Erlinda Soto v. BMW of North America, LLC
Plaintiff: Erlinda Soto
Defendant: BMW of North America, LLC and Does 1 to 50, inclusive
Case Number: 5:2019cv01099
Filed: June 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Kenly Kiya Kato
Referring Judge: John F Walter
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SCHEDULING AND CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER by Judge John F. Walter. The purpose of this Order is to notify the parties and their counsel of the deadlines and the schedule that will govern this action. Pretrial Conference set for 4/17/2020 at 10:00 AM. Hearing on Motions in Limine; Disputed Jury Instructions set for 4/24/2020 at 10:00 AM. Jury Trial set for 5/5/2020 at 8:30 AM. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. (iv)
July 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER VACATING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE AND REFERRAL TO PRIVATE MEDIATION by Judge John F. Walter. The Court has reviewed the parties' Joint Rule 26(f) Report and finds that a Scheduling Conference is not necessary. The hearing on July 15, 2019 is vacated and taken off calendar. A Scheduling and Case Management Order will issue. Any unserved DOE defendants are dismissed at this time. The Court, having considered the parties' Request: ADR Procedure Selection, the Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program, or the report submitted by the parties pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f) and Civil L.R. 26-1, hereby: ORDERS this case referred to: ADR PROCEDURE NO. 3: (Private mediation). The ADR proceeding is to be completed no later than: January 27, 2020. The Joint Report re: Results of Settlement Conference due on: January 31, 2020. (iv)
July 3, 2019 Filing 10 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 5-6, filed by Defendant BMW of North America, LLC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Mashburn, Michael)
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge John F. Walter: Counsel are hereby notified that a Scheduling Conference has been set for July 15, 2019 at 1:15 p.m. before Judge John F. Walter in Courtroom 7A, 350 W. 1st St, Los Angeles, CA 90012. Lead Trial Counsel shall attend all proceedings before this Court, including the Scheduling Conference. Counsel are directed to comply with Rule 26 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 26-1 in a timely fashion and to file a Joint Report, on or before July 3, 2019. (iv)
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STANDING ORDER by Judge John F. Walter. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THE CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge John F. Walter. (iv)
June 14, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
June 14, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT of Eastern Division Removal Case. This case was initially assigned to District Judge Jesus G. Bernal and referred to Magistrate Judge Kenly Kiya Kato for discovery. Pursuant to General Order 19-03, this case has been randomly reassigned to District Judge John F. Walter. The case number on all documents filed with the Court in this case should read as follows: 5:19-cv-01099 JFW (KKx). (lh)
June 13, 2019 NON-CONFORMED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint, filed by Defendant BMW of North America, LLC. (SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL, DOCUMENT 1-3)(lh)
June 13, 2019 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants BMW of North America, LLC, Does 1 through 50. Filed by Plaintiff Erlinda Soto. (FILED IN RIVERSIDE COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT ON 5/7/2019 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL, DOCUMENT 1-2 #1 ) (lh)
June 13, 2019 Filing 5 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant BMW of North America, LLC, re Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #3 , Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Jury Demand #4 served on June 13, 2019. (Mashburn, Michael)
June 13, 2019 Filing 4 DEMAND for Jury Trial filed by Defendant BMW of North America, LLC.. (Mashburn, Michael)
June 13, 2019 Filing 3 Certification and Notice of Interested Parties filed by Defendant BMW of North America, LLC, identifying BMW (US) Holding Corp.. (Mashburn, Michael)
June 13, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant BMW of North America, LLC. (Mashburn, Michael)
June 13, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Riverside Superior Court, case number RIC1902820 Receipt No: 0973-23918985 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant BMW of North America, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Michael C. Mashburn, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C) (Attorney Michael Charles Mashburn added to party BMW of North America, LLC(pty:dft))(Mashburn, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Erlinda Soto v. BMW of North America, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erlinda Soto
Represented By: Matthew E Faler
Represented By: Pauliana N Lara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BMW of North America, LLC
Represented By: Michael Charles Mashburn
Represented By: Daniel R Villegas
Represented By: Kate S Lehrman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 to 50, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?