George Anthony Topete v. Jared D. Lazano

Plaintiff: Jared D. Lazano
Petitioner: George Anthony Topete
Case Number: 5:2019cv00678
Filed: April 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Dale S Fischer
Referring Judge: Jean P Rosenbluth
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 18, 2019 Filing 7 TRAVERSE Traverse to the Answer to the Habeas petition filed by Petitioner George Anthony Topete. (Ford, Patrick)
May 15, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF LODGING filed re Answer to Complaint #5 (Attachments: #1 Lodgment 1 Part 1, #2 Lodgment 1 Part 2, #3 Lodgment 1 Part 3, #4 Lodgment 1 Part 4, #5 Lodgment 1 Part 5, #6 Lodgment 2, #7 Lodgment 3 Part 1, #8 Lodgment 3 Part 2, #9 Lodgment 4, #10 Lodgment 5, #11 Lodgment 6, #12 Lodgment 7, #13 Lodgment 8, #14 Lodgment 9)(Delgado-Rucci, David)
May 15, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, #1 filed by Respondent Jared D. Lazano. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of the Answer to the Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus)(Delgado-Rucci, David)
April 24, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney David Delgado-Rucci on behalf of Respondent Jared D. Lazano (Attorney David Delgado-Rucci added to party Jared D. Lazano(pty:res))(Delgado-Rucci, David)
April 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER REQUIRING RESPONSE TO PETITION by Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth. IT IS ORDERED that 1. The Clerk of this Court must promptly serve on the Attorney General for the State of California an electronic copy of (a) the Petition and (b) this Order. The Clerk should also serve a copy of this Order on Petitioner. No later than 14 days from the date of this Order, Petitioners counsel must fill out and return to the Court an Election Regarding Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge form, which the Clerk is directed to send to him.1 Within 14 days of the date of this Order, Respondent must file and serve a notice of appearance that designates the Deputy Attorney General(s) in charge of the case. Respondent should file a motion to dismiss within 30 days of the date of this Order.2 Respondent must file and serve an answer to the Petition within 45 days of the date of this Order. Within 30 days of the date of service of the answer, Petitioner may file a single reply responding to matters raised in it. (See Order for further details) Notice: The court has issued a ruling on preliminary review. Pursuant to the Agreement on Acceptance of Service between the Clerk of Court and the California Attorney Generals Office, this Notice constitutes service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. Motions to Dismiss shall be filed by 5/20/2019. Traverse due by 6/3/2019 (Attachments: #1 State Habeas Petition, #2 Consent) (bem)
April 16, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF REFERENCE to a U.S. Magistrate Judge. This case has been assigned to the calendar of the Honorable District Judge Dale S. Fischer and referred to Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth, who is authorized to consider preliminary matters and conduct all further hearings as may be appropriate or necessary. Pursuant to Local Rule 83-2.4, the Court must be notified within five (5) days of any address change. See notice for additional details. (esa)
April 15, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus by a Person in State Custody (28 USC 2254), Receipt No. 0973-23551778 for $5 filing fee, filed by Petitioner George Anthony Topete. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum Memorandum of Law, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) (Attorney Patrick Morgan Ford added to party George Anthony Topete(pty:pet))(Ford, Patrick)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: George Anthony Topete v. Jared D. Lazano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jared D. Lazano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: George Anthony Topete
Represented By: Patrick Morgan Ford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?