Gisela Altagarcia Ortiz v. Nancy A. Berryhill

Plaintiff: Gisela Altagarcia Ortiz
Defendant: Acting Commissioner Nancy A. Berryhill and Nancy A. Berryhill
Case Number: 5:2019cv00674
Filed: April 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Patrick J Walsh
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 20, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE TO COUNSEL: ALL PARTIES having consented to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge, this case has been reassigned to Magistrate Judge Patrick J. Walsh for all further proceedings. Please use the case number EDCV19-674 PJW on all documents subsequently filed to ensure the proper routing of all filings. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. TEXT ONLY ENTRY. (sn)
May 18, 2019 Filing 12 CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by Plaintiff Gisela Altagarcia Ortiz. (Kuntz, William)
May 18, 2019 Filing 11 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Gisela Altagarcia Ortiz, upon Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill served on 5/6/2019, answer due 9/3/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the United States Attorneys Office by delivering a copy to F. DeLaRosa, Title Unknown,. Executed upon the Attorney Generals Office of the United States by delivering a copy to Carly Sase, Title Unknown,. Executed upon the officer agency or corporation by delivering a copy to Unknown Signer, Title Unknown, on behalf of General Counsel. Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt attached. Original Summons NOT returned. Case Management Orders were also served along with Complaint documents. (Attachments: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipts)(Kuntz, William)
May 17, 2019 Filing 10 CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill. (Attorney Marla K Letellier added to party Nancy A. Berryhill(pty:dft))(Letellier, Marla)
April 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER RE: PROCEDURES IN SOCIAL SECURITY APPEAL by Magistrate Judge Patrick J. Walsh. Plaintiff will promptly serve the summons and complaint on the government in accordance with Rule 4(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Plaintiff will file an appropriate proof of service within 30 days of the date of this Order. Government counsel must file a notice of appearance within 30 days of service of the action. (See document for details.) (sbou)
April 29, 2019 Filing 8 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill. (sbou)
April 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Patrick J. Walsh: granting #3 REQUEST to Proceed in Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60). (sbou)
April 17, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Ronald S.W. Lew and referred to Magistrate Judge Patrick J. Walsh. (et)
April 15, 2019 Filing 5 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Gisela Altagarcia Ortiz. (Kuntz, William)
April 15, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Gisela Altagarcia Ortiz, identifying United States of America and Social Security Administration. (Kuntz, William)
April 15, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, Declaration in Support filed by Plaintiff Gisela Altagarcia Ortiz. (Kuntz, William)
April 15, 2019 Filing 2 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Gisela Altagarcia Ortiz. (Kuntz, William)
April 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with In Forma Pauperis request, filed by Plaintiff Gisela Altagarcia Ortiz. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Attorney William M Kuntz added to party Gisela Altagarcia Ortiz(pty:pla))(Kuntz, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gisela Altagarcia Ortiz v. Nancy A. Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acting Commissioner Nancy A. Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Represented By: Assistant US Attorney LA-SSA
Represented By: Assistant US Attorney LA-CV
Represented By: Marla K Letellier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gisela Altagarcia Ortiz
Represented By: William M Kuntz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?