Andre Patterson v. G. Cortez et al
Plaintiff: Andre Patterson
Defendant: G. Cortez, Dean Borders, J. Vaca, Connie Gibson and S. Gosserand
Case Number: 5:2019cv00907
Filed: May 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Paul L Abrams
Referring Judge: R Gary Klausner
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER RE: CIVIL RIGHTS CASE by Magistrate Judge Paul L. Abrams. Until the complaint has been screened and the Court has ordered that service of process may occur, plaintiff may not proceed with service of process upon defendant(s). (See document for details.) (sbou)
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER RE REQUEST TO PROCEED WITHOUT PREPAYMENT OF FILING FEES by Magistrate Judge Paul L. Abrams,IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 1915, the prisoner-plaintiff owes the Court the total filing fee of $350.00. An initial partial filing fee of $5.00 must be paid within thirty (30) days of the date this order is filed. re #3 (sbou)
June 26, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE NOTICE OF SUBMISSION OF VOLUMINOUS EXHIBITS/ DOCUMENTS BY MAIL filed by Plaintiff Andre Patterson.(sbou)
June 4, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF SUBMISSION OF VOLUMINOUS EXHIBITS/ DOCUMENTS BY MAIL filed by Plaintiff Andre Patterson. (sbou)
May 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER by Judge R. Gary Klausner DENYING REQUEST for Leave to Proceed without Prepayment of Filing Fee #3 . IT IS RECOMMENDED by Magistrate Jude Paul L. Abrams for the following reasons: FailuRe to provide certified copy of trust fund statement for the last six (6) months. Plaintiff SHALL PAY THE FILING FEES IN FULL within 30 days or this case will be dismissed. (jp)
May 28, 2019 RECOMMENDATION issued by Magistrate Judge Paul L. Abrams. Re REQUEST to Proceed Without Prepayment of Filing Fees with Declaration in Support #3 . Proposed Order forwarded to the District Judge for approval.(ch)
May 15, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge R. Gary Klausner and referred to Magistrate Judge Paul L. Abrams. (esa)
May 15, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST to Proceed Without Prepayment of Filing Fees with Declaration in Support filed by plaintiff Andre Patterson. (esa)
May 15, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Submission of voluminous exhibits/documents by mail filed by plaintiff Andre Patterson. (esa)
May 15, 2019 Filing 1 CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT filed against defendants Dean Borders, G. Cortez, Connie Gibson, S. Gosserand, J. Vaca pursuant to 42 USC 1983pr. Case assigned to Judge R. Gary Klausner and referred to Magistrate Judge Paul L. Abrams, filed by plaintiff Andre Patterson. (esa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Andre Patterson v. G. Cortez et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G. Cortez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dean Borders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Vaca
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Connie Gibson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. Gosserand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andre Patterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?