Securities and Exchange Commission v. Daniel Pacheco et al

Plaintiff: Securities and Exchange Commission
Defendant: Fintact Solutions Group LLC, Daniel Pacheco, Trident Commerce LLC, Maritus Regalis LLC, Fintact Payment Solutions LLC, Gabtta LLC, EProfit Systems LLC and Matthew Lopez
Case Number: 5:2019cv00958
Filed: May 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Michael W Fitzgerald
Referring Judge: Alexander F MacKinnon
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 15:77
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER GRANTING SECOND STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO INITIAL COMPLAINT #17 by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. Relief Defendants Matthew Lopez, Fintact Solutions Group LLC, Fintact Payment Solutions LLC, Maritus Regalis LLC, Gabtta LLC, and Trident Commerce LLC shall have until August 16, 2019 to respond to the initial Complaint. (hr)
July 16, 2019 Filing 17 Second STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to August 16, 2019 filed by Relief Defendants Fintact Payment Solutions LLC, Fintact Solutions Group LLC, Gabtta LLC, Matthew Lopez, Maritus Regalis LLC, Trident Commerce LLC. (Attachments: #1 [Proposed] Order)(Herzinger, Kenneth)
July 16, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Andrea Mazingo on behalf of Defendants Fintact Payment Solutions LLC, Fintact Solutions Group LLC, Gabtta LLC, Matthew Lopez, Maritus Regalis LLC, Trident Commerce LLC (Attorney Andrea Mazingo added to party Fintact Payment Solutions LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Andrea Mazingo added to party Fintact Solutions Group LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Andrea Mazingo added to party Gabtta LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Andrea Mazingo added to party Matthew Lopez(pty:dft), Attorney Andrea Mazingo added to party Maritus Regalis LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Andrea Mazingo added to party Trident Commerce LLC(pty:dft))(Mazingo, Andrea)
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER FURTHER EXTENDING DEFENDANT PACHECOS AND RELIEF DEFENDANT EPROFIT SYSTEMS LLCS TIME TO RESPOND TO THE SECS COMPLAINT by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. NOW THEREFORE, for good cause shown, the Court hereby APPROVES the Stipulation in its entirety, and sets the following date: Pacheco and EProfit Systems, LLC shall answer or otherwise respond to the SECs complaint on or before August 14, 2019. (yl)
July 12, 2019 Filing 14 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to August 14, 2019 re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Leung, Gary)
June 17, 2019 Filing 13 STIPULATION to Continue Time to Respond to Initial Complaint from June 20, 2019 to July 19, 2019 Re: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Maritus Regalis LLC answer now due 7/19/2019; Matthew Lopez answer now due 7/19/2019; Gabtta LLC answer now due 7/19/2019; Trident Commerce LLC answer now due 7/19/2019; Fintact Solutions Group LLC answer now due 7/19/2019; Fintact Payment Solutions LLC answer now due 7/19/2019, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by defendants Maritus Regalis LLC; Matthew Lopez; Gabtta LLC; Trident Commerce LLC; Fintact Solutions Group LLC; Fintact Payment Solutions LLC.(Attorney Kenneth P Herzinger added to party Fintact Payment Solutions LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Kenneth P Herzinger added to party Fintact Solutions Group LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Kenneth P Herzinger added to party Gabtta LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Kenneth P Herzinger added to party Matthew Lopez(pty:dft), Attorney Kenneth P Herzinger added to party Maritus Regalis LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Kenneth P Herzinger added to party Trident Commerce LLC(pty:dft))(Herzinger, Kenneth)
June 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Dean D. Pregerson. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 19-03. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Dean D. Pregerson to Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 5:19-cv-00958 MWF(AFMx). (rn)
June 12, 2019 Filing 11 First STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Daniel Pacheco answer now due 7/15/2019, filed by Defendant Daniel Pacheco.(Attorney Scott W Wellman added to party Daniel Pacheco(pty:dft))(Wellman, Scott)
June 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon. NOTE: CHANGES HAVE BEEN MADE TO THIS DOCUMENT. (See document for details.) re #9 . (sbou)
June 4, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF LODGING filed by Securities and Exchange Commission re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 (Attachments: #1 [Proposed] Stipulated Confidentiality Order)(Leung, Gary)
May 30, 2019 Filing 8 DECLARATION OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 REGARDING SERVICE UPON RELIEF DEFENDANTS MATTHEW LOPEZ, FINTACT SOLUTIONS GROUP LLC, FINTACT PAYMENT SOLUTIONS LLC, MARITUS REGALIS LLC, GABTTA LLC, AND TRIDENT COMMERCE LLC served on May 30, 2019. (Leung, Gary)
May 29, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Returned Unexecuted filed by Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission. as to EProfit Systems LLC, Daniel Pacheco. (Leung, Gary)
May 23, 2019 Filing 6 21 DAY Summons issued re Complaint #1 as to defendants EProfit Systems LLC, Fintact Payment Solutions LLC, Fintact Solutions Group LLC, Gabtta LLC, Matthew Lopez, Maritus Regalis LLC, Daniel Pacheco, Trident Commerce LLC. (esa)
May 23, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa)
May 23, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dean D. Pregerson and Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon. (esa)
May 22, 2019 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 filed by Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission. (Leung, Gary)
May 22, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission. (Leung, Gary)
May 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT No Fee Required - US Government, filed by Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attorney Gary Y Leung added to party Securities and Exchange Commission(pty:pla))(Leung, Gary)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Securities and Exchange Commission v. Daniel Pacheco et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fintact Solutions Group LLC
Represented By: Kenneth P Herzinger
Represented By: Andrea Mazingo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Pacheco
Represented By: Christopher Wellman
Represented By: Scott W Wellman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trident Commerce LLC
Represented By: Kenneth P Herzinger
Represented By: Andrea Mazingo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maritus Regalis LLC
Represented By: Kenneth P Herzinger
Represented By: Andrea Mazingo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fintact Payment Solutions LLC
Represented By: Kenneth P Herzinger
Represented By: Andrea Mazingo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gabtta LLC
Represented By: Kenneth P Herzinger
Represented By: Andrea Mazingo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EProfit Systems LLC
Represented By: Christopher Wellman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Lopez
Represented By: Kenneth P Herzinger
Represented By: Andrea Mazingo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Securities and Exchange Commission
Represented By: Gary Y Leung
Represented By: Peter F Del Greco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?