Ambercity Hospice, Inc. v. Alex M. Azar II
Plaintiff: Ambercity Hospice, Inc.
Defendant: Alex M. Azar, II
Case Number: 5:2019cv00938
Filed: May 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Cormac J Carney
Referring Judge: Kenly Kiya Kato
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery Medicare
Cause of Action: 28:2345
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 5, 2019 Filing 10 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Ambercity Hospice, Inc., upon Defendant All Defendants. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the United States Attorneys Office by delivering a copy to Illegible Signature. Executed upon the Attorney Generals Office of the United States by delivering a copy to Illegible signature. Executed upon the officer agency or corporation by delivering a copy to Illigible signature. Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt attached. Original Summons returned. (Brownstein, William)
June 21, 2019 Filing 9 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Alex M. Azar, II. (iv)
June 20, 2019 Filing 8 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Ambercity Hospice, Inc.. (Brownstein, William)
May 21, 2019 Filing 7 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff Ambercity Hospice, Inc., re Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #6 served on 05/21/2019. (Brownstein, William)
May 21, 2019 Filing 6 Certification and Notice of Interested Parties (Local Rule 7.1-1) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff All Plaintiffs, identifying Ambercity Hospice, Inc.. (Brownstein, William)
May 21, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening. The following error(s) was found: No Notice of Interested Parties has been filed. A Notice of Interested Parties must be filed with every partys first appearance. See Local Rule 7.1-1. Counsel must file a Notice of Interested Parties immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. (esa)
May 21, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa)
May 21, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Cormac J. Carney and Magistrate Judge Kenly Kiya Kato. (esa)
May 20, 2019 Filing 2 * CIVIL COVER SHEET * filed as PETITION with filing fee previously paid (400 paid on 05/20/2019, receipt number 26HJRNL1), filed by Plaintiff Ambercity Hospice, Inc..(Brownstein, William) Modified by Clerk on 5/21/2019 (esa).
May 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-23772259 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Ambercity Hospice, Inc.. (Attorney William H Brownstein added to party Ambercity Hospice, Inc.(pty:pla))(Brownstein, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ambercity Hospice, Inc. v. Alex M. Azar II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ambercity Hospice, Inc.
Represented By: William H Brownstein
Represented By: Abundio Delicona Marapao, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alex M. Azar, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?