Raul Uriarte-Limon v. Khurana Properties Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Raul Uriarte-Limon
Defendant: Does 1-10 and Khurana Properties Inc.
Case Number: 5:2019cv01058
Filed: June 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Kenly Kiya Kato
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 6, 2019 Filing 19 STATEMENT re: Order on Application to Stay Case and Early Mediation re ADA Disability Access Litigation (ADR-22) #17 . (Price, Dennis)
August 5, 2019 Filing 18 STIPULATION REGARDING SELECTION of Panel Mediator filed. Parties stipulate that Alan Z. Yudkowsky may serve as Panel Mediator. Plaintiff obtained the Panel Mediators consent to serve. Filed by Plaintiff Raul Uriarte-Limon(Grace, Phyl)
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kenly Kiya Kato granting #12 REQUEST to Stay Case re Early Mediation ADA Disability Access Litigation. The ADR proceeding is to be completed no later than 10/21/2019. (jlo)
July 16, 2019 Filing 16 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Magistrate Judge Kenly Kiya Kato re: REQUEST for Clerk to Enter Default #13 . In light of Defendants' Answer filed on July 12, 2019, dkt. 10, Plaintiff's Request for Entry of Default, dkt. 13, is DENIED. (iva)
July 16, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE TO COUNSEL: ALL PARTIES having consented to proceed before the Magistrate Judge, this case remains assigned to Magistrate Judge Kenly Kiya Kato for final disposition re: Consent to Proceed (CV-11C) before US Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program Non-Final #8 , Consent to Proceed (CV-11C) before US Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program Non-Final #8 (rn)
July 15, 2019 Filing 14 STATEMENT Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge filed by Defendant Khurana Properties Inc. (Chandler, Robert)
July 12, 2019 Filing 13 REQUEST for Clerk to Enter Default against Defendant Khurana Properties Inc. filed by Plaintiff Raul Uriarte-Limon. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proof of Service) (Grace, Phyl)
July 12, 2019 Filing 12 First REQUEST to Stay Case and Early Mediation re ADA Disability Access Litigation, filed by Defendant Khurana Properties Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Chandler, Robert)
July 12, 2019 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Khurana Properties Inc., identifying Raul Uriarte-Limon; Khurana Properties. (Chandler, Robert)
July 12, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Khurana Properties Inc..(Attorney Robert Charles Chandler added to party Khurana Properties Inc.(pty:dft))(Chandler, Robert)
June 28, 2019 Filing 9 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Raul Uriarte-Limon, upon Defendant Khurana Properties Inc. served on 6/20/2019, answer due 7/11/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Surinder Singh - Agent for Service in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Handy, Russell)
June 11, 2019 Filing 8 STATEMENT OF CONSENT TO PROCEED before the assigned Magistrate Judge filed by plaintiff Raul Uriarte-Limon. (Handy, Russell)
June 11, 2019 Filing 7 REMINDER NOTICE re Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program. Each party must file form CV-11C within the consent deadlines pursuant to L.R. 73-2. Additionally, the parties are directed to L.R. 73-2.2 Proof of Service. In any case in which only a magistrate judge is initially assigned, plaintiff must file a proof of service within 10 days of service of the summons and complaint as to each defendant. (dts)
June 10, 2019 Filing 6 21 DAY Summons issued re Complaint #1 as to defendant Khurana Properties Inc. (esa)
June 10, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COUNSEL re Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program. This case has been randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Kenly Kiya Kato. (Attachments: #1 CV-11C) (esa)
June 10, 2019 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff Raul Uriarte-Limon. (Handy, Russell)
June 10, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Raul Uriarte-Limon, (Handy, Russell)
June 10, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Raul Uriarte-Limon. (Handy, Russell)
June 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-23887563 - Fee: $400, filed by plaintiff Raul Uriarte-Limon. (Attorney Russell C Handy added to party Raul Uriarte-Limon(pty:pla))(Handy, Russell)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Raul Uriarte-Limon v. Khurana Properties Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Khurana Properties Inc.
Represented By: Robert Charles Chandler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raul Uriarte-Limon
Represented By: Dennis Jay Price, II
Represented By: Phyl Grace
Represented By: Raymond George Ballister, Jr
Represented By: Russell C Handy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?