April J. Michles v. Nancy A. Berryhill

Plaintiff: April J. Michles
Defendant: Acting Commissioner Nancy A. Berryhill and Nancy A. Berryhill
Case Number: 5:2019cv00943
Filed: May 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Alka Sagar
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 9, 2019 Filing 13 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff April J. Michles, upon Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill served on 6/5/2019, answer due 10/3/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the United States Attorneys Office by delivering a copy to F. DeLaRosa, Title Unknown,. Executed upon the Attorney Generals Office of the United States by delivering a copy to Carly Sase, Title Unknown,. The officer agency or corporation was NOT served. Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt attached. Original Summons NOT returned. Case Management Orders were also served along with Complaint documents. (Attachments: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipts)(Kuntz, William)
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar. The Court ORDERS Plaintiff to promptly serve the Summons and Complaint on the government in accordance with Rule 4(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Plaintiff will file an appropriate Proof of Service within seven (7) days of the date of this Order. All other deadlines of the CMO remain in effect. (see document for further details) (hr)
June 17, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE TO COUNSEL: ALL PARTIES having consented to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge, this case has been reassigned to Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar for all further proceedings. Please use the case number EDCV19-943 AS on all documents subsequently filed to ensure the proper routing of all filings. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. TEXT ONLY ENTRY. (sn)
June 16, 2019 Filing 10 CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by Plaintiff April J. Michles. (Kuntz, William)
June 14, 2019 Filing 9 CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill. (Attorney Annabelle J Yang added to party Nancy A. Berryhill(pty:dft))(Yang, Annabelle)
May 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER RE: PROCEDURES IN SOCIAL SECURITY APPEAL by Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar. (see document for details) (hr)
May 23, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Cormac J. Carney and referred to Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar. (ghap)
May 23, 2019 Filing 6 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill. (ghap)
May 21, 2019 Filing 5 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff April J. Michles. (Kuntz, William)
May 21, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Plaintiff April J. Michles. Related Case(s): EDCV14-00343-AS and EDCV16-02385-AS (Kuntz, William)
May 21, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff April J. Michles, identifying Unitied States of America and Social Security Administration. (Kuntz, William)
May 21, 2019 Filing 2 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff April J. Michles. (Kuntz, William)
May 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-23775146 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff April J. Michles. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Attorney William M Kuntz added to party April J. Michles(pty:pla))(Kuntz, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: April J. Michles v. Nancy A. Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acting Commissioner Nancy A. Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Represented By: Annabelle J Yang
Represented By: Assistant US Attorney LA-CV
Represented By: Assistant US Attorney LA-SSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: April J. Michles
Represented By: William M Kuntz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?