Damon I. Echols v. County of San Bernardino et al

Plaintiff: Damon I Echols
Defendant: County of San Bernardino and Does 1-10
Case Number: 5:2019cv00686
Filed: April 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Kenly Kiya Kato
Referring Judge: George H Wu
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 26, 2019 Filing 19 REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Defendant County of San Bernardino. (Gregory, Kenneth)
June 20, 2019 Filing 18 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #16 filed by Plaintiff Damon I Echols. (Mitchell, John)
June 6, 2019 Filing 17 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #16 filed by Defendant County of San Bernardino. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-3)(Gregory, Kenneth)
June 6, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendant County of San Bernardino. Motion set for hearing on 7/11/2019 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Declaration) (Gregory, Kenneth)
June 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge George H. Wu re: #11 MOTION to Dismiss Case. On May 29, 2019, Plaintiff Damon I. Echols filed a First Amended Complaint. In light of that filing, the Operative Complaint is no longer the original complaint. As such, the Court VACATES Defendants' Motion to Dismiss the Complaint #11 , filed on May 14, 2019, and set for hearing on July 1, 2019. (mrgo)
May 29, 2019 Filing 14 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendant County of San Bernardino, Does amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 (Mitchell, John)
May 22, 2019 Filing 13 TEXT-ONLY ENTRY - IN CHAMBERS: by Judge George H. Wu: The Court, on its own motion, CONTINUES DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS THE COMPLAINT #11 previously scheduled for 06/20/2019 to 7/1/2019 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (jag) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
May 14, 2019 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant County of San Bernardino, identifying County of San Bernardino. (Gregory, Kenneth)
May 14, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendant County of San Bernardino. Motion set for hearing on 6/20/2019 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Attorney Kenneth C Gregory added to party County of San Bernardino(pty:dft)) (Gregory, Kenneth)
April 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Standing Order Re Final Pre-Trial Conferences for Civil Jury Trials by Judge George H. Wu. (lom)
April 19, 2019 Filing 9 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to defendant County of San Bernardino. (mrgo)
April 18, 2019 Filing 8 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Notice of Deficiency in Request to Issue Summons, #7 filed by Plaintiff Damon I Echols. (Mitchell, John)
April 18, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Summons Request #6 . The following error(s) was found: The name and address of the attorney for plaintiff(s)must be entered in the appropriate field. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (mrgo)
April 17, 2019 Filing 6 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Damon I. Echols Damon I Echols. (Mitchell, John)
April 17, 2019 Filing 5 Certificate and Notice of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Damon I Echols re: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 (Mitchell, John)
April 17, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 . The following error(s) was found: No Notice of Interested Parties has been filed. A Notice of Interested Parties must be filed with every partys first appearance. See Local Rule 7.1-1. Counsel must file a Notice of Interested Parties immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. Other error(s) with document(s): Attachment 1 Civil Cover Sheet should have been e-filed separately and in the correct event category. The event is located under Civil Events Other Filings Miscellaneous Filings. No further action is required for the Civil Cover Sheet unless the Court so directs. (car)
April 17, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car)
April 17, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge George H. Wu and Magistrate Judge Kenly Kiya Kato. (car)
April 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-23559279 - Fee: $400. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Attorney John Kevin Mitchell added to party Damon I Echols(pty:pla))(Mitchell, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Damon I. Echols v. County of San Bernardino et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of San Bernardino
Represented By: Kenneth C Gregory
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Damon I Echols
Represented By: John Kevin Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?