Jason Hogan v. Wolverine Distribution, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Jason Hogan
Defendant: Wolverine Distribution, Inc. and Does 1-50, Inclusive
Case Number: 5:2019cv01108
Filed: June 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Kenly Kiya Kato
Referring Judge: R Gary Klausner
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 2, 2019 Filing 25 TRANSMITTAL of documents to Riverside County Superior Court. A certified copy of the order of remand and a copy of the docket sheet from this court was sent to Riverside County Superior Court. Case number: RIC1902891. (jp)
August 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) Order Remanding Action State Court by Judge R. Gary Klausner: The action is hereby REMANDED to State court for all further proceeding. (Made JS-6 Case Terminated.) (jp)
July 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 DENIED BY ORDER OF THE COURT by Judge R. Gary Klausner, re Stipulation to Stay Proceedings Pending Mediation #22 . The Stipulation is DENIED. (jp)
July 19, 2019 Filing 22 STIPULATION to Stay Case pending Mediation filed by Plaintiff Jason Hogan. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Perez, Alexander)
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER by Judge R. Gary Klausner: granting #17 , #20 Non-Resident Attorney John R Richards APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Wolverine Distribution, Inc., designating Ryan C Bykerk as local counsel. (jp)
June 25, 2019 Filing 20 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney John R. Richards to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Wolverine Distribution, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400.00 Previously Paid on 6/14/2019, Receipt No. 0973-23926453) filed by Defendant Wolverine Distribution, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Bykerk, Ryan)
June 24, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123), #12 , Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123), #11 . The following error(s) was/were found: Blank document In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ak)
June 24, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney John R. Richards to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Wolverine Distribution, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400.00 Previously Paid on 6/14/2019, Receipt No. 0973-23926453) #17 . The following error(s) was/were found: No signature on Application. Applicant failed to sign the application. Staff signed. See LR 11-1. See Instructions for Applicants (1) (G-64). (lt)
June 21, 2019 Filing 17 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney John R. Richards to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Wolverine Distribution, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400.00 Previously Paid on 6/14/2019, Receipt No. 0973-23926453) filed by Defendant Wolverine Distribution, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Bykerk, Ryan)
June 21, 2019 Filing 16 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Alexander Perez counsel for Plaintiff Jason Hogan. Adding Alexander Perez as counsel of record for Jason Hogan for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Jason Hogan. (Perez, Alexander)
June 21, 2019 Filing 15 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Kevin Mahoney counsel for Plaintiff Jason Hogan. Adding Kevin Mahoney as counsel of record for Jason Hogan for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Jason Hogan. (Mahoney, Kevin)
June 20, 2019 Filing 14 First STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Wolverine Distribution, Inc. answer now due 7/19/2019, filed by Defendant Wolverine Distribution, Inc..(Bykerk, Ryan)
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER by Judge R. Gary Klausner: granting #10 Non-Resident Attorney James N Boudreau APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Wolverine Distribution, Inc., designating Ryan C Bykerk as local counsel. (jp)
June 20, 2019 Filing 12 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Alexander Perez counsel for Plaintiff Jason Hogan. Adding Alexander Perez as counsel of record for Jason Hogan for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Jason Hogan. (Attorney Alexander Perez added to party Jason Hogan(pty:pla))(Perez, Alexander)
June 20, 2019 Filing 11 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Kevin Mahoney counsel for Plaintiff Jason Hogan. Adding Kevin Mahoney as counsel of record for Jason Hogan for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Jason Hogan. (Attorney Kevin Mahoney added to party Jason Hogan(pty:pla))(Mahoney, Kevin)
June 19, 2019 Filing 10 First APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney James N. Boudreau to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Wolverine Distribution, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-23949077) filed by Defendant Wolverine Distribution, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order on Pro Hac Vice Application) (Bykerk, Ryan)
June 18, 2019 Filing 9 RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS RE: First APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney John R. Richards to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Wolverine Distribution, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-23926453) #4 by Judge R. Gary Klausner. The document is stricken. (jp)
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STANDING ORDER REGARDING NEWLY ASSIGNED CASES by Judge R. Gary Klausner. (sw)
June 17, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et)
June 17, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT of Eastern Division Removal Case. This case was initially assigned to District Judge Jesus G. Bernal and referred to Magistrate Judge Kenly Kiya Kato for discovery. Pursuant to General Order 19-03, this case has been randomly reassigned to District Judge R. Gary Klausner. The case number on all documents filed with the Court in this case should read as follows: 5:19-01108-RGK (KKx). (et)
June 17, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: First APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney John R. Richards to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Wolverine Distribution, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-23926453) #4 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 5-4.3.4 Application not hand-signed. Other error(s) with document(s): Please note that electronic, image or stamp signatures are not allowed. (lt)
June 14, 2019 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Wolverine Distribution, Inc., Does 1-50, Inclusive. Jury Demanded., filed by Plaintiff Jason Hogan. [FILED IN STATE COURT ON 5/10/2019 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 . (et)
June 14, 2019 Filing 4 [DOCUMENT STRICKEN PER ORDER DATED ON 6/18/2019, SEE DOCKET ENTRY NO 9] First APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney John R. Richards to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Wolverine Distribution, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-23926453) filed by Defendant Wolverine Distribution, Inc. (Attachments: #1 State Court Admissions, #2 Certificate of Good Standing - DC, #3 Certificate of Good Standing - Georgia, #4 Certificate of Standing - Illinois, #5 Proposed Order) (Bykerk, Ryan). Modified on 6/18/2019 (jp).
June 14, 2019 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Wolverine Distribution, Inc. identifying Wolverine World Wide, Inc. as Corporate Parent. (Bykerk, Ryan)
June 14, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Wolverine Distribution, Inc.. (Bykerk, Ryan)
June 14, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Riverside County Superior Court, case number RIC1902891 Receipt No: 0973-23925990 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant Wolverine Distribution, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 State Court Complaint, #2 State Court Summons, #3 State Court Notice of Service of Process, #4 State Court Civil Case Cover Sheet, #5 State Court Certificate of Counsel, #6 State Court ADR Packet) (Attorney Ryan Christopher Bykerk added to party Wolverine Distribution, Inc.(pty:dft))(Bykerk, Ryan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jason Hogan v. Wolverine Distribution, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wolverine Distribution, Inc.
Represented By: Ryan Christopher Bykerk
Represented By: James N Boudreau
Represented By: John R Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-50, Inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Hogan
Represented By: Alexander Perez
Represented By: Kevin Mahoney
Represented By: Justin Lo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?