Levecke Corporation v. Teamsters Local 630
Plaintiff: Levecke Corporation
Defendant: Teamsters Local 630
Case Number: 5:2019cv01078
Filed: June 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Shashi H Kewalramani
Referring Judge: Dean D Pregerson
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 09:0010
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 1, 2019 Filing 17 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Levecke Corporation answer now due 8/15/2019, re Counterclaim, #12 filed by Plaintiff and Cross-Respondent Levecke Corporation.(April, Szabo)
July 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Dean D. Pregerson: re: Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of an Action (Pursuant to FRCP 41a(1)) #15 . Due to clerical error the case was inadvertently closed and ordered reopened (JS-5). In light ofthe Notice of Voluntary Dismissal #15 the Motion to Dismiss Complaint and Petition #10 is deemed moot. (shb)
July 22, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Plaintiff Levecke Corporation. Dismissal is without prejudice. (April, Szabo)
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge Dean D. Pregerson: This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge Dean D. Pregerson. Counsel are encouraged to review the Central Districts website for additional information. The address ishttp://www.cacd.uscourts.gov. It is not necessary to clear a motion date with the Court Clerk prior to filing the motion. The Court hears motions only on Mondays at 10:00 a.m. See order for details. (shb)
July 11, 2019 Filing 13 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Renee Sanchez counsel for Counter Claimant Teamsters Local 630, Defendant Teamsters Local 630. Adding Renee Q. Sanchez as counsel of record for Teamsters Local 630 for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant/Cross-Petitioner Teamsters Local 630. (Attorney Renee Sanchez added to party Teamsters Local 630(pty:cc), Attorney Renee Sanchez added to party Teamsters Local 630(pty:dft))(Sanchez, Renee)
July 11, 2019 Filing 12 COUNTERCLAIM against Plaintiff/Cross-Respondent Levecke Corporation, filed by Defendant/Cross-Petitioner Teamsters Local 630. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Cross-Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award, #2 Exhibit B to Cross-Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award)(Kierig, Stephanie)
July 11, 2019 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Teamsters Local 630, (Kierig, Stephanie)
July 11, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Complaint and Petition to Vacate Arbitrator's Decision filed by Defendant Teamsters Local 630. Motion set for hearing on 8/19/2019 at 10:00 AM before Judge Dean D. Pregerson. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #2 Declaration of Attorney Bradley S. Beherns in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #3 Declaration of Attorney Stephanie A. Kierig in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #4 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Dismiss) (Attorney Stephanie Alexis Kierig added to party Teamsters Local 630(pty:dft)) (Kierig, Stephanie)
June 21, 2019 Filing 9 SERVICE UNDER FRCP 5(b)(2)(D) Executed by Plaintiff Levecke Corporation, upon Defendant Teamsters Local 630 served on 6/20/2019, answer due 7/11/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the Clerks Office in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (April, Szabo)
June 13, 2019 Filing 8 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Teamsters Local 630. (et)
June 13, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et)
June 13, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dean D. Pregerson and Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani. (et)
June 12, 2019 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Plaintiff Levecke Corporation identifying N/A as Corporate Parent. (April, Szabo)
June 12, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Levecke Corporation, identifying N/A. (April, Szabo)
June 12, 2019 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Levecke Corporation. (April, Szabo)
June 12, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Levecke Corporation. (April, Szabo)
June 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-23910736 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Levecke Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Attorney Szabo L. April added to party Levecke Corporation(pty:pla))(April, Szabo)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Levecke Corporation v. Teamsters Local 630
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teamsters Local 630
Represented By: Renee Sanchez
Represented By: Stephanie Alexis Kierig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Levecke Corporation
Represented By: Szabo L. April
Represented By: Szabo L April
Represented By: L Brent Garrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?