Lori Anna Massey v. Alan B. Thomas et al
Plaintiff: Lori Anna Massey
Defendant: Puget Sound Orthopedics, Lakewood Surgery Center and Alan B Thomas
Case Number: 5:2019cv00837
Filed: May 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Jesus G Bernal
Referring Judge: Sheri Pym
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 22, 2019 Filing 7 TEXT-ONLY ENTRY - RECEIVED Notice of Receipt of Electronic Case Transfer from Western District of Washington, 3:19-cv-05453 filed 5/22/2019. (iv)
May 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Jesus G. Bernal: (1) TRANSFERRING Action to the United States District Court for the Western District of Washington; and (2) DENYING AS MOOT Plaintiffs Request to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. IT THEREFORE IS ORDERED in the interest of justice that this action is hereby transferred to the United States District Court for the Western District of Washington. The Clerk shall effect such transfer and notify the Plaintiff. Plaintiffs IFP Request is DENIED AS MOOT. Case electronically sent to the Western District of Washington. MD JS-6. Case Terminated. (twdb)
May 3, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa)
May 3, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Jesus G. Bernal and Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym. (esa)
May 3, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, Declaration in Support filed by plaintiff Lori Anna Massey. (esa)
May 3, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE OF INTERESTED PARTIES filed by plaintiff Lori Anna Massey. (esa)
May 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendants Lakewood Surgery Center, Puget Sound Orthopedics, Alan B Thomas. Case assigned to Judge Jesus G. Bernal for all further proceedings. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym, Jury Demand, filed by plaintiff Lori Anna Massey. (Attachments: #1 part 2, #2 part 3, #3 part 4) (esa) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/6/2019: #4 CV 71) (esa). Modified on 5/13/2019 (lmu). (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/14/2019: #5 Summons not issued) (esa).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lori Anna Massey v. Alan B. Thomas et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Puget Sound Orthopedics
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lakewood Surgery Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alan B Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lori Anna Massey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?