Leslie Herrington v. Reliastar Life Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: LESLIE HERRINGTON
Defendant: SELECTQUOTE, INC. GROUP WELFARE PLAN and RELIASTAR LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY
Case Number: 5:2019cv01210
Filed: July 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Jesus G Bernal
Referring Judge: Shashi H Kewalramani
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1001
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 29, 2019 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Reliastar Life Insurance Company, identifying ReliaStar Life Insurance Company, SelectQuote, Inc. Group Welfare Plan. (Lawson, Linda)
August 29, 2019 Filing 15 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Reliastar Life Insurance Company.(Nunneri, Tatiana)
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER by Judge Jesus G. Bernal, Granting Stipulation to Dismiss Party #13 . Selectquote, Inc. Group Welfare Plan terminated. (twdb)
August 8, 2019 Filing 13 STIPULATION to Dismiss Defendant Selectquote, Inc. Group Welfare Plan filed by Defendant Reliastar Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Nunneri, Tatiana)
July 25, 2019 Filing 12 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Reliastar Life Insurance Company answer now due 8/29/2019, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by defendant Reliastar Life Insurance Company.(Attorney Tatiana Semerjian Nunneri added to party Reliastar Life Insurance Company(pty:dft))(Nunneri, Tatiana)
July 10, 2019 Filing 11 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Leslie Herrington, upon Defendant Reliastar Life Insurance Company served on 7/9/2019, answer due 7/30/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Daisy Montenegro of CT Corporation System Registered Agent for Process in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Grabarsky, Susan)
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Jesus G. Bernal. (ima)
July 2, 2019 Filing 9 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Selectquote, Inc. Group Welfare Plan. (lh)
July 2, 2019 Filing 8 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Reliastar Life Insurance Company. (lh)
July 2, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
July 2, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Jesus G. Bernal and Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani. (lh)
July 1, 2019 Filing 5 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #2 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #3 filed by Plaintiff LESLIE HERRINGTON. (Grabarsky, Susan)
July 1, 2019 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #2 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #3 filed by Plaintiff LESLIE HERRINGTON. (Grabarsky, Susan)
July 1, 2019 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff LESLIE HERRINGTON. (Grabarsky, Susan)
July 1, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff LESLIE HERRINGTON, (Grabarsky, Susan)
July 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-24008442 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff LESLIE HERRINGTON. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A to Complaint) (Attorney Susan B Grabarsky added to party LESLIE HERRINGTON(pty:pla))(Grabarsky, Susan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Leslie Herrington v. Reliastar Life Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SELECTQUOTE, INC. GROUP WELFARE PLAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RELIASTAR LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: Tatiana Semerjian Nunneri
Represented By: Linda Marie Lawson
Represented By: Jason A James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LESLIE HERRINGTON
Represented By: Susan B Grabarsky
Represented By: Phillip S Bather
Represented By: Frank N Darras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?