Willie Farfan v. Doe 1 et al
Plaintiff: Willie Farfan
Defendant: Doe 1, Doe 3, Doe 2 and Does 1 thru 10
Case Number: 5:2019cv01073
Filed: June 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Paul L Abrams
Referring Judge: R Gary Klausner
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER CLOSING CASE by Judge R. Gary Klausner. On 6/14/2019, the Court Order denied Plaintiff's Request to file this action without prepayment of the filing fees, but granted plaintiff leave to amend #4 . Plaintiff was also advised that if he failed to submit the required documents within 30 days, the case would be dismissed. Plaintiff has failed to submit the required documents or otherwise respond. Accordingly, the case is closed. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (jp)
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER by Judge R. Gary Klausner DENYING REQUEST for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis #2 , with leave to amend within 30 days. Plaintiff may re-submit the IFP application and Complaint to this Court, if submitted with the Certified Trust Account Statement and Disbursement Authorization. Plaintiff shall utilize the same case number. If plaintiff fails to submit the required documents with 30 days, this case shall be DISMISSED. (SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER SPECIFICS). (jp)
June 13, 2019 RECOMMENDATION issued by Magistrate Judge Paul L. Abrams. Re REQUEST for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis #2 . Proposed Order forwarded to the District Judge for approval.(ch)
June 11, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge R. Gary Klausner and referred to Magistrate Judge Paul L. Abrams. (ghap)
June 11, 2019 Filing 2 REQUEST to Proceed Without Prepayment of Filing Fees. filed by plaintiff Willie Farfan. (ghap)
June 11, 2019 Filing 1 CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT filed against Defendants Doe 1(Sheriff, official capacity), Doe 1(individual), Doe 2(individual), Doe 2(Chief Medical Officer, official capacity), Doe 3, Does pursuant to Case assigned to Judge R. Gary Klausner and referred to Magistrate Judge Paul L Abrams., filed by plaintiff Willie Farfan. (ghap)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Willie Farfan v. Doe 1 et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe 1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe 3
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe 2
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 thru 10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Willie Farfan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?