of the Operating Engineers Pension Trust. (Glasco, A)
May 21, 2019 Filing 13 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Jill E. Young. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit EXHIBIT 1 (Redacted) to Answer)(Glasco, A)
May 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez: the following document(s) be STRICKEN for failure to comply with the Local Rules, General Order and/or the Courts Case Management Order: Answer #9 , for the following reasons: Local Rule 7.1-1 No Certification of Interested Parties and/or no copies. (bm)
May 14, 2019 Filing 11 INITIAL DISCLOSURE of interested parties re Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #4 filed by Defendant Jill E. Young (Glasco, A)
May 13, 2019 Filing 10 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Trustees of the Operating Engineers Pension Trust, upon Defendant Jill E. Young served on 5/6/2019, answer due 5/28/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Jill E. Young, an individual in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Decker, Marija)
May 13, 2019 Filing 9 DOCUMENT STRICKEN ON 5/15/19. ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendant Jill E. Young. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Designation of Trust Beneficiary)(Attorney A George Glasco added to party Jill E. Young(pty:dft))(Glasco, A) Modified on 5/16/2019 (bm).
April 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STANDING ORDER REGARDING NEWLY ASSIGNED CASES by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. (ji)
April 12, 2019 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants Rex Olson, Jill E. Young. (et)
April 12, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et)
April 12, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Philip S. Gutierrez and Magistrate Judge Kenly Kiya Kato. (et)
April 12, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Trustees of the Operating Engineers Pension Trust, (Decker, Marija)
April 12, 2019 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Trustees of the Operating Engineers Pension Trust. (Decker, Marija)
April 12, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Trustees of the Operating Engineers Pension Trust. (Decker, Marija)
April 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-23544719 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Trustees of the Operating Engineers Pension Trust. (Attorney Marija Kristich Decker added to party Trustees of the Operating Engineers Pension Trust(pty:pla))(Decker, Marija)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Trustees of the Operating Engineers Pension Trust v. Rex Olson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jill E. Young
Represented By: Alphonz George Glasco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rex Olson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trustees of the Operating Engineers Pension Trust
Represented By: Marija Kristich Decker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?