Marlena McGowan v. XPO Logistics Freight, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Marlena McGowan
Defendant: XPO Logistics Freight, Inc. and Does 1 to 50, inclusive
Case Number: 5:2019cv01095
Filed: June 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: John A Kronstadt
Referring Judge: Sheri Pym
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER Re Joint Stipulation Extending Deadline to File Joint Rule 16(B)/26(F) Report (DKT. #14 ) by Judge John A. Kronstadt, the Court orders the following: (1) The Stipulation is APPROVED; and (2) The Joint Rule 16(b)/26(f) Report shall be filed no later than 08/19/2019. Upon review of the report, the Court will issue a scheduling order. (jp)
August 9, 2019 Filing 14 Joint STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Joint Rule 16(B)/26(F) Report filed by Defendant XPO Logistics Freight, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 [Proposed] Order on Joint Stipulation Extending Deadline to File Joint Rule 16(B)/26(F) Report)(Lopez, Zaher)
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER RE JOINT STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF CAUSES OF ACTION SIX THROUGH TEN (DKT. #11 ) by Judge John A. Kronstadt: The Stipulation is GRANTED. (ake)
July 3, 2019 Filing 12 AMENDED DOCUMENT filed by Defendant XPO Logistics Freight, Inc.. Amendment to Notice of Related Case(s) #5 (Lopez, Zaher)
June 27, 2019 Filing 11 First STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to only as to the sixth through tenth causes of action; Labor Code claims alleged in another class action filed by Plaintiff Marlena McGowan.(Sweeney, Brandon)
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER SETTING RULE 16(b)/26(f) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge John A. Kronstadt. Hearing: No Hearing/Under Submission. Joint Report Due: August 9, 2019. This case has been assigned to Judge John A. Kronstadt. This Order applies to all parties in this action, whether or not they are represented by counsel. Counsel, as used in this Order, also refers to parties who are representing themselves. If plaintiff has not already served the complaint (or any amendment thereto) on each defendant, plaintiff shall promptly do so and file proofs of service within three (3) days thereafter. Defendant(s) also shall timely serve and file their responsive pleadings and file proofs of service within three (3) days thereafter. See order for details. (shb)
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STANDING ORDERS FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOHN A. KRONSTADT by Judge John A. Kronstadt: Please read each Order carefully as they differ in some respects from the Local Rules. Counsel are advised that the Court, at any time, may amend one or more of its Standing Orders. It is the responsibility of counsel to refer to this Courts Procedures and Schedules found on the website for the United States District Court, Central District of California (www.cacd.uscourts.gov) to obtain the operative order. (shb)
June 14, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE Notice of Compliance with 28 U.S.C. section 1446(d) filed by Defendant XPO Logistics Freight, Inc.. (Burns, Michael)
June 14, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et)
June 14, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT of Eastern Division Removal Case. This case was initially assigned to District Judge Jesus G. Bernal and referred to Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym for discovery. Pursuant to General Order 19-03, this case has been randomly reassigned to District Judge John A. Kronstadt. The case number on all documents filed with the Court in this case should read as follows: 5:19-cv-01095-JAK (SPx). (et)
June 13, 2019 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF ANSWER TO COMPLAINT filed by Defendant XPO Logistics Freight, Inc. [FILED IN STATE COURT ON 6/12/2019 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO EXHIBIT 2 TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 . (et)
June 13, 2019 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants XPO Logistics Freight, Inc., Does 1 to 50, Inclusive. Jury Demanded., filed by Plaintiff Marlena McGowan. [FILED IN STATE COURT ON 5/9/2019 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO EXHIBIT 1 TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 . (et)
June 13, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Defendant XPO Logistics Freight, Inc.. (Burns, Michael)
June 13, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant XPO Logistics Freight, Inc., identifying XPO Logistics Freight, Inc.; Marlena McGowan. (Burns, Michael)
June 13, 2019 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant XPO Logistics Freight, Inc. identifying XPO Logistics, Inc. as Corporate Parent. (Burns, Michael)
June 13, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant XPO Logistics Freight, Inc.. (Burns, Michael)
June 13, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from San Bernardino County Superior, case number CIVDS1914409 Receipt No: 0973-23916998 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant XPO Logistics Freight, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Declaration of Zaher Lopez in Support of XPO Logistics Freight, Inc.'s Notice of Removal, #4 Declaration of Riina Tohvert in Support of XPO Logistics Freight, Inc.'s Notice of Removal, #5 Declaration of Donna Lena Lenahan in Support of XPO Logistics Freight, Inc.'s Notice of Removal, #6 Proof of Service of Notice of Defendant's Removal) (Attorney Michael J Burns added to party XPO Logistics Freight, Inc.(pty:dft))(Burns, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Marlena McGowan v. XPO Logistics Freight, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marlena McGowan
Represented By: Brandon J Sweeney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: XPO Logistics Freight, Inc.
Represented By: Michael J Burns
Represented By: Zaher Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 to 50, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?