Michelle Marie Herrera v. Nancy A. Berryhill

Plaintiff: Michelle Marie Herrera
Defendant: Acting Commissioner Nancy A. Berryhill and Nancy A. Berryhill
Case Number: 5:2019cv00942
Filed: May 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: John D Early
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 5, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE TO COUNSEL: ALL PARTIES having consented to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge, this case has been reassigned to Magistrate Judge John D. Early for all further proceedings. Please use the case number EDCV19-942 JDE on all documents subsequently filed to ensure the proper routing of all filings. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. TEXT ONLY ENTRY. (sn)
July 4, 2019 Filing 12 CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by Plaintiff Michelle Marie Herrera. (Kuntz, William)
July 3, 2019 Filing 11 CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill. (Attorney Jennifer Lee Tarn added to party Nancy A. Berryhill(pty:dft))(Tarn, Jennifer)
June 21, 2019 Filing 10 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Michelle Marie Herrera, upon Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill served on 6/14/2019, answer due 10/15/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the United States Attorneys Office by delivering a copy to G. Ortega, Title Unknown,. Executed upon the Attorney Generals Office of the United States by delivering a copy to unknown signer, unknown title,. Executed upon the officer agency or corporation by delivering a copy to Unknown Signer, Title Unknown, on behalf of General Counsel. Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt attached. Original Summons NOT returned. Case Management Orders were also served along with Complaint documents. (Attachments: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipts)(Kuntz, William)
May 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 (IN CHAMBERS) Order re: Procedures in Social Security Appeal by Magistrate Judge John D. Early. (see document for details) (hr)
May 24, 2019 Filing 8 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill. (hr)
May 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER by Magistrate Judge John D. Early: granting #3 REQUEST to Proceed in Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60). (hr)
May 23, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Stephen V. Wilson and referred to Magistrate Judge John D. Early. (ghap)
May 21, 2019 Filing 5 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Michelle Marie Herrera. (Kuntz, William)
May 21, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Michelle Marie Herrera, identifying Unitied States of America and Social Security Administration. (Kuntz, William)
May 21, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, Declaration in Support filed by Plaintiff Michelle Marie Herrera. (Kuntz, William)
May 21, 2019 Filing 2 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Michelle Marie Herrera. (Kuntz, William)
May 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with In Forma Pauperis request, filed by Plaintiff Michelle Marie Herrera. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Attorney William M Kuntz added to party Michelle Marie Herrera(pty:pla))(Kuntz, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Michelle Marie Herrera v. Nancy A. Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acting Commissioner Nancy A. Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Represented By: Assistant US Attorney LA-SSA
Represented By: Assistant US Attorney LA-CV
Represented By: Jennifer Lee Tarn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle Marie Herrera
Represented By: William M Kuntz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?