United States of America v. 40 Acres of Land et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Efren Cano Rivera, 40 Acres of Land, N.R.L.L., LLC, Spouses of Asuncion Castro Rivera and Efren Cano Rivera, Asuncion Castro Rivera and San Bernardino County Auditor-Controller/Treasurer/Tax Collector
Case Number: 5:2019cv00672
Filed: April 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Dolly M Gee
Referring Judge: Kenly Kiya Kato
Nature of Suit: Condemnation
Cause of Action: 28:1358
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 6, 2019 Filing 16 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff United States of America, National Registered Agents, inc. letter served on 4/26/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2)(Changrani, Bhavna)
June 6, 2019 Filing 15 SERVICE by Publication filed by Plaintiff United States of America. Certificate of Service by Publication and Mailing Dates of publication are: 5/16/19, 5/23/19, 5/30/19. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Changrani, Bhavna)
June 5, 2019 Filing 14 SERVICE by Publication filed by Plaintiff United States of America. Certificate of Service by Publication Dates of publication are: 5/16/19, 5/23/19, 5/30/19. (Changrani, Bhavna)
May 16, 2019 Filing 13 DISCLAIMER filed by Defendant San Bernardino County Auditor-Controller/Treasurer/Tax Collector. (Norton, Mitchell)
May 9, 2019 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff United States of America. upon San Bernardino County Auditor-Controller/Treasurer/Tax Collector waiver sent by Plaintiff on 4/22/2019, answer due 6/21/2019. Waiver of Service signed by Mitchell L. Norton. (Changrani, Bhavna)
May 9, 2019 Filing 11 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff United States of America, re Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only #8 , Notice (Other), #4 , Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form #7 , Notice (Other) #5 , Declaration, #3 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , EX PARTE APPLICATION to Deposit Funds Ex Parte Application For Order to Permit Deposit of Estimate of Just Compensation Into An Interest Bearing Account In The Court's Registry #9 , Notice of Assignment to United States Judges(CV-18) - optional html form #6 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 served on April 22, 2019. (Changrani, Bhavna)
April 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER PERMITTING DEPOSIT OF ESTIMATE OF JUST COMPENSATION INTO AN INTEREST BEARING ACCOUNT IN THE COURT'S REGISTRY by Judge Dolly M. Gee: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff's Ex Parte Motion #9 is GRANTED. The Clerk of the Court shall accept the deposit of $15,000.00 tendered by the United States, including by wire transfer or check, and shall deposit these funds into an interest-bearing account under the terms and conditions of Fed. R. Civ. P. 67 and Local Civil Rule 67. (gk)
April 22, 2019 Filing 9 EX PARTE APPLICATION to Deposit Funds Ex Parte Application For Order to Permit Deposit of Estimate of Just Compensation Into An Interest Bearing Account In The Court's Registry filed by plaintiff United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Changrani, Bhavna)
April 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 INITIAL STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Dolly M. Gee. (kti)
April 17, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
April 17, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dolly M. Gee and Magistrate Judge Kenly Kiya Kato. (jtil)
April 17, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Errata correcting Schedule G to the Complaint, the Declaration of Taking, and the Notice of Condemnation filed by plaintiff United States of America. (Changrani, Bhavna)
April 15, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Condemnation filed by plaintiff United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Schedule A, #2 Schedule B, #3 Schedule C, #4 Schedule D, #5 Schedule E, #6 Schedule F, #7 Schedule G, #8 Certificate of Service)(Changrani, Bhavna)
April 15, 2019 Filing 3 DECLARATION of United States Declaration of Taking filed by Plaintiff United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Schedule A, #2 Schedule B, #3 Schedule C, #4 Schedule D, #5 Schedule E, #6 Schedule F, #7 Schedule G)(Changrani, Bhavna)
April 15, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Attachment)(Changrani, Bhavna)
April 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT No Fee Required - US Government, filed by plaintiff United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Taking, #2 Schedule A, #3 Schedule B, #4 Schedule C, #5 Schedule D, #6 Schedule E, #7 Schedule F, #8 Schedule G, #9 Civil Cover Sheet) (Attorney Bhavna Changrani added to party United States of America(pty:pla))(Changrani, Bhavna)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. 40 Acres of Land et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Efren Cano Rivera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 40 Acres of Land
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: N.R.L.L., LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Spouses of Asuncion Castro Rivera and Efren Cano Rivera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Asuncion Castro Rivera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: San Bernardino County Auditor-Controller/Treasurer/Tax Collector
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Bhavna Changrani
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?