Maxine D. Vanderploeg v. Nancy A. Berryhill

Plaintiff: Maxine D. Vanderploeg
Defendant: Acting Commissioner Nancy A. Berryhill and Nancy A. Berryhill
Case Number: 5:2019cv00676
Filed: April 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Suzanne H Segal
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 20, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE TO COUNSEL: ALL PARTIES having consented to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge, this case has been reassigned to Magistrate Judge Suzanne H. Segal for all further proceedings. Please use the case number EDCV19-676 SS on all documents subsequently filed to ensure the proper routing of all filings. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. TEXT ONLY ENTRY. (sn)
May 17, 2019 Filing 12 CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by PLAINTIFF Maxine D. Vanderploeg. (Padilla, Rebecca)
May 17, 2019 Filing 11 CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill. (Attorney Marla K Letellier added to party Nancy A. Berryhill(pty:dft))(Letellier, Marla)
May 2, 2019 Filing 10 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Maxine D. Vanderploeg, upon Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill served on 4/25/2019, answer due 8/23/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the United States Attorneys Office by delivering a copy to G. ORTEGA. Executed upon the Attorney Generals Office of the United States by delivering a copy to UNKNOWN. Executed upon the officer agency or corporation by delivering a copy to UNKNOWN. Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt attached. Original Summons NOT returned. (Padilla, Rebecca)
April 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER RE: PROCEDURES IN SOCIAL SECURITY APPEAL (CROSS MEMORANDA FORMAT) by Magistrate Judge Suzanne H. Segal. Plaintiff will file an appropriate proof of service no later than 90 days of the date of this Order. (see document for further details) (hr)
April 23, 2019 Filing 8 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill. (hr)
April 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Suzanne H. Segal: granting #5 REQUEST to Proceed in Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60). (hr)
April 16, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Andre Birotte Jr and referred to Magistrate Judge Suzanne H. Segal. (car)
April 15, 2019 Filing 5 REQUEST to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, Declaration in Support filed by PLAINTIFF Maxine D. Vanderploeg. (Padilla, Rebecca)
April 15, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by PLAINTIFF Maxine D. Vanderploeg, identifying MAXINE D. VANDERPLOEG and COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY. (Padilla, Rebecca)
April 15, 2019 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by PLAINTIFF Maxine D. Vanderploeg. (Padilla, Rebecca)
April 15, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Maxine D. Vanderploeg. (Padilla, Rebecca)
April 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with In Forma Pauperis request, filed by PLAINTIFF Maxine D. Vanderploeg. (Attorney Rebecca Christina Padilla added to party Maxine D. Vanderploeg(pty:pla))(Padilla, Rebecca)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Maxine D. Vanderploeg v. Nancy A. Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acting Commissioner Nancy A. Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Represented By: Assistant US Attorney LA-SSA
Represented By: Assistant US Attorney LA-CV
Represented By: Marla K Letellier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maxine D. Vanderploeg
Represented By: Rebecca Christina Padilla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?