Garrett and Jensen v. Hiscox, Inc.

Plaintiff: Garrett & Jensen and Garrett and Jensen
Defendant: HISCOX, INC.
Case Number: 5:2019cv00919
Filed: May 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Shashi H Kewalramani
Referring Judge: George H Wu
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER GRANTING EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR A STAY OR CONTINUANCE OF MOTION TO DISMISS AND RIGHT TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT by Judge George H. Wu re: #20 EX PARTE APPLICATION to Continue. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT Plaintiff will file its opposition on or before July 31, 2019. Defendant's reply will be filed on or before August 14, 2019. The hearing will be held on August 29, 2019 at 8:30 a.m. (mrgo)
June 14, 2019 Filing 20 Emergency EX PARTE APPLICATION to Stay Case pending All matters including Motion to Dismiss and Right to File First Amended Complaint , Emergency EX PARTE APPLICATION to Continue Hearing from July 9th 2019 to September 12th 2019 filed by Plaintiff Garrett and Jensen. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Proposed Order) (Jensen, Boyd)
May 29, 2019 Filing 19 DECLARATION of Neal Kojima in support of Amended NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case Pursuant to Fed. R. CIV. P. 12(b)(6) #17 filed by Defendant Hiscox, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Kojima, Neal)
May 29, 2019 Filing 18 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re Amended NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case Pursuant to Fed. R. CIV. P. 12(b)(6) #17 filed by Defendant Hiscox, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Kojima, Neal)
May 29, 2019 Filing 17 Amended NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case Pursuant to Fed. R. CIV. P. 12(b)(6) filed by Defendant Hiscox, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 7/8/2019 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #2 Proposed Order) (Kojima, Neal)
May 29, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Defendant Hiscox, Inc.. correcting Declaration (Motion related), #14 , Amended NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Complaint Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) #12 , Request for Judicial Notice, #13 (Kojima, Neal)
May 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Standing Order Re Final Pre-Trial Conferences for Civil Jury Trial by Judge George H. Wu. (lom)
May 28, 2019 Filing 14 DECLARATION of Neal K. Kojima in support of Amended NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Complaint Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) #12 filed by Defendant Hiscox, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Kojima, Neal)
May 28, 2019 Filing 13 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re Amended NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Complaint Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) #12 filed by Defendant Hiscox, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Kojima, Neal)
May 28, 2019 Filing 12 Amended NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Complaint Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) filed by Defendant Hiscox, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 7/8/2019 at 09:00 AM before Judge George H. Wu. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points & Authorities, #2 Proposed Order) (Kojima, Neal)
May 28, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Defendant Hiscox, Inc.. correcting NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure Rule 12(b)(6) #9 (Kojima, Neal)
May 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 19-03-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 5:18-cv-00048 GW(SHKx). Case transferred from Magistrate Judge Kenly Kiya Kato and Judge R. Gary Klausner to Judge George H. Wu and Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 5:19-cv-00919 GW(SHKx). Signed by Judge George H. Wu (rn)
May 24, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure Rule 12(b)(6) filed by Defendant Hiscox, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities in support of Motion to Dismiss, #2 Declaration of Neil Kojima, #3 Exhibit 1 - Copy of 5/17/19 Email to Boyd Jensen, #4 Exhibit 2 - Boyd Jensen's 5/17/19 Email, #5 Exhibit 3 - 5/17/19, 5:58 p.m. Responsive Email, #6 Request for Judicial Notice, #7 Exhibit 1 - Second Amended Complaint, #8 Exhibit 2 - Order for Ex Parte Application Relieving Boyd Jensen as Counsel, #9 Exhibit 3 - Order to Dismiss with Prejudice, #10 Proposed Order) (Kojima, Neal)
May 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STANDING ORDER REGARDING NEWLY ASSIGNED CASES by Judge R. Gary Klausner. (sw)
May 21, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
May 21, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT of Eastern Division Removal Case. This case was initially assigned to District Judge Jesus G. Bernal and referred to Magistrate Judge Kenly Kiya Kato for discovery. Pursuant to General Order 19-03, this case has been randomly reassigned to District Judge R. Gary Klausner. The case number on all documents filed with the Court in this case should read as follows: 5:19-cv-00919 RGK (KKx). (lh)
May 17, 2019 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendant Hiscox, Inc. Filed by Plaintiff Garrett and Jensen. (FILED IN RIVERSIDE COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT ON 4/16/2019 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL, DOCUMENT 1-2 #1 ) (lh)
May 17, 2019 Filing 5 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant HISCOX, INC., re Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #3 , Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , Declaration #4 served on May 17, 2019. (Kojima, Neal)
May 17, 2019 Filing 4 DECLARATION of Neal K. Kojima re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendant HISCOX, INC.. (Kojima, Neal)
May 17, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant HISCOX, INC., identifying Hiscox, Inc.; Hiscox Holdings, Inc.; Hiscox Ltd.; Garrett & Jensen; Boyd F. Jensen, II. (Kojima, Neal)
May 17, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant HISCOX, INC.. (Kojima, Neal)
May 17, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Riverside, case number RIC1902470 Receipt No: 0973-23757819 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant HISCOX, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Complaint, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Proof of Service) (Attorney Neal Kei Kojima added to party HISCOX, INC.(pty:dft))(Kojima, Neal)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Garrett and Jensen v. Hiscox, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HISCOX, INC.
Represented By: Neal Kei Kojima
Represented By: Paul S White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Garrett & Jensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Garrett and Jensen
Represented By: Boyd Jensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?