Family Hospice Care, Inc. v. Alex M. Azar II
Plaintiff: Family Hospice Care, Inc.
Defendant: Alex M. Azar, II
Case Number: 5:2019cv00950
Filed: May 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Dolly M Gee
Referring Judge: Alicia G Rosenberg
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery Medicare
Cause of Action: 28:2345
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 5, 2019 Filing 14 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Family Hospice Care, Inc., upon Defendant All Defendants. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the United States Attorneys Office by delivering a copy to Illegible Signature. Executed upon the Attorney Generals Office of the United States by delivering a copy to Illegible signature. Executed upon the officer agency or corporation by delivering a copy to Illigible signature. Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt attached. Original Summons NOT returned. (Brownstein, William)
June 21, 2019 Filing 13 60-Day Summons Issued re Complaint #1 as to Defendant Alex M. Azar II, Secretary of Health and Human Services. (gk)
June 20, 2019 Filing 12 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Family Hospice Care, Inc.. (Brownstein, William)
May 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 19-03 (Related Case) filed. Transfer of case declined by Judge Cormac J. Carney, for the reasons set forth on this order. Related Case No. 5:19-cv-00938 CJC(KKx) (rn)
May 22, 2019 Filing 10 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff Family Hospice Care, Inc., re Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #5 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , Proof of Service (subsequent documents) #4 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #3 , Notice of Assignment to United States Judges(CV-18) - optional html form #6 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #2 , Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form #7 , Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only #8 as Revised served on 05/22/2019. (Brownstein, William)
May 22, 2019 Filing 9 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff Family Hospice Care, Inc., re Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #5 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , Proof of Service (subsequent documents) #4 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #3 , Notice of Assignment to United States Judges(CV-18) - optional html form #6 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #2 , Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form #7 , Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only #8 served on 05/22/2019. (Brownstein, William)
May 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 INITIAL STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Dolly M. Gee. (kti)
May 22, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa)
May 22, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dolly M. Gee and Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. (esa)
May 22, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff All Plaintiffs, identifying Family Hospice Care, Inc.. (Brownstein, William)
May 22, 2019 Filing 4 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff Family Hospice Care, Inc., re Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #3 served on 05/22/2019. (Brownstein, William)
May 22, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff All Plaintiffs, identifying Family Hospice Care, Inc.. (Brownstein, William)
May 21, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff All Plaintiffs, identifying Family Hospice Care, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service - Acknowledgment of Service)(Brownstein, William)
May 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-23781975 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Family Hospice Care, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Attorney William H Brownstein added to party Family Hospice Care, Inc.(pty:pla))(Brownstein, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Family Hospice Care, Inc. v. Alex M. Azar II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Family Hospice Care, Inc.
Represented By: William H Brownstein
Represented By: Abundio Delicona Marapao, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alex M. Azar, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?